Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:23-bk-00133

West Virginia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:David L Bissett
Case #: 3:23-ap-00006
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2023
Terminated:Oct 12, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Tax Rise, Inc.
4400 MACARTHUR BLVD. Suite 900 Attn: Jeff Resnick
Newport Beach, CA 92660
Represented By
Tax Rise, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Mindy Dawson
512 Switchgrass Crt
Bunker Hill, WV 25413
Represented By
Aaron C. Amore
Amore Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Thursday, October 12, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Thu 10/12 8:58 AM
Adversary Case Closed. (trs)
Related: [-]
court Case Closed Thu 10/12 8:58 AM
Case Closed. (trs)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 24, 2023
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Service Mon 09/25 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Service. Related [+] Notice Date 09/24/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion to Compromise Controversy
Friday, September 22, 2023
10 10 order Compromise Controversy Fri 09/22 2:00 PM
Order Granting Motion to Compromise/Settle Claims of the Debtor Against Tax Rise, Inc. Related [+] (trs)
Related: [-] 8
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 10/12 8:55 AM
Disposition of Adversary. (trs)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
8 8 motion Compromise Controversy Mon 08/28 5:26 PM
Motion for approval of a compromise and settlement of certain claims. The Defendant has agreed to pay the sum of $5,529.15 in full and final settlement of the Claims asserted in the Complaint, Dawson and Tax Rise, Inc. with Certificate of Service Filed by Mindy Dawson. (Amore, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 08/09 9:52 AM
Amended Summons Service Executed on Tax Rise, Inc. 8/1/2023 . (Amore, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Document USPS signature card for delivery
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 08/08 10:51 AM
Summons Service Executed on Tax Rise, Inc. 8/1/2023 . (Amore, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Document USPS Signature Card
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
5 5 court Summons Issued Tue 07/25 1:19 PM
Summons Issued on Tax Rise, Inc. Answer Due 8/24/2023. (Swaton, Anita)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Re-Issue Summons Tue 07/25 9:33 AM
Motion to Re-Issue Summons Filed by Mindy Dawson. (Amore, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 06/15 9:33 AM
Summons Issued on Tax Rise, Inc. Answer Due 7/17/2023. (O'brien, Kiera)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/14 3:26 PM
Adversary case 3:23-ap-00006. Complaint by Mindy Dawson against Tax Rise, Inc.. Receipt Number n/a, Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Amore, Aaron)
Related: [-]