Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Jamar K Walker
Referred: Lawrence R Leonard
Case #: 4:23-cv-00076
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Jun 15, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2023 5:28 AM EST
Defendant
R&B Corporation of Virginia
Plaintiff
Jordan Hamilton
Represented By
Devon James Munro
Munro Byrd P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 85 minutes ago
Thursday, July 20, 2023
6 6 11 pgs order Order Thu 07/20 11:10 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: It is ORDERED that the following cases are consolidated for all purposes: 4:23-cv-66; 4:23-cv-67; 4:23-cv-68; 4:23-cv-69; 4:23-cv-70; 4:23-cv-71; and 4:23-cv-76. All filings shall be made in the lead case, 4:23-cv-66. The Clerk is DIRECTED to amend the case name of lead case 4:23-cv-66 on CM/ECF to: In re R&B Corporation of Virginia d/b/a Credit Control Corporation, Data Security Breach Litigation. It is ORDERED that Bryan L. Bleichner of Chestnut Cambronne PA, Benjamin F. Johns of Shub & Johns LLC, and Gary M. Klinger of Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman LLC are hereby APPOINTED as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel and David Hilton Wise of the Wise Law Firm PLC is hereby APPOINTED as Liaison Counsel. The plaintiffs are ORDERED to file an amended, consolidated complaint within 30 days of the entry of this Memorandum Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that any action subsequently filed in, transferred to, or removed to this Court that arises out of similar facts as the above-captioned cases may be consolidated by the Court based on notice of such filing by plaintiffs' counsel or defendants counsel and the passage of ten (10) days, or on the Court's own motion and notice. If any party objects to such consolidation or otherwise wishes to seek alternative relief, they must do so before the expiration of the 10-day period. See Order for additional details.Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 7/20/2023. (afar)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Thu 07/20 11:45 AM
All Future Docket Entries Will Be Made In the Lead Case, 4:23cv66. (afar)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
5 5 misc Stipulation Mon 07/17 6:25 PM
STIPULATION re4 Order, Consolidate Cases and to appoint Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Class Counsel by Jordan Hamilton.(Wise, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, July 06, 2023
4 4 2 pgs order Order Thu 07/06 4:55 PM
ORDER: Counsel for the plaintiff is ORDERED to consult with counsel for the plaintiffs in 4:23-cv-66, 4:23-cv-67, 4:23-cv-68, 4:23-cv-69, 4:23-cv-70, and 4:23-cv-71 regarding the appointment of class counsel and consolidation of all seven cases. Counsel for the plaintiff shall then file a motion or other filing as isnecessary and appropriate. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 7/6/2023. (afar)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 07/06 11:11 AM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Jamar K. Walker. District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith no longer assigned to the case. (afar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 06/15 4:06 PM
Summons Issued as to R&B Corporation of Virginia, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(epri, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedures
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Thu 06/15 3:10 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint, by Jordan Hamilton. (Munro, Devon)
Related: [-]
1 1 35 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 06/15 3:04 PM
Complaint (Class Action) ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8984099.), filed by Jordan Hamilton.(Munro, Devon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A Notice of Data Event,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B Data Breach Notice,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civ. Cvr. Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Thu 06/15 4:02 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
Related: [-]