New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Dora Lizette Irizarry
Referred: Cheryl L Pollak
Case #: 1:23-cv-04440
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:1201 Civil Rights (Disability)
Case Filed:Jun 15, 2023
Terminated:Jan 11, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2023 4:00 AM EST
Defendant
Angelina Bryant Park, LLC
Represented By
Adam M. Levy
Levy Goldenberg LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jahron Black
Represented By
Mars Khaimov
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, January 11, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 01/11 1:12 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jahron Black (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
order Order Dismissing Case Thu 01/11 11:34 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE per12 . So Ordered by Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 1/11/2024. (CC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 01/10 12:46 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jahron Black (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
order Status Report Order Wed 01/03 10:53 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: This Court issued an Order on 11/15/2023 directing the parties to file a stipulation of discontinuance by 12/29/2023. The parties failed to comply with that Order; plaintiff's counsel instead filed a duplicate copy of a prior notice of settlement. ( See ECF No.11 ). Accordingly, plaintiff is ORDERED to file a stipulation of discontinuance by 01/10/2024 . Plaintiff is advised that failure to comply with this deadline may result in sanctions, including monetary sanctions. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 1/3/2024. (DB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 12/14 10:18 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Jahron Black (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
order Order(Other) Wed 11/15 8:51 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: In light of the Notice of Settlement10 , a stipulation of discontinuance is to be filed by 12/29/2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 11/15/2023. (DC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 11/14 8:09 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Jahron Black (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
minutes Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 10/20 11:29 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for Initial Conference proceeding held before Magistrate Judge Cheryl Pollak on 10/19/2023. Appearance for Plaintiff: Mars Khaimov. Appearance for Defendants: Adam M. Levy. Parties discuss settlement. Status report due 11/9/2023. (DC)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
9 9 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 10/16 2:02 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Jahron Black (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
order 1 - Terminate Hearings Scheduling Order Thu 09/21 3:40 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Initial Conference previously scheduled for 9/28/2023 before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak has been rescheduled to 10/19/2023 @ 12:15 PM. Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 12:15 PM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 23-4440 So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 9/21/2023. (DC)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
8 8 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Mon 08/14 12:50 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Angelina Bryant Park, LLC. (Levy, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
7 7 order Scheduling Order Thu 07/27 11:05 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 9/28/2023 @ 9:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 9:45 AM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 23-4440 So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 7/27/2023. (DC)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/24 6:53 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Angelina Bryant Park, LLC. (Levy, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 03, 2023
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 07/03 3:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jahron Black. Angelina Bryant Park, LLC served on 7/3/2023, answer due 7/24/2023. (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 06/16 10:22 AM
Summons Issued as to Angelina Bryant Park, LLC. (KD)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 06/16 10:20 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 06/16 10:19 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (KD)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 06/16 10:19 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/15 5:01 PM
COMPLAINT Jahron Black against Angelina Bryant Park, LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16802795 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Jahron Black. (Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons