Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey L Cureton
Referred: Jeffrey L Cureton
Case #: 4:23-cv-00609
Nature of Suit140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 15, 2023
Terminated:Jun 17, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2023 4:26 AM CST
Defendant
Bighorn Construction and Reclamation, L.L.C.
Represented By
Jason Michael Klein
Kearney Mcwilliams And Davis
contact info
Vikesh Navnit Patel
Kearney, Mcwilliams & Davis, PLLC
contact info
Rebecca Kristine Eaton
Kearney Mcwilliams & Davis PLLC
contact info
John Paul Giacalone
Bickel & Brewer
contact info
Defendant
Bighorn Investments and Properties LLC
Represented By
Jason Michael Klein
Kearney Mcwilliams And Davis
contact info
Vikesh Navnit Patel
Kearney, Mcwilliams & Davis, PLLC
contact info
Rebecca Kristine Eaton
Kearney Mcwilliams & Davis PLLC
contact info
John Paul Giacalone
Bickel & Brewer
contact info
Defendant
Bighorn Sand and Gravel LLC
Represented By
Jason Michael Klein
Kearney Mcwilliams And Davis
contact info
Vikesh Navnit Patel
Kearney, Mcwilliams & Davis, PLLC
contact info
Rebecca Kristine Eaton
Kearney Mcwilliams & Davis PLLC
contact info
John Paul Giacalone
Bickel & Brewer
contact info
Defendant
Bridgelink Engineering, LLC
Represented By
Jason Michael Klein
Kearney Mcwilliams And Davis
contact info
Vikesh Navnit Patel
Kearney, Mcwilliams & Davis, PLLC
contact info
Rebecca Kristine Eaton
Kearney Mcwilliams & Davis PLLC
contact info
John Paul Giacalone
Bickel & Brewer
contact info
Defendant
Cole Wayne Johnson
Represented By
Jason Michael Klein
Kearney Mcwilliams And Davis
contact info
Vikesh Navnit Patel
Kearney, Mcwilliams & Davis, PLLC
contact info
Rebecca Kristine Eaton
Kearney Mcwilliams & Davis PLLC
contact info
John Paul Giacalone
Bickel & Brewer
contact info
Defendant
Cord Henry Johnson
Represented By
Jason Michael Klein
Kearney Mcwilliams And Davis
contact info
Vikesh Navnit Patel
Kearney, Mcwilliams & Davis, PLLC
contact info
Rebecca Kristine Eaton
Kearney Mcwilliams & Davis PLLC
contact info
John Paul Giacalone
Bickel & Brewer
contact info
Mediator
ADR Provider
Represented By
Paul D Stickney
Stickney Mediations PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Century Bank
Represented By
John C Leininger
Otteson Shapiro LLP
contact info
Kevin Thomas Schutte
Otteson Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Cadence Bank
Represented By
Koy R Killen
Killen & Dennis PC
contact info
David Shaw
Haley & Olson, P.C.
contact info
Marshall Grant Jones
Haley & Olson, P.C.
contact info
Blake Rasner
Haley & Olson, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/29 1:56 PM
APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Stacey Len Barnes for party(s) Appellant Cole Wayne Johnson Appellant Cord Henry Johnson, in case 24-10812 Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
155 155 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Mon 04/28 5:06 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Cadence Bank re154 Response/Objection (Rasner, Blake)
Related: [-]
154 154 respm Response/Objection Mon 04/28 5:05 PM
RESPONSE filed by Cadence Bank re:151 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Rasner, Blake)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/24 3:57 PM
APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Kevin Thomas Schutte for party(s) Appellee Century Bank, in case 24-10812 Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
Related: [-]
notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/24 3:59 PM
APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Charles Sean North for party(s) Appellant Cole Wayne Johnson Appellant Cord Henry Johnson, in case 24-10812 Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
Related: [-]