Michigan Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:23-cr-20337
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jun 16, 2023 4:07 AM EDT
Defendant
Harish Ramesh (1)
Represented By
Federal Community Defender
contact info
Michael Edward Norman
The Law Offices Of Barton Morris
contact info
Thomas M. Loeb
Thomas M. Loeb, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Christopher Rawsthorne
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/16/2023 5:05 AM EDT
Thursday, June 01, 2023
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: Initial Appearance as to Harish Ramesh held on 6/1/2023. Detention Hearing set for 6/5/2023 01:00 PM Disposition: Defendant temporarily detained. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Elizabeth Young) (AUSA: Chris Rawsthrone) (EBut) [2:23-mj-30226-DUTY]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT sworn before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand as to Harish Ramesh (1). (NAhm) [2:23-mj-30226-DUTY]
Related: [-]
3 3 Public Audio File of Initial Appearance as to Harish Ramesh held on 6/1/2023 before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. AUDIO FILE SIZE (1.5 MB) (NAhm) [2:23-mj-30226-DUTY]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDER as to Harish Ramesh. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm) [2:23-mj-30226-DUTY]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER Regarding Brady Materials as to Harish Ramesh. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm) [2:23-mj-30226-DUTY]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING AND FOR TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Harish Ramesh Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm) [2:23-mj-30226-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE of CJA Attorney Appointment: Thomas M. Loeb has accepted the appointment to represent Harish Ramesh . (Carter, Michael) [2:23-mj-30226-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti: Detention hearing Not Held as to Harish Ramesh. Detention Hearing reset for 6/8/2023 at 01:00 PM .(Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Barton Morris) (AUSA: Christopher Rawsthorne) (LHos) [2:23-mj-30226-DUTY]
Related: [-]
7 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael Edward Norman appearing for Harish Ramesh . (Norman, Michael) [2:23-mj-30226-DUTY]
Related: [-]
8 8 Warrant for Arrest Returned Executed on 5/31/23 as to Harish Ramesh. (TTho) [2:23-mj-30226-DUTY]
Related: [-]
9 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Harish Ramesh for substitution of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (DPer) [2:23-mj-30226-DUTY]
Related: [-]
10 10 Public Audio File of Proceeding as to Harish Ramesh held on 06/05/2023 before Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. AUDIO FILE SIZE (0.6 MB) (DAll) [2:23-mj-30226-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti: Detention Hearing as to Harish Ramesh not held on 6/8/2023. Disposition: Defendant consents to detention. Preliminary Examination set for 6/15/2023 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Unassigned . (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Michael Norman) (AUSA: Christopher Rawsthorne) (LHos) [2:23-mj-30226-DUTY]
Related: [-]
11 11 Public Audio File of Proceeding as to Harish Ramesh held on 06/08/2023 before Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. AUDIO FILE SIZE (0.9 MB) (DAll) [2:23-mj-30226-DUTY]
Related: [-]
12 12 CONSENT ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Harish Ramesh Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (DAll) [2:23-mj-30226-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
13 13 INDICTMENT as to Harish Ramesh (1) count(s) 1-2. (DPer)
Related: [-]