Pennsylvania Western District Court
Case #: 2:23-cr-00124
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jun 16, 2023 3:18 AM EDT
Defendant
FRANCISCO VAZQUEZ-CHAVEZ (1)
Represented By
Gabrielle I. Lee
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Katherine C Jordan
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/16/2023 4:37 AM EDT
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
Set/Reset Hearings as to FRANCISCO VAZQUEZ-CHAVEZ Initial Appearance set for 5/15/2023 03:15 PM in Courtroom 9C before Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly (et) [2:23-mj-00746-MPK]
Related: [-]
Reset Hearings as to FRANCISCO VAZQUEZ-CHAVEZ : Preliminary Examination set for 5/19/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10A before Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. (cmc) [2:23-mj-00746-MPK]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT (Jordan, Katherine) [2:23-mj-00746-MPK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Proposed Warrant
2 2 MOTION by USA as to FRANCISCO VAZQUEZ-CHAVEZ. (Jordan, Katherine) [2:23-mj-00746-MPK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
3 3 Government's Request for Detention as to FRANCISCO VAZQUEZ-CHAVEZ (Jordan, Katherine) [2:23-mj-00746-MPK]
Related: [-]
4 4 SIGNED COMPLAINT as to FRANCISCO VAZQUEZ-CHAVEZ. (et) [2:23-mj-00746-MPK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
5 5 ORDER granting2 Motion for ARREST WARRANT as to FRANCISCO VAZQUEZ-CHAVEZ (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 5/15/2023. (et) [2:23-mj-00746-MPK]
Related: [-]
7 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly: Initial Appearance as to FRANCISCO VAZQUEZ-CHAVEZ held on 5/15/2023 Interpreter: Ana Lahr Language: Spanish. (Court Reporter: none) (et) [2:23-mj-00746-MPK]
Related: [-]
8 8 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by FRANCISCO VAZQUEZ-CHAVEZ (et) [2:23-mj-00746-MPK]
Related: [-]
9 9 Order Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No. 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020) (amending Fed. R. Crim. Pro. 5) as to FRANCISCO VAZQUEZ-CHAVEZ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 5/15/2023. (et) [2:23-mj-00746-MPK]
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by FRANCISCO VAZQUEZ-CHAVEZ (et) [2:23-mj-00746-MPK]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER Scheduling a Preliminary Hearing as to FRANCISCO VAZQUEZ-CHAVEZ. Pending the hearing, the defendant is to be detained in the custody of the United States Marshal or any other authorized officer. The custodian must bring the defendant to the hearing(s) at the time, date, and place set forth below. Preliminary Examination set for 5/19/2023 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10A before Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 5/15/2023. (et) [2:23-mj-00746-MPK]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to FRANCISCO VAZQUEZ-CHAVEZ; Appointed attorney Gabrielle I. Lee for FRANCISCO VAZQUEZ-CHAVEZ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 5/16/2023. (et) [2:23-mj-00746-MPK]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
13 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy: Preliminary Hearing as to FRANCISCO VAZQUEZ-CHAVEZ held on 5/19/2023. Interpreter: Ana Lahr Language: Spanish (Court Reporter: Terri Benson) (cmc) [2:23-mj-00746-MPK]
Related: [-]
14 14 PROBABLE CAUSE ORDER following the Preliminary Examination, the Court finds that probable cause exists as to FRANCISCO VAZQUEZ-CHAVEZ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 5/19/2023. (cmc) [2:23-mj-00746-MPK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
15 15 INDICTMENT as to FRANCISCO VAZQUEZ-CHAVEZ (1) count 1. (kss)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification and Notice for Filing Pretrial Motions,
Att: 2 Arraignment Plea,
Att: 3 Criminal Case Info Sheet
16 16 Indictment MEMORANDUM as to FRANCISCO VAZQUEZ-CHAVEZ (kss)
Related: [-]