Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 8:23-cr-00197
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jun 16, 2023 3:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Eddy Fonseca (1)
Represented By
Alex R. Stavrou
Alex R. Stavrou, P.A.
contact info
Stephen Consuegra
Federal Defender Middle District Of Florida
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Samantha Joan Newman
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/16/2023 4:21 AM EDT
Thursday, May 18, 2023
Arrest of Eddy Fonseca on 5/18/2023 (AMS) [8:23-mj-01606-MRM]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Eddy Fonseca (1). (AMS) [8:23-mj-01606-MRM]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER as to Eddy Fonseca: Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny and orders the United States to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, and sanctions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 12/01/2020. (AMS) [8:23-mj-01606-MRM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ***CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Eddy Fonseca. (FN) [8:23-mj-01606-MRM]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel and ORAL MOTION to Appoint Interpreter by Eddy Fonseca. (FN) [8:23-mj-01606-MRM]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORAL MOTION for Detention by USA as to Eddy Fonseca. (FN) [8:23-mj-01606-MRM]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for In Person proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy: granting 6 Oral Motion to Appoint Counsel by Eddy Fonseca (1); granting 6 Oral Motion to Appoint Interpreter by Eddy Fonseca (1); granting 7 Oral Motion for Detention by USA as to Eddy Fonseca (1). Initial Appearance and Preliminary Hearing as to Eddy Fonseca held on 5/18/2023. (Digital) (Interpreter/Language: James Plunkett/Spanish) (FN) (FN). [8:23-mj-01606-MRM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (5/19/2023) G Exhibit 1
9 9 ORAL ORDER as to Eddy Fonseca: DUE PROCESS PROTECTION ACT ORAL ORDER. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges and contempt proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 5/18/2023. (FN) [8:23-mj-01606-MRM]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Eddy Fonseca. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 5/18/2023. (FN) [8:23-mj-01606-MRM]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Eddy Fonseca. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 5/18/2023. (FN) [8:23-mj-01606-MRM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
12 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephen Consuegra appearing for Eddy Fonseca (Consuegra, Stephen) [8:23-mj-01606-MRM]
Related: [-]
13 13 COUNSEL NOTIFIED to re-file to correct defendant name in document: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alex R. Stavrou appearing for Eddy Fonseca (Stavrou, Alex) Modified text on 5/25/2023 (KME). [8:23-mj-01606-MRM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
14 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Stephen Consuegra. by Eddy Fonseca. (Consuegra, Stephen) Modified text on 5/26/2023 (KME). [8:23-mj-01606-MRM]
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 27, 2023
15 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alex R. Stavrou appearing for Eddy Fonseca (Stavrou, Alex) [8:23-mj-01606-MRM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
16 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting 14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Stephen Consuegra. Attorney Stephen Consuegra withdrawn from case as to Eddy Fonseca (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 5/30/2023. (FN) [8:23-mj-01606-MRM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
17 17 INDICTMENT returned in open court as to Eddy Fonseca (1) count(s) 1. (MCB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Restricted Unredacted Indictment
18 18 MOTION to Seal by USA as to Eddy Fonseca. (MCB)
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER granting 18 MOTION to Seal as to Eddy Fonseca (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 6/14/2023. (MCB)
Related: [-]