District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Christopher R Cooper
Case #: 1:23-cv-01758
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 16, 2023
Re-opened:May 07, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2023 3:56 AM EST
Counter Claimant
TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
David Frederick Cutter
Batescarey LLP
contact info
Milad Emam
Batescarey LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Represented By
Matthew J. Schlesinger
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Colin P. Watson
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Defendant
AXIS REINSURANCE COMPANY
10000 Avalon Boulevard Suite 200
Alpharetta, GA 30009
Represented By
Jason Paul Cronic
Wiley Rein LLP
contact info
Emily Hart
Wiley Rein LLP
contact info
Matthew W. Beato
Wiley Rein LLP
contact info
Defendant
CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO. 509/QA020707
Represented By
Scott Schwartz
Clyde & Co LLP
contact info
Edward Kirk
Clyde & Co LLP
contact info
Defendant
HOUSTON CASUALTY COMPANY
13403 Northwest Freeway
Houston, TX 77040
Represented By
Joseph A. Bailey, III
Werner Ahari Mangel LLP
contact info
Defendant
TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
One Hartford Plaza
Hartford, CT 06155
Represented By
David Frederick Cutter
Batescarey LLP
contact info
Milad Emam
Batescarey LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION
8200 Jones Branch Drive
McLean, VA 22102
Represented By
Matthew J. Schlesinger
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Colin P. Watson
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info

GPO Nov 08 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall submit, by November 22, 2024, a Joint Status Report on the need for further proceedings in this matter. See full Memorandum Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/8/2024. (lccrc2)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
56 56 misc Status Report Wed 01/22 5:43 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION. (Schlesinger, Matthew)
Related: [-]
55 55 motion Dismiss Wed 01/22 5:29 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION.(Schlesinger, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, January 16, 2025
54 54 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 01/16 5:56 PM
ORDER granting53 Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation's claims against Defendant Houston Casualty Company. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/16/2025. (lccrc2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
53 53 motion Dismiss Wed 01/15 11:20 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION.(Schlesinger, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order