New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Natasha C Merle
Referred: Anne Y Shields
Case #: 2:23-cv-04464
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jun 16, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Oct 17, 2024 10:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Intercontinental Capital Group, Inc.
Represented By
Justin Robert Marino
Stevenson Marino LLP
contact info
Jason Mischel
Jason R. Mischel, Esq.
contact info
Prodromos Tsenesidis
Stevenson Marino LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dustin Dimisa
Represented By
Justin Robert Marino
Stevenson Marino LLP
contact info
Jason Mischel
Jason R. Mischel, Esq.
contact info
Prodromos Tsenesidis
Stevenson Marino LLP
contact info
Defendant
Michael Cabales
Mediator
Andrew Kimler
Vishnick, McGovern, Milizio, LLP 3000 Marcus Avenue Suite 1E9
New Hyde Park, NY 11042
Plaintiff
Sergio Lopez
Represented By
Erik Harald Langeland
Erik H. Langeland, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 17, 2025
56 56 motion Compel Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 03/17 5:21 PM
Fully Briefed MOTION to Compel Arbitration , Fully Briefed MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Dustin Dimisa, Intercontinental Capital Group, Inc.. (Mischel, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Dustin DiMisa with Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit 9/17/28 ICG Mouzakis Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit 10/9/19 ICG Attina Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit 12/9/19 ICG Fiacco Agreement,
Att: 6 Exhibit 12/23/19 ICG Petri Agreement,
Att: 7 Exhibit 2/2/21 ICG Weber Agreement,
Att: 8 Exhibit 5/3/21 ICG Stewart Agreement,
Att: 9 Exhibit 11/8/21 ICG Lopez Agreement,
Att: 10 Exhibit 3/16/22 ICG Lloyd Agreement,
Att: 11 Exhibit 3/22/22 ICG Berroa Agreement,
Att: 12 Affidavit in Support Certification of Jason R. Mischel, Esq.,
Att: 13 Exhibit Amended Complaint filed in this matter by Plaintiff on behalf of himself and all opt-in Plaintiffs on July 12, 2024,
Att: 14 Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 15 Memorandum in Opposition Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,
Att: 16 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 17 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 18 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 19 Memorandum in Support Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,
Att: 20 Affidavit in Support Reply Certification of Jason R. Mischel, Esq.,
Att: 21 Exhibit JAMS Minimum Standards Policy