Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Kai N Scott
Case #: 2:23-cv-02315
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity - Legal Malpractice
Case Filed:Jun 16, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2023 4:51 AM EST
Defendant
LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY P. LAMONICA, P.C.
D/B/A LAMONICA LAW 341 WEST STATE STREET
MEDIA, PA 19063
Represented By
ANTHONY P. DEMICHELE
O'Brien & Ryan LLP
contact info
Brianna D. O'Donnell
O'Brien And Ryan, LLP
contact info
PAUL E. PEEL
O'Brien & Ryan
contact info
Defendant
LAWRENCE WELSH
341 WEST STATE STREET
MEDIA, PA 19063
Represented By
ANTHONY P. DEMICHELE
O'Brien & Ryan LLP
contact info
Brianna D. O'Donnell
O'Brien And Ryan, LLP
contact info
PAUL E. PEEL
O'Brien & Ryan
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM DWYER
262 SALISBURY STREET
CHARLOTTE, FL 33954
Represented By
PAMELA J. DEVINE
Bardsley Law. LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
45 45 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 05/13 9:57 AM
RESCHEDULED NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/2/2025 10:30 AM IN Telephone Conference BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT.(JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
44 44 misc Letter Mon 05/12 4:18 PM
Letter dated 5/12/2025 by WILLIAM DWYER. (DEVINE, PAMELA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
43 43 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 01/07 1:58 PM
AMENDED NOTICE. RE:A STATUS CONFERENCE IS SET FOR THURSDAY, 5/13/25 AT 10:00 AM (VIA TELEPHONE) BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Fillable form
42 42 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/07 12:23 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER THAT A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 10/21/25 AT 11:00 AM IN CHAMBERS BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT. FACT DISCOVERY IS DUE 1/27/25. EXPERT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 4/28/25. MOTIONS IN LIMINE ARE DUE BY 10/14/25. MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 5/28/25. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 10/14/25. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 10/14/25. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 10/28/25 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 13B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT ON 1/7/25. 1/7/25 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
41 41 minutes Status Conference Fri 01/03 10:07 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT Status Conference held on 12/18/24. (JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
40 40 1 pgs order Order Lifting Stay Wed 12/18 3:51 PM
ORDER THAT THE STAY IN THIS CASE IS LIFTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES SHALL EMAIL CHAMBERS WITH JOINT PROPOSED TRIAL DATES BY 1/3/25. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT ON 12/18/24. 12/18/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
39 39 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 12/17 4:26 PM
NOTICE RESCHEDULING HEARING. RE: The STATUS CONFERENCE previously scheduled for DECEMBER 19, 2024, at 10:30 a.m. has been RESCHEDULED to DECEMBER 18, 2024, at 11:30 a.m. via telephone before the Honorable Kai N. Scott. (fdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
38 38 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 12/10 2:06 PM
NOTICE RESCHEDULING HEARING. RE: THE 12/9/24 STATUS CONFERENCE HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED TO THURSDAY, 12/19/24 AT 10:30 AM VIA TELEPHONE BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Fillable form
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
37 37 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 11/26 2:03 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING. RE: A STATUS CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 12/9/24 AT 10:30 AM (VIA TELEPHONE) BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Fillable form
Thursday, November 07, 2024
36 36 misc Status Report Thu 11/07 8:48 AM
STATUS REPORT by WILLIAM DWYER. (DEVINE, PAMELA)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
35 35 minutes Status Conference Fri 10/04 10:35 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT Status Conference held on 9/23/24. (JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
34 34 1 pgs order Order Staying Case ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 09/23 3:02 PM
ORDER THAT THIS COURT'S THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER30 IS VACATED. THE CASE IS STAYED. THE EMERGENCY UNOPPOSED MOTION OF PLAINTIFF WILLIAM DWYER TO EXTEND THE SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES31 IS DENIED AS MOOT. A STATUS CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD VIA TELEPHONE ON 11/7/24 AT 11:00 AM. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT ON 9/23/24. 9/23/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 status report form
Friday, September 20, 2024
33 33 misc Status Report Fri 09/20 4:01 PM
STATUS REPORT by LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY P. LAMONACA, P.C., LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY P. LAMONICA, P.C., LAWRENCE WELSH. (PEEL, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 09/06 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/23/2024 11:00 AM held by Telephone BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT.(JL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 (a) STATUS REPORT
31 31 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 09/06 10:37 AM
Emergency MOTION Unopposed Motion for Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by WILLIAM DWYER.Certificate of Service.(DEVINE, PAMELA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
30 30 2 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 07/18 9:03 AM
ORDER THAT FACT DISCOVERY DUE BY 8/19/2024., MOTIONS DUE BY 1/6/2025., FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/20/2025 10:00 AM IN Judge's Chambers; TRIAL POOL SET FOR 6/3/2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT ON 7/17/24. 7/18/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
29 29 order Stipulation and Order Wed 07/17 12:54 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT the caption of this matter shall be amended to correct the name of Defendant Law Offices of Gregory P. Lamonica, P.C. d/b/a Lamonica Law to Defendant Law Offices of Gregory P. LaMonaca, P.C. d/b/a LaMonaca Law. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT ON 7/17/24. 7/17/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Stipulation Wed 07/17 11:34 AM
STIPULATION TO CORRECT CAPTION by WILLIAM DWYER. (DEVINE, PAMELA)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 07/17 10:45 AM
Joint MOTION Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by WILLIAM DWYER.Certificate of Service.(DEVINE, PAMELA)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 07/19 1:27 PM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 5/12/2025. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 5/12/2025. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 5/12/2025. (tjd)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 06/10 1:44 PM
NOTICE RESCHEDULING HEARING. Re: The Status Conference previously scheduled for 6/25/24 at 10:00 am has been canceled. (fdc)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Scheduling Order Mon 06/10 1:41 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER THAT A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 4/17/25 AT 10:00 AM IN CHAMBERS BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT. DISCOVERY DUE BY 7/17/24. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 12/5/24. TRIAL POOL SET FOR 4/22/25. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT ON 6/10/24. 6/10/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
24 24 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 06/06 4:35 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY P. LAMONICA, P.C., LAWRENCE WELSH.Certificate of Service.(Schroy, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
23 23 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/03 11:13 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF WILLIAM DWYER'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND THE SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES22 IS GRANTED AND THE COURT'S SCHEDULING ORDER19 IS AMENDED AS FOLLOWS: THE PARTIES MAY CONTACT JUDGE SCOTT'S CHAMBERS IF THEY WOULD LIKE TO BE REFERRED TO THE HON. ELIZABETH HEY, U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 3/19/25 AT 10:00 AM IN CHAMBERS BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT. FACT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 6/17/24. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 11/5/24. MOTIONS IN LIMINE ARE DUE BY 3/12/25. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 3/12/25. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 3/12/25. TRIAL POOL SET FOR 4/1/25. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT ON 4/3/24. 4/3/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
22 22 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/25 2:05 PM
MOTION Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines Unopposed filed by WILLIAM DWYER.Certificate of Service.(DEVINE, PAMELA)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/19 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen G. Schroy on behalf of LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY P. LAMONICA, P.C., LAWRENCE WELSH (Schroy, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/16 11:27 AM
NOTICE from Chambers of Magistrate Judge Hey. Re: Policies and Procedures. (fdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
19 19 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/05 3:35 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER THAT THE PARTIES MAY CONTACT JUDGE SCOTT'S CHAMBERS IF THEY WOULD LIKE TO BE REFERRED TO THE HON. ELIZABETH HEY, U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. FACT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 4/18/24. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS MUST BE FILED BY 9/6/24. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAI N. SCOTT ON 12/20/23. 1/5/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Fri 01/05 12:38 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Brianna D. O'Donnell on behalf of LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY P. LAMONICA, P.C., LAWRENCE WELSH(O'Donnell, Brianna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
17 17 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 12/20 9:55 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE KAI N. SCOTT Rule 16 Conference held on 12/18/23. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
16 16 misc Report Of Mon 12/11 4:16 PM
Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY P. LAMONICA, P.C., LAWRENCE WELSH. (O'Donnell, Brianna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 11/28 2:34 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING. RE:AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 12/18/23 AT 11:30 AM IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 5614) BEFORE HONORABLE KAI N. SCOTT.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Fillable form
Thursday, November 02, 2023
14 14 respoth Response Thu 11/02 12:01 PM
Response re12 Answer to Amended Complaint Plaintiffs Answers to Defendants Affirmative Defenses by WILLIAM DWYER. (DEVINE, PAMELA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 10/26 11:12 AM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS9 IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAI N. SCOTT ON 10/26/23.10/26/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
12 12 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 10/19 4:30 PM
ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY P. LAMONICA, P.C., LAWRENCE WELSH.(O'Donnell, Brianna)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 09/29 3:53 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY P. LAMONICA, P.C., LAWRENCE WELSH, filed by WILLIAM DWYER.(DEVINE, PAMELA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/19 10:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brianna D. O'Donnell on behalf of LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY P. LAMONICA, P.C., LAWRENCE WELSH (O'Donnell, Brianna)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 09/18 6:34 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY P. LAMONICA, P.C., LAWRENCE WELSH.Memorandum and Certificate of Service.(PEEL, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit A
Friday, July 21, 2023
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 07/21 11:33 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WILLIAM DWYER. LAWRENCE WELSH waiver sent on 7/20/2023, answer due 9/18/2023. (DEVINE, PAMELA)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 07/21 11:29 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WILLIAM DWYER. LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY P. LAMONICA, P.C. waiver sent on 7/20/2023, answer due 9/18/2023. (DEVINE, PAMELA)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
6 6 misc Praecipe/Request Fri 07/14 12:13 PM
Praecipe To Attach Certificate of Merit to Complaint by WILLIAM DWYER. (DEVINE, PAMELA)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/10 2:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY P. DEMICHELE on behalf of LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY P. LAMONICA, P.C., LAWRENCE WELSH with Jury Demand(DEMICHELE, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
misc Remark Tue 06/27 12:47 PM
Copy of Doc. 4 mailed to Unreps. (mas)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
4 4 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 06/23 4:06 PM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY TO HONORABLE KAI N. SCOTT FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 6/23/23. 6/23/23 ENTERED & E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO UNREPS.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/20 12:56 PM
NOTICE by WILLIAM DWYER re1 Complaint (Attorney) Designation Form (DEVINE, PAMELA)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 06/20 9:12 AM
Summons Issued as to LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY P. LAMONICA, P.C., LAWRENCE WELSH. E-mailed to Pamela J. Devine on 6/20/23 (fdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 06/16 12:21 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16759038.), filed by WILLIAM DWYER.(DEVINE, PAMELA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form Designation Form
misc Attorney Required Forms Fri 06/16 4:46 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Related Case section is incomplete. A signature is required and all 5 questions need to be answered. (sbt)
Related: [-]