Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Michael M Baylson
Case #: 2:23-cv-02320
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sexual Harassment)
Case Filed:Jun 16, 2023
Terminated:May 01, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2023 4:52 AM EST
Defendant
THE RADNOR HOTEL, INC.
585 LANCASTER AVENUE
WAYNE, PA 19087
Represented By
BRIAN DEAN BOREMAN
Unruh, Turner, Burke & Frees, P.C.
contact info
MATTHEW KORENOSKI
Unruh Turner Burke & Frees
contact info
Plaintiff
JENNIFER ROCK
7704 ROCKWELL AVENUEN
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19111
Represented By
HOWARD K. TRUBMAN
Personal Injury And Employment Law Center, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 02, 2024
misc Remark Thu 05/02 7:46 AM
PAPER #31 MAILED TO PRO SE (JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
31 31 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 05/01 6:08 PM
ORDER GRANTING17 MOTION TO WITHDRAW ATTY AND DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 5/1/24. 5/1/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. PRO SE PLAINTIFF NOT MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
30 30 audio Audio File Wed 05/01 2:57 PM
Audio File 05/01/2024 2:06:06PM, regarding Rule 16 held on 05/01/2024 in courtroom 3A, before DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON (ked)
Related: [-]
29 29 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Wed 05/01 2:26 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON Interim Pretrial Conference held on 5/1/24. Court Reporter: ESR. (JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
28 28 service Certificate of Service Thu 04/04 9:37 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JENNIFER ROCK re18 MOTION to Stay Proceedings ,17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff (TRUBMAN, HOWARD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 04/03 11:21 AM
*NEW DATE* RESCHEDULED NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/1/2024 02:00 PM IN Courtroom 3A BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON (ORIGINAL DATE LISTED WAS 4/30/2024, SEE ORDER AT #25)(lds)
Related: [-]
notice Notice re: Cancellation of Hearing Wed 04/03 11:19 AM
NOTICE re: Cancellation of Hearing - MOTION HEARING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HEARING, scheduled for 4/30/2024 - NEW NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL HEARING TO ISSUE PROMPTLY(lds)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
26 26 audio Audio File Fri 03/29 3:12 PM
Audio File 3/28/2024 2:00pm, regarding Telephone Conference held on 3/28/2024, before DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON (cjh)
Related: [-]
misc Remark Fri 03/29 10:21 AM
DOC. NO.25 MAILED TO PRO SE ON 3/29/24. (amas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
25 25 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/28 5:13 PM
ORDER THAT WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS OF THIS ORDER, PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL SHALL PHYSICALLY SERVE (1) THIS ORDER, (2) COUNSELS MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ECF17 ), (3) COUNSELS MOTION TO STAY (ECF18 ), AND (4) DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF16 ), UPON PLAINTIFF AND/OR UPON PLAINTIFFS FAMILY AT 7704 ROCKWELL AVENUE PHILADELPHIA, PA 19111. UPON COUNSEL THEN FILING A CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE WITH THIS COURT, COUNSELS MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ECF17 ) IS GRANTED, BUT STAYED PENDING THE HEARING REFERENCED BY THIS ORDER. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED THAT A PRETRIAL R.16 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS SET TO BE HELD ON APRIL 30, 2024 AT 2:00 PM BEFORE THE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON IN COURTROOM 3A (3RD FLOOR) AT THE U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106. (ECF22 ). IF PLAINTIFF IS UNABLE OR DOES NOT WANT TO RETAIN NEW PRIVATE COUNSEL BEFORE THIS DATE, THE COURT NOTES THAT THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA MAINTAINS A PANEL OF VOLUNTEER ATTORNEYS WHO MAY BE AVAILABLE TO ASSIST IN EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION CASES, ETC. COUNSELS MOTION TO STAY (ECF18 ) IS GRANTED THROUGH THE DATE OF THIS HEARING. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 3/28/24. 3/28/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. ROCK NOT MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
24 24 minutes Motion Hearing Thu 03/28 4:33 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. Motion Hearing held on 3/28/24 re18 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by JENNIFER ROCK,17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff filed by JENNIFER ROCK (va)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 03/28 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/30/2024 02:00 PM IN Courtroom 3A BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON.(lds)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Thu 03/28 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion18 MOTION to Stay Proceedings ,17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff : MOTION HEARING SET FOR 4/30/2024 02:00 PM IN Courtroom 3A BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON.(lds)
Related: [-]
notice Notice re: Cancellation of Hearing Thu 03/28 3:52 PM
NOTICE re: Cancellation of Hearing - MOTIONS HEARING, scheduled for 4/30/2024 - A corrected notice with a hearing notice for a Pretrial Rule 16 hearing will issue immediately(lds)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Thu 03/21 7:38 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion18 MOTION to Stay Proceedings ,17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff : RECORDED TELECONFERENCE RE: MOTIONS SET FOR 3/28/2024 02:00 PM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. The following dial-in information should be used to join the conference call: AT&T Conf. Dial in (888) 278-0296 - 7 digit access code: 5899406#(lds)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order Thu 02/22 5:44 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL RESPOND TO THE MOTION TO WITHDRAW REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF, FILED BY HOWARD K. TRUBMAN, ESQUIRE, WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS. IF THE PLAINTIFF DOES NOT OPPOSE THE MOTION, OR THE COURT GRANTS THE MOTION, THE COURT WILL ALLOW PLAINTIFF THIRTY (30) DAYS TO SECURE NEW REPRESENTATION OF COUNSEL. ETC. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 2/22/24. 2/22/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. COPY MAILED TO PLAINTIFF BY CHAMBERS.(va)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 02/22 1:47 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re18 MOTION to Stay Proceedings ,17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff filed by THE RADNOR HOTEL, INC..(BOREMAN, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 8 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
18 18 motion Stay Tue 02/20 8:22 PM
MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by JENNIFER ROCK.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(TRUBMAN, HOWARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
17 17 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 02/20 8:18 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff filed by JENNIFER ROCK.Memorandum, Affidavit, Certificate of Service.(TRUBMAN, HOWARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Affidavit,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, February 15, 2024
16 16 motion Summary Judgment Thu 02/15 5:48 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by THE RADNOR HOTEL, INC..Memorandum of Law, Statement of Undisputed Facts and Certificate of Service.(BOREMAN, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 2 Declaration Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8,
Att: 11 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 12 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
15 15 respm Response to Motion Tue 02/06 3:46 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re14 First MOTION in Limine filed by THE RADNOR HOTEL, INC..(BOREMAN, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
14 14 motion In Limine Tue 01/30 4:44 PM
First MOTION in Limine filed by JENNIFER ROCK.Brief, Certificate of Service.(TRUBMAN, HOWARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, August 11, 2023
13 13 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Scheduling Order Fri 08/11 10:23 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCOTT W. REID FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES. DISCOVERY DUE BY 1/30/2024. MOTIONS DUE BY 2/15/2024. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 2/28/2024. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 3/11/2024. TRIAL POOL SET FOR 4/1/2024. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/11/23. 8/11/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order Thu 08/10 8:05 PM
ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVECAPTIONED CASE IS MAGISTRATE SCOTT W. REID. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 8/10/23. 8/10/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
11 11 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 08/10 4:35 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. Telephone Rule 16 Pretrial Conference Not On The Record held on 08/10/2023. (va)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 29, 2023
10 10 discov Disclosure Sat 07/29 9:17 AM
Disclosure with Certificate of Service by JENNIFER ROCK.(TRUBMAN, HOWARD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/19 4:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW KORENOSKI on behalf of THE RADNOR HOTEL, INC. with Certificate of Service(KORENOSKI, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 07/19 8:52 AM
NOTICE of Hearing:PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 8/10/2023 AT 11:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF WILL INITIATE THE CALL WITH DEFENSE AND WHEN ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, CALL CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7520.(ahf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Conference Info Sheet,
Att: 2 Trial Procedures
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/18 11:59 AM
ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by THE RADNOR HOTEL, INC..(BOREMAN, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Statement Tue 07/18 11:55 AM
Statement of Disclosure by THE RADNOR HOTEL, INC.. (BOREMAN, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/18 11:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN DEAN BOREMAN on behalf of THE RADNOR HOTEL, INC. with Certificate of Service(BOREMAN, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 06/21 8:37 PM
Summons Issued as to THE RADNOR HOTEL, INC.. Forwarded To: Plaintiff's Counsel on 6/21/23. (va)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Wed 06/21 8:35 AM
NOTICE by JENNIFER ROCK(TRUBMAN, HOWARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Designation Form
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/20 12:12 PM
NOTICE by JENNIFER ROCK(TRUBMAN, HOWARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form
misc Attorney Required Forms Tue 06/20 9:54 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED CIVIL COVER SHEET AND DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Both forms are missing. (sbt)
Related: [-]
misc Attorney Required Forms Tue 06/20 3:49 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. The Related Case section is incomplete. The Yes/No questions and the question asking if the case is/is not related need to be answered. A signature is required. (sbt)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
1 1 4 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 06/16 2:47 PM
COMPLAINT against THE RADNOR HOTEL, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16759579.), filed by JENNIFER ROCK.(TRUBMAN, HOWARD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A