Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:22-bk-11686

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Theodor Albert
Case #: 8:23-ap-01052
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 16, 2023
Terminated:Feb 13, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kirit Shah
2992 Hacienda Dr.
Duarte, CA 91010
Represented By
Kirit Shah
contact info
Defendant
Sonal Shah
2992 Hacienda Dr.
Duarte, CA 91010
Represented By
Sonal Shah
contact info
Defendant
G & L Seafood Inc., a California Corporation
2416 Chico Ave
South El Monte, CA 91733
Represented By
G & L Seafood Inc.
contact info
Defendant
T&T Excavating Inc., a California Corporation
12403 Central Ave. #310
Chino, CA 91710
Represented By
T&T Excavating Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Triet Minh Dinh, a California Corporation
10661 Hazard Ave.
Garden Grove, CA 92843
Represented By
Triet Minh Dinh
contact info
Plaintiff
Platte River Insurance Company, a Nebraska corporation
Higgs Fletcher Mack c/o Kirsten Worley 401 West A Street Suite 2600
San Diego, CA 92101
Represented By
Kirsten A Worley
Higgs Fletcher & Mack
contact info
Trustee
Karen S Naylor (TR)
Karen Sue Naylor, Trustee 4910 Birch Street, Suite 120
Newport Beach, CA 92660
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
44 44 court Close Adversary Case Tue 02/13 3:55 PM
Adversary Case 8:23-ap-1052 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (AM)
Related: [-] 28 Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Ntc of Status Conf (AP) filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company
Thursday, January 11, 2024
43 43 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 01/11 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 01/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 42 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
42 42 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Tue 01/09 5:38 PM
Order On Stipulation To Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Case No. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 1/9/2024. (GD)
Related: [-]
41 41 misc Notice of Lodgment Tue 01/09 12:06 PM
Notice of lodgment of Order or Judgment in Adversary Proceeding Re: Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Case No. Adv. No. 8:23-ap-01052-TA Filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company Related [+]. (Worley, Kirsten)
Related: [-] 40 Stipulation By Platte River Insurance Company and T&T Excavting, Inc. and G & L Seafood, Inc. to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company
Monday, January 08, 2024
40 40 motion Stipulation (motion) Mon 01/08 4:09 PM
Stipulation By Platte River Insurance Company and T&T Excavting, Inc. and G & L Seafood, Inc. to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company (Worley, Kirsten)
Related: [-]
39 39 misc Status report Mon 01/08 1:01 PM
Joint Status report Filed by Defendant G & L Seafood Inc. Related [+]. (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, January 04, 2024
38 38 court Hearing Held (Other) Thu 01/04 12:20 PM
Hearing Held Re: Status Conference (Bk Other) Related [+] - Off Calendar. Stipulation for dismissal to be filed and order lodged. Plaintiff's counsel to submit order. (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, December 22, 2023
37 37 misc Status report Fri 12/22 12:05 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company Related [+]. (Worley, Kirsten)
Related: [-] 35 Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case)
Thursday, December 21, 2023
36 36 misc Status report Thu 12/21 4:00 PM
Status report Filed by Defendant G & L Seafood Inc. Related [+]. (Ryan, Peter)
Related: [-] 30 Another Summons Issued
Thursday, November 09, 2023
35 35 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 11/09 2:58 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued Re: Status Conference Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/4/2024 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - Continued To 1-04-24 at 10:00 A.M. Per Another Summons Issued On 10-12-23 (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
34 34 notice Notice Tue 10/24 12:03 PM
Notice of Non-Availability of Counsel Filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company. (Worley, Kirsten)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
33 33 notice Notice Wed 10/18 11:25 AM
Notice of Errata Regarding Notice of Continuance of Status Conference in Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company Related [+]. (Worley, Kirsten)
Related: [-] 24 Notice of Continuance of Status Conference in Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company. (Worley, Kirsten) - See docket entry no.: 25 for corrections Modified on 10/3/2023 (GD). filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company, 25 Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Correct Case Number Format. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE A NOTICE OF ERRATA WITH THE CORRECT DATES IN THE TEXT OF THE NOTICE. YOU PUT AUGUST 31, 2023 IN THE TEXT OF THE NOTICE - THE STATUS CONFERENCE HAS BEEN CONTINUED FROM NOVEMBER 2, 2023 AT 10:00 A.M. TO NOVEMBER 9, 2023 AT 10:00 A.M. PLEASE CORRECT ASAP - THANK YOU (RE: related document(s)24 Notice filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company) (GD)
Saturday, October 14, 2023
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 10/14 9:15 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 10/14/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 31 Notice that Clerk Has Not Entered Default (BNC)
Thursday, October 12, 2023
31 31 misc Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk (BNC) Thu 10/12 4:16 PM
Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk Against Defendant(s) Triet Minh Dinh D.B.A. DT Builders, Inc, a California corporation Related [+] (SD8)
Related: [-] 29 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company
30 30 court Another Summons Issued Thu 10/12 3:48 PM
Another Summons Issued on Kirit Shah Date Issued 10/12/2023, Answer Due 11/13/2023; Sonal Shah Date Issued 10/12/2023, Answer Due 11/13/2023 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/4/2024 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (SD8)
Related: [-] 28 Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Ntc of Status Conf (AP) filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company
29 29 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Thu 10/12 1:57 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Triet Dinh Minh D.B.A. DT Builders, Inc., a California Corporation Filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company. (Worley, Kirsten)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Kirsten Worley in Support of Request for Entry of Default
28 28 misc Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Ntc of Status Conf (AP) Thu 10/12 1:53 PM
Request that the Clerk Issue Another Summons and Notice of Status Conference (LBR 7004-1(a)(1)(B)) Filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company. (Worley, Kirsten)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 10/05 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 10/05/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Notice that Clerk Has Not Entered Default (BNC)
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
26 26 misc Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk (BNC) Tue 10/03 2:14 PM
Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk Against Defendant(s) Triet Minh Dinh D.B.A. DT Builders, Inc, a California Corporation Related [+] (SD8)
Related: [-] 23 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company
25 25 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Tue 10/03 11:19 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Correct Case Number Format. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE A NOTICE OF ERRATA WITH THE CORRECT DATES IN THE TEXT OF THE NOTICE. YOU PUT AUGUST 31, 2023 IN THE TEXT OF THE NOTICE - THE STATUS CONFERENCE HAS BEEN CONTINUED FROM NOVEMBER 2, 2023 AT 10:00 A.M. TO NOVEMBER 9, 2023 AT 10:00 A.M. PLEASE CORRECT ASAP - THANK YOU Related [+] (GD)
Related: [-] 24 Notice filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company
24 24 notice Notice Tue 10/03 9:59 AM
Notice of Continuance of Status Conference in Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company. (Worley, Kirsten) - See docket entry no.: 25 for corrections Modified on 10/3/2023 (GD)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
23 23 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Mon 10/02 5:36 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Triet Minh Dinh D.B.A. DT Builders, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company. (Worley, Kirsten)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Kirsten Worley in Support of Request for Entry of Default
Friday, September 15, 2023
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/15 9:25 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by T&T Excavating Inc.. (Kron, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
21 21 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 08/31 1:03 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued Status Conference Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/2/2023 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert - Continued to November 2, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. The court would like a better articulation of why this needs to be in bankruptcy court. Plaintiff's counsel to give notice. (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company
Friday, August 25, 2023
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 08/25 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 08/25/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Notice that Clerk Has Not Entered Default (BNC)
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 08/25 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 08/25/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Notice that Clerk Has Not Entered Default (BNC)
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 08/25 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 08/25/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Notice that Clerk Has Not Entered Default (BNC)
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 08/25 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 08/25/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Notice that Clerk Has Not Entered Default (BNC)
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
16 16 misc Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk (BNC) Wed 08/23 5:16 PM
Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk Against Defendant(s) Kirit Shah Related [+] (SD8)
Related: [-] 12 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company
15 15 misc Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk (BNC) Wed 08/23 5:09 PM
Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk Against Defendant(s) Triet Minhy Dinh DBA DT Builders, Inc Related [+] (SD8)
Related: [-] 11 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company
14 14 misc Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk (BNC) Wed 08/23 4:47 PM
Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk Against Defendant(s) Sonal Shah Related [+] (SD8)
Related: [-] 10 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company
13 13 misc Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk (BNC) Wed 08/23 4:37 PM
Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk Against Defendant(s) T&T Excavating, Inc, a California Corporation Related [+] (SD8)
Related: [-] 9 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company
12 12 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Wed 08/23 3:29 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Kirit Shah Filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company. (Worley, Kirsten)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Wed 08/23 3:25 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Triet Minh Dinh Filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company. (Worley, Kirsten)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Wed 08/23 3:20 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Sonal Shah Filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company. (Worley, Kirsten)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Wed 08/23 3:11 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to T&T Excavating Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company. (Worley, Kirsten)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 08/23 3:04 PM
Summons Service Executed on Triet Minh Dinh 6/19/2023; G & L Seafood Inc. 6/19/2023; Kirit Shah 6/19/2023; Sonal Shah 6/19/2023; T&T Excavating Inc. 6/19/2023 (Worley, Kirsten)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
7 7 misc Status report Thu 08/17 4:52 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company Related [+]. (Worley, Kirsten)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, August 11, 2023
6 6 misc Status report Fri 08/11 12:51 PM
Joint Status report Filed by Defendant G & L Seafood Inc. Related [+]. (GD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, August 03, 2023
5 5 misc Status report Thu 08/03 9:05 PM
Status report Joint Filed by Defendant G & L Seafood Inc. Related [+]. (Ryan, Peter)
Related: [-] 4 Answer to Complaint
Monday, July 17, 2023
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/17 4:36 PM
Answer to Complaint In Interpleader Filed by G & L Seafood Inc.. (Ryan, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2023
3 3 misc Proof of service Mon 06/19 4:24 PM
Proof of service of Summons and Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company Related [+]. (Worley, Kirsten)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued
Friday, June 16, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 06/16 1:41 PM
Summons Issued on Triet Minh Dinh Date Issued 6/16/2023, Answer Due 7/17/2023; G & L Seafood Inc. Date Issued 6/16/2023, Answer Due 7/17/2023; Kirit Shah Date Issued 6/16/2023, Answer Due 7/17/2023; Sonal Shah Date Issued 6/16/2023, Answer Due 7/17/2023; T&T Excavating Inc. Date Issued 6/16/2023, Answer Due 7/17/2023 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 8/31/2023 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (SD8)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Platte River Insurance Company
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/16 12:22 PM
Adversary case 8:23-ap-01052. Complaint by Platte River Insurance Company against Kirit Shah, Sonal Shah, G & L Seafood Inc., T&T Excavating Inc., Triet Minh Dinh. Fee Amount $350 Complaint for Interpleader Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Worley, Kirsten)
Related: [-]