Mississippi Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Selene D Maddox
Case #: 1:23-bk-11815
Case Filed:Jun 16, 2023
Claims Deadline:Oct 16, 2023
Dismissed:Apr 05, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Southern Motel Inc.
1103 HWY 72 West
Corinth, MS 38834
Represented By
J. Walter Newman, IV
Newman & Newman
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U. S. Trustee
501 East Court Street, Suite 6-430
Jackson, MS 39201


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 12:01 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
court Court Certificate of Mailing Tue 04/22 1:28 PM
Court Certificate of Mailing; cc: COPIES MAILED TO RUBIN LUBLIN of the following related documents Related [+]. Entered on Docket by: (VSD)
Related: [-] 48 Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan filed by Debtor Southern Motel Inc.,55 Objection to Confirmation of the Chapter 11 Plan filed by Creditor Community Loan Servicing, LLC fka Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, as servicer for Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC,62 Order (Generic),66 Order to Show Cause filed by Debtor Southern Motel Inc.,69 Order Dismissing Chapter 11 Case