Walmart Inc. v. King et al
Georgia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | J Randal Hall |
Referred: | Benjamin W Cheesbro |
Case #: | 6:23-cv-00040 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s) |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2023 4:42 AM EST |
Defendant
Merrick Garland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tae Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jean King
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James Mchenry
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walmart Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 16, 2025 | ||
42 | 42
![]() ORDER granting40 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Hashim M. Mooppan terminated. Signed by District Judge J. Randal Hall on 4/16/2025. (pts) |
|
41 | 41
![]() ORDER of USCA granting leave to withdraw the appearance of Hashim M. Mooppan and to substitute Jeffrey R. Johnson as lead counsel as to35 Notice of Appeal filed by Jean King, Tae Johnson, Merrick Garland, James Mchenry, United States of America. (wwp) |
|
Wednesday, April 02, 2025 | ||
40 | 40
![]() MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Hashim M. Mooppan by Walmart Inc.. Responses due by 4/16/2025.(Mooppan, Hashim) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
![]() ORDER of USCA by Clerk granting the extension of time to file reply brief as to35 Notice of Appeal filed by Jean King, Tae Johnson, Merrick Garland, James Mchenry, United States of America. (wwp) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
![]() TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Merrick Garland, Tae Johnson, Jean King, James Mchenry, United States of America for proceedings held on 08/28/2023 before Judge Hall.. (Leithart, Otto) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
![]() USCA Case Number 24-11733 J for35 Notice of Appeal filed by Jean King, Tae Johnson, Merrick Garland, James Mchenry, United States of America. (jlh) |
|
Wednesday, May 22, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
![]() Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to U.S. Court of Appeals re:35 Notice of Appeal. Other Appeals: No. Judge Appealed: J. Randal Hall. Court Reporter: Lisa Davenport. Fee Paid: No. Pending COA/IFP: N/A. (csr) |
|
appeal
FRAP Certificate of Readiness
Wed 05/22 1:02 PM
F.R.A.P. Certificate of Readiness re35 Notice of Appeal. The entire record on appeal is available electronically . (csr) |
||
Tuesday, May 21, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
![]() NOTICE OF APPEAL as to33 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,34 Clerk's Judgment by Merrick Garland, Tae Johnson, Jean King, James Mchenry, United States of America. (Cholera, Kuntal) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
![]() CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Walmart Inc. against United States of America, James Mchenry, Jean King, Merrick Garland, Tae Johnson. Signed on 3/25/2024. (pts) |
|
33 | 33
![]() ORDER granting7 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying Defendant's18 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants are permanently enjoined from directly or indirectly continuing the Underlying ALJ Proceedings conducted by the DOJ's OCAHO to determine whether to impose civil penalties against Walmart for alleged violations of immigration-related recordkeeping requirements. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff and close this case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 3/25/2024. (pts) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
![]() NOTICE by Walmart Inc. re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Supplemental Authority(Mooppan, Hashim) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, December 08, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
![]() ORDER granting re30 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Thomas Elliot Gaiser terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 12/8/23. (loh) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
![]() MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney T. Elliot Gaiser as Counsel by Walmart Inc.. Responses due by 12/1/2023.(Gaiser, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, November 16, 2023 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 11/16 9:20 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/27/2023 03:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro is cancelled pending further notice by the Court. (KM) |
||
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
![]() NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 8/28/23, before Judge JRH. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Davenport, Telephone number 706-823-6468. Tape Number: FTR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (Transcript Redaction Policy Issued or Click here to view[LINK:Transcript Redaction Policy] ) Redaction Request due 10/31/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/13/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/8/2024. (Davenport, Lisa) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
![]() NOTICE by Merrick Garland, Tae Johnson, Jean King, James Mchenry, United States of America (Cholera, Kuntal) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge J. Randal Hall: Motion Hearing held on 8/28/2023 re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Walmart Inc. Court takes matter under advisement. (Court Reporter Lisa Davenport.) (lcw) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
![]() ORDER granting21 MOTION for Hearing re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. A hearing on the pending motion for preliminary injunction will take place on MONDAY, AUGUST 28, 2023 AT 3:00 P.M. in the Second Floor Courtroom of the United States District Court located at 600 James Brown Boulevard, Augusta, Georgia 30901. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 8/11/23. (loh) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 08/11 11:50 AM
Set/Reset Hearing: Motion Hearing re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction set for 8/28/2023 at 03:00 PM in Augusta - 2nd Floor before Chief Judge J. Randal Hall. (loh) |
||
Friday, August 04, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/15/2023. Discovery due by 11/29/2023. Motions due by 12/29/2023. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 9/29/2023. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 10/29/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 8/4/23. (loh) |
|
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 08/04 5:07 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/27/2023 03:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. Dial-in instructions will be provided by Courtroom Deputy prior to scheduled call. (KM) |
||
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
![]() SUR REPLY re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Merrick Garland, Tae Johnson, Jean King, James Mchenry, United States of America. (Cholera, Kuntal) |
|
23 | 23
![]() NOTICE of Intent to file Sur-reply by Merrick Garland, Tae Johnson, Jean King, James Mchenry, United States of America. (Cholera, Kuntal) |
|
22 | 22
![]() REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mooppan, Hashim) |
|
21 | 21
![]() MOTION for Hearing re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Walmart Inc.. Responses due by 8/15/2023. (Mooppan, Hashim) |
|
utility
Motions Referred
Tue 08/01 4:36 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:22 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (thb) |
||
Thursday, July 27, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
![]() REPLY to Response to Motion re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Walmart Inc.. (Mooppan, Hashim) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
![]() NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief by Walmart Inc. re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Mooppan, Hashim) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Merrick Garland, Tae Johnson, Jean King, James Mchenry, United States of America.(Cholera, Kuntal) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, June 27, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ORDER granting re12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 7/13/2023. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 6/26/23. (loh) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Tue 06/27 11:17 AM
TEXT ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hashim Mooppan. Joseph Finley has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on June 27, 2023. (edd) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Tue 06/27 11:18 AM
TEXT ORDER granting6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Gaiser. Joseph Finley has entered an appearance in this case and vouches he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel, as this Court's Local Rule 83.4 requires. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on June 27, 2023. (edd) |
||
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Litigants' Bill of Rights by Walmart Inc.. (Finley, Joseph) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 06/23/2023. (jlh) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Merrick Garland, Tae Johnson, Jean King, James Mchenry, United States of America. Responses due by 7/6/2023. (Cholera, Kuntal) |
|
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re:10 Notice of Appearance. (csr) |
|
utility
Motions Referred
Thu 06/22 2:04 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (csr) |
||
utility
Motions No Longer Referred
Thu 06/22 3:26 PM
Motions No Longer Referred:12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (pts) |
||
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Kuntal Cholera on behalf of All Defendants (Cholera, Kuntal) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Otto Woelke Leithart on behalf of All Defendants (Leithart, Otto) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re:5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (csr) |
|
utility
Motions Referred
Tue 06/20 8:54 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED:5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3605477, Fee Amount $200;6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice T. Elliot Gaiser Receipt Number AGASDC-3605510, Fee Amount $200. (csr) |
||
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Walmart Inc.. Responses due by 6/30/2023.(Finley, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
6 | 6
![]() MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice T. Elliot Gaiser Receipt Number AGASDC-3605510, Fee Amount $200, by Walmart Inc.. Responses due by 6/30/2023.(Finley, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-3605477, Fee Amount $200, by Walmart Inc.. Responses due by 6/30/2023.(Finley, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 6/16/23. (wwp) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued as to Merrick Garland, Tae Johnson, Jean King, James Mchenry, United States of America.(wwp) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) by Walmart Inc. (wwp) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Merrick Garland, Tae Johnson, Jean King, James Mchenry, United States of America, filed by Walmart Inc.(wwp) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 06/16 2:53 PM
Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number BGASDC - 3604721. (wwp) |