Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Henry Edward Autrey
Case #: 4:23-cv-00783
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Jun 16, 2023
Terminated:Apr 18, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2023 8:38 AM CST
Defendant
AJ Sherman Plumbing Co., LLC
Plaintiff
Dennis Corrigan
3640 Corporate Trail Drive
Earth City, MO 63045
Represented By
Michael A. Evans
Hartnett Reyes-Jones LLC
contact info
Daniel Sparks
Hartnett Reyes-Jones LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Neil Haberberger
3460 Corporate Trail Drive
Earth City, MO 63045
Represented By
Michael A. Evans
Hartnett Reyes-Jones LLC
contact info
Daniel Sparks
Hartnett Reyes-Jones LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Kellett
3640 Corporate Trail Drive
Earth City, MO 63045
Represented By
Michael A. Evans
Hartnett Reyes-Jones LLC
contact info
Daniel Sparks
Hartnett Reyes-Jones LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert C. Mitchell
in Their Representative Capacities as Trustees of 3640 Corporate Trail Drive
Earth City, MO 63045
Represented By
Michael A. Evans
Hartnett Reyes-Jones LLC
contact info
Daniel Sparks
Hartnett Reyes-Jones LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Morgan
12385 Larimore Road
St. Louis, MO 63138
Represented By
Michael A. Evans
Hartnett Reyes-Jones LLC
contact info
Daniel Sparks
Hartnett Reyes-Jones LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
James Murphy
Represented By
Michael A. Evans
Hartnett Reyes-Jones LLC
contact info
Daniel Sparks
Hartnett Reyes-Jones LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Nichols
Represented By
Michael A. Evans
Hartnett Reyes-Jones LLC
contact info
Daniel Sparks
Hartnett Reyes-Jones LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael O'Connell, III
Represented By
Michael A. Evans
Hartnett Reyes-Jones LLC
contact info
Daniel Sparks
Hartnett Reyes-Jones LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John O'Mara
Represented By
Michael A. Evans
Hartnett Reyes-Jones LLC
contact info
Daniel Sparks
Hartnett Reyes-Jones LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562
Represented By
Michael A. Evans
Hartnett Reyes-Jones LLC
contact info
Daniel Sparks
Hartnett Reyes-Jones LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562 Supplemental Pension Plan and Trust
Represented By
Michael A. Evans
Hartnett Reyes-Jones LLC
contact info
Daniel Sparks
Hartnett Reyes-Jones LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Plumbers and Pipefitters Pension Fund
3640 Corporate Trail Drive
Earth City, MO 63045
Represented By
Michael A. Evans
Hartnett Reyes-Jones LLC
contact info
Daniel Sparks
Hartnett Reyes-Jones LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Plumbers and Pipefitters Welfare Educational Fund
3640 Corporate Trail Drive
Earth City, MO 63045
Represented By
Michael A. Evans
Hartnett Reyes-Jones LLC
contact info
Daniel Sparks
Hartnett Reyes-Jones LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 62 minutes ago
Monday, March 03, 2025
25 25 order A Docket Text Order Mon 03/03 3:43 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:24 MOTION to Withdraw15 MOTION for Contempt by Plaintiffs Dennis Corrigan, Neil Haberberger, Richard Kellett, Robert C. Mitchell, Mark Morgan, James Murphy, Brian Nichols, Michael O'Connell, III, John O'Mara, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562 Supplemental Pension Plan and Trust, Plumbers and Pipefitters Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Welfare Educational Fund; GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/3/2025. (JEB)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
24 24 motion Withdraw Fri 02/28 2:58 PM
MOTION to Withdraw15 MOTION for Contempt by Plaintiffs Dennis Corrigan, Neil Haberberger, Richard Kellett, Robert C. Mitchell, Mark Morgan, James Murphy, Brian Nichols, Michael O'Connell, III, John O'Mara, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562 Supplemental Pension Plan and Trust, Plumbers and Pipefitters Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Welfare Educational Fund. (Sparks, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
23 23 misc Entry of Appearance Wed 02/26 2:48 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Tyler Steven Manuel for Defendant AJ Sherman Plumbing Co., LLC. (Manuel, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
22 22 order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Fri 09/13 10:20 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:20 MOTION to Hold in Abeyance Re:15 MOTION for Contempt filed by Plaintiffs Dennis Corrigan, Neil Haberberger, Richard Kellett, Robert C. Mitchell, Mark Morgan, James Murphy, Brian Nichols, Michael O'Connell, III, John O'Mara, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562 Supplemental Pension Plan and Trust, Plumbers and Pipefitters Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Welfare Educational Fund; GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 9/13/2024. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
21 21 service Marshal Return Thu 09/12 3:50 PM
MARSHAL Return Executed party served: AJ Sherman Plumbing Co., LLC and James Sherman. (JEB)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Supplement Thu 09/12 2:17 PM
MOTION to Supplement15 MOTION for Contempt Motion to Hold in Abeyance Motion for Contempt by Plaintiffs Dennis Corrigan, Neil Haberberger, Richard Kellett, Robert C. Mitchell, Mark Morgan, James Murphy, Brian Nichols, Michael O'Connell, III, John O'Mara, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562 Supplemental Pension Plan and Trust, Plumbers and Pipefitters Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Welfare Educational Fund. (Sparks, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
19 19 misc Entry of Appearance Wed 09/11 2:56 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Alexander James Lindley for Defendant AJ Sherman Plumbing Co., LLC. (Lindley, Alexander)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Entry of Appearance Wed 09/11 2:53 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Michael E. Kaemmerer for Defendant AJ Sherman Plumbing Co., LLC. (Kaemmerer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) Wed 09/04 3:32 PM
ORDER: Defendant is ORDERED to appear before this Court no later than September 13, 2024, at 1:30 p.m. in the courtroom of the undersigned, complete with requested documents, and to sit for his deposition at that time. Sanctions will be assessed against the Defendant for each day the Defendant does not appear before this Court as ordered. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Defendant is to pay Plaintiffs' reasonable attorneys' fees and costs associated with having to bring the Motion for Contempt. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshal will serve the Defendant: AJ Sherman Plumbing Co., LLC, and James Sherman at 344 Villa Duschene Dr.,Warrenton, MO 63383 to compel their appearance on September 13, 2024, at 1:30 p.m. in the courtroom of the undersigned. (Contempt Hearing set for 9/13/2024 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10N - St. Louis before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 9/4/2024. (JEB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
16 16 respm Response to Motion Tue 09/03 10:58 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re15 MOTION for Contempt filed by Plaintiffs Dennis Corrigan, Neil Haberberger, Richard Kellett, Robert C. Mitchell, Mark Morgan, James Murphy, Brian Nichols, Michael O'Connell, III, John O'Mara, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562 Supplemental Pension Plan and Trust, Plumbers and Pipefitters Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Welfare Educational Fund.(Sparks, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Daniel Sparks,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Record of Non-Appearance of Witness James Sherman
15 15 motion Contempt Tue 09/03 10:56 AM
MOTION for Contempt by Plaintiffs Dennis Corrigan, Neil Haberberger, Richard Kellett, Robert C. Mitchell, Mark Morgan, James Murphy, Brian Nichols, Michael O'Connell, III, John O'Mara, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562 Supplemental Pension Plan and Trust, Plumbers and Pipefitters Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Welfare Educational Fund. (Sparks, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
14 14 order A Docket Text Order Thu 07/25 7:26 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:12 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Plaintiffs Dennis Corrigan, Neil Haberberger, Richard Kellett, Robert C. Mitchell, Mark Morgan, James Murphy, Brian Nichols, Michael O'Connell, III, John O'Mara, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562 Supplemental Pension Plan and Trust, Plumbers and Pipefitters Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Welfare Educational Fund. (Sparks, Daniel); The Motion to Compel is GRANTED. So Ordered. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 07/25/2024. (ANR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
13 13 2 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 06/05 4:32 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re12 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Plaintiffs Dennis Corrigan, Neil Haberberger, Richard Kellett, Robert C. Mitchell, Mark Morgan, James Murphy, Brian Nichols, Michael O'Connell, III, John O'Mara, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562 Supplemental Pension Plan and Trust, Plumbers and Pipefitters Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Welfare Educational Fund.(Sparks, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit The Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit No Show for Deposition
12 12 motion Compel Wed 06/05 4:30 PM
MOTION to Compel Discovery by Plaintiffs Dennis Corrigan, Neil Haberberger, Richard Kellett, Robert C. Mitchell, Mark Morgan, James Murphy, Brian Nichols, Michael O'Connell, III, John O'Mara, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562 Supplemental Pension Plan and Trust, Plumbers and Pipefitters Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Welfare Educational Fund. (Sparks, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/19 10:57 AM
NOTICE Rule 69 Deposition and Request for Production of Documents: by Plaintiffs Dennis Corrigan, Neil Haberberger, Richard Kellett, Robert C. Mitchell, Mark Morgan, James Murphy, Brian Nichols, Michael O'Connell, III, John O'Mara, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562 Supplemental Pension Plan and Trust, Plumbers and Pipefitters Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Welfare Educational Fund (Sparks, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
10 10 order Judgment - (Case) Thu 04/18 1:51 PM
JUDGMENT: WHEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED those plaintiffs shall recover from defendant a judgment in the amount of $57,015.50. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 04/18/2024. (ANR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
9 9 3 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 10/03 4:11 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Party AJ Sherman Plumbing Co., LLC filed by Plaintiffs Dennis Corrigan, Neil Haberberger, Richard Kellett, Robert C. Mitchell, Mark Morgan, James Murphy, Brian Nichols, Michael O'Connell, III, John O'Mara, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562 Supplemental Pension Plan and Trust, Plumbers and Pipefitters Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Welfare Educational Fund.(Sparks, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Affidavit Affidavit of Daniel Sparks,
Att: 7 Affidavit Affidavit of Mark Collom,
Att: 8 Attachment Proposed Order of Judgment
8 8 motion Default Judgment Party Only Tue 10/03 4:06 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Party AJ Sherman Plumbing Co., LLC by Plaintiffs Dennis Corrigan, Neil Haberberger, Richard Kellett, Robert C. Mitchell, Mark Morgan, James Murphy, Brian Nichols, Michael O'Connell, III, John O'Mara, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562 Supplemental Pension Plan and Trust, Plumbers and Pipefitters Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Welfare Educational Fund. (Sparks, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
7 7 order Clerks Entry of Default Thu 08/31 11:58 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant AJ Sherman Plumbing Co., LLC. (HMA) (copy mailed to defendant AJ Sherman Plumbing Co. on 8/31/23)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
misc Remark Wed 08/30 9:28 AM
***REMARK: Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default was forwarded to the Clerk of Court/Chief Deputy for ruling. (JEB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
6 6 motion Default Entry Tue 08/29 1:08 PM
MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against AJ Sherman Plumbing Co., LLC by Plaintiffs Dennis Corrigan, Neil Haberberger, Richard Kellett, Robert C. Mitchell, Mark Morgan, James Murphy, Brian Nichols, Michael O'Connell, III, John O'Mara, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562 Supplemental Pension Plan and Trust, Plumbers and Pipefitters Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Welfare Educational Fund.(Sparks, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Entry of Default by the Clerk
Monday, August 07, 2023
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 08/07 2:50 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Dennis Corrigan, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562 Supplemental Pension Plan and Trust, John O'Mara, Michael O'Connell, III, Neil Haberberger, Plumbers and Pipefitters Welfare Educational Fund, Brian Nichols, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562, Richard Kellett, Robert C. Mitchell, Mark Morgan, Plumbers and Pipefitters Pension Fund, James Murphy. AJ Sherman Plumbing Co., LLC served on 8/5/2023, answer due 8/28/2023. (Sparks, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
4 4 misc Entry of Appearance Fri 06/16 3:51 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Michael A. Evans for Plaintiffs Dennis Corrigan, Neil Haberberger, Richard Kellett, Robert C. Mitchell, Mark Morgan, James Murphy, Brian Nichols, Michael O'Connell, III, John O'Mara, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562 Supplemental Pension Plan and Trust, Plumbers and Pipefitters Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Welfare Educational Fund. (Evans, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Notice of Process Server Fri 06/16 3:29 PM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Dennis Corrigan, Neil Haberberger, Richard Kellett, Robert C. Mitchell, Mark Morgan, James Murphy, Brian Nichols, John O'Brain, Michael J. O'Connell, III, John O'Mara, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562 Supplemental Pension Plan and Trust, Plumbers and Pipefitters Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Welfare Educational Fund Process Server: Frederick Investigations, Inc. (JBH)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Fri 06/16 2:19 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dennis Corrigan, Neil Haberberger, Richard Kellett, Robert C. Mitchell, Mark Morgan, James Murphy, Brian Nichols, Michael J. O'Connell, III, John O'Mara, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562 Supplemental Pension Plan and Trust, Plumbers and Pipefitters Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Welfare Educational Fund. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Sparks, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/16 2:17 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant AJ Sherman Plumbing Co., LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-10004132, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Dennis Corrigan, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562 Supplemental Pension Plan and Trust, Michael J. O'Connell, III, Neil Haberberger, Plumbers and Pipefitters Welfare Educational Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 562, Richard Kellett, Robert C. Mitchell, Mark Morgan, Plumbers and Pipefitters Pension Fund, James Murphy, Brian Nichols, John O'Mara.(Sparks, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form,
Att: 3 Attachment Notice of Process Server,
Att: 4 Summons Summons
misc Case Opening Notification Fri 06/16 3:53 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry Edward Autrey. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Daniel Sparks. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JBH)
Related: [-]