Florida Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen K Specie
Case #: 1:23-bk-10112
Case Filed:Jun 16, 2023
Terminated:Jun 21, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Jan 26, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Tanner Construction Group, LLC, Debtor
16407 NW 174th Dr, Ste D
Alachua, FL 32615
Represented By
Lisa Caryl Cohen
Ruff & Cohen, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
110 E. Park Avenue Suite 128
Tallahassee, FL 32301


Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago
Wednesday, December 25, 2024
302 302 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/26 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 292 Notice of Assignment & Substitution of Claim (Negative Notice).
301 301 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/26 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 291 Notice of Assignment & Substitution of Claim (Negative Notice).
300 300 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/26 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 290 Notice of Assignment & Substitution of Claim (Negative Notice).
299 299 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/26 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 289 Notice of Assignment & Substitution of Claim (Negative Notice).
298 298 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/26 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 288 Notice of Assignment & Substitution of Claim (Negative Notice).
297 297 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/26 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 287 Notice of Assignment & Substitution of Claim (Negative Notice).
296 296 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/26 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 286 Notice of Assignment & Substitution of Claim (Negative Notice).
295 295 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/26 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 285 Notice of Assignment & Substitution of Claim (Negative Notice).
294 294 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/26 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 284 Notice of Assignment & Substitution of Claim (Negative Notice).
293 293 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/26 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 12/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 282 Notice of Assignment & Substitution of Claim (Negative Notice).
Monday, December 23, 2024
292 292 claims Notice of Assignment/Transfer of Claim (Clerk's Notice) (PDF/Form) Mon 12/23 12:22 PM
Notice of Assignment/Transfer of Claim and Notice of Substitution re Claim Number 3 Related [+] Service by the Court pursuant to applicable Rules. (Hawkins, J.)
Related: [-] 272 Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim.
291 291 claims Notice of Assignment/Transfer of Claim (Clerk's Notice) (PDF/Form) Mon 12/23 12:17 PM
Notice of Assignment/Transfer of Claim and Notice of Substitution re Claim Number 6 Related [+] Service by the Court pursuant to applicable Rules. (Hawkins, J.)
Related: [-] 271 Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim.
290 290 claims Notice of Assignment/Transfer of Claim (Clerk's Notice) (PDF/Form) Mon 12/23 12:15 PM
Notice of Assignment/Transfer of Claim and Notice of Substitution re Claim Number 5 Related [+] Service by the Court pursuant to applicable Rules. (Hawkins, J.)
Related: [-] 270 Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim.
289 289 claims Notice of Assignment/Transfer of Claim (Clerk's Notice) (PDF/Form) Mon 12/23 12:07 PM
Notice of Assignment/Transfer of Claim and Notice of Substitution re Claim Number 4 Related [+] Service by the Court pursuant to applicable Rules. (Hawkins, J.)
Related: [-] 269 Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim.
288 288 claims Notice of Assignment/Transfer of Claim (Clerk's Notice) (PDF/Form) Mon 12/23 12:04 PM
Notice of Assignment/Transfer of Claim and Notice of Substitution re Claim Number 7 Related [+] Service by the Court pursuant to applicable Rules. (Hawkins, J.)
Related: [-] 268 Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim.
287 287 claims Notice of Assignment/Transfer of Claim (Clerk's Notice) (PDF/Form) Mon 12/23 12:01 PM
Notice of Assignment/Transfer of Claim and Notice of Substitution re Claim Number 11 Related [+] Service by the Court pursuant to applicable Rules. (Hawkins, J.)
Related: [-] 267 Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim.
286 286 claims Notice of Assignment/Transfer of Claim (Clerk's Notice) (PDF/Form) Mon 12/23 11:58 AM
Notice of Assignment/Transfer of Claim and Notice of Substitution re Claim Number 8 Related [+] Service by the Court pursuant to applicable Rules. (Hawkins, J.)
Related: [-] 266 Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim.
285 285 claims Notice of Assignment/Transfer of Claim (Clerk's Notice) (PDF/Form) Mon 12/23 11:55 AM
Notice of Assignment/Transfer of Claim and Notice of Substitution re Claim Number 9 Related [+] Service by the Court pursuant to applicable Rules. (Hawkins, J.)
Related: [-] 265 Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim.
284 284 claims Notice of Assignment/Transfer of Claim (Clerk's Notice) (PDF/Form) Mon 12/23 11:52 AM
Amended Notice of Assignment/Transfer of Claim and Notice of Substitution re Claim Number 10 Related [+] Service by the Court pursuant to applicable Rules. (Hawkins, J.)
Related: [-] 264 Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim.
283 283 claims Notice of Assignment/Transfer of Claim (Clerk's Notice) (PDF/Form) Mon 12/23 11:48 AM
ENTERED IN ERROR - Please disregard. Notice of Assignment/Transfer of Claim and Notice of Substitution re Claim Number 9 Related [+] Service by the Court pursuant to applicable Rules. (Hawkins, J.)
Related: [-] 265 Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim.
282 282 claims Notice of Assignment/Transfer of Claim (Clerk's Notice) (PDF/Form) Mon 12/23 11:45 AM
Notice of Assignment/Transfer of Claim and Notice of Substitution re Claim Number 10 Related [+] Service by the Court pursuant to applicable Rules. (Hawkins, J.)
Related: [-] 264 Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim.
Friday, December 20, 2024
281 281 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Online Payment Fri 12/20 7:51 AM
Receipt of Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim([LINK 23-10112 KKS] ) [notice,tfrclm] ( 28.00) filing fee. Receipt number A5447656, amount $ 28.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 272
280 280 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Online Payment Fri 12/20 7:51 AM
Receipt of Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim([LINK 23-10112 KKS] ) [notice,tfrclm] ( 28.00) filing fee. Receipt number A5447656, amount $ 28.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 271
279 279 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Online Payment Fri 12/20 7:51 AM
Receipt of Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim([LINK 23-10112 KKS] ) [notice,tfrclm] ( 28.00) filing fee. Receipt number A5447656, amount $ 28.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 270
278 278 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Online Payment Fri 12/20 7:51 AM
Receipt of Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim([LINK 23-10112 KKS] ) [notice,tfrclm] ( 28.00) filing fee. Receipt number A5447656, amount $ 28.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 269
277 277 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Online Payment Fri 12/20 7:51 AM
Receipt of Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim([LINK 23-10112 KKS] ) [notice,tfrclm] ( 28.00) filing fee. Receipt number A5447656, amount $ 28.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 268
276 276 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Online Payment Fri 12/20 7:51 AM
Receipt of Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim([LINK 23-10112 KKS] ) [notice,tfrclm] ( 28.00) filing fee. Receipt number A5447656, amount $ 28.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 267
275 275 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Online Payment Fri 12/20 7:51 AM
Receipt of Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim([LINK 23-10112 KKS] ) [notice,tfrclm] ( 28.00) filing fee. Receipt number A5447656, amount $ 28.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 266
274 274 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Online Payment Fri 12/20 7:51 AM
Receipt of Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim([LINK 23-10112 KKS] ) [notice,tfrclm] ( 28.00) filing fee. Receipt number A5447656, amount $ 28.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 265
273 273 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Online Payment Fri 12/20 7:51 AM
Receipt of Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim([LINK 23-10112 KKS] ) [notice,tfrclm] ( 28.00) filing fee. Receipt number A5447656, amount $ 28.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 264
272 272 notice Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim Fri 12/20 3:19 AM
Assignment/Transfer of Claim(s) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: *Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC (Claim No. 3) To Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC Fee amount $28 To Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC Filed by Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC (Gandhi, Shreyansh)
Related: [-]
271 271 notice Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim Fri 12/20 3:18 AM
Assignment/Transfer of Claim(s) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: *Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC (Claim No. 6) To Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC Fee amount $28 To Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC Filed by Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC (Gandhi, Shreyansh)
Related: [-]
270 270 notice Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim Fri 12/20 3:18 AM
Assignment/Transfer of Claim(s) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: *Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC (Claim No. 5) To Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC Fee amount $28 To Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC Filed by Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC (Gandhi, Shreyansh)
Related: [-]
269 269 notice Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim Fri 12/20 3:17 AM
Assignment/Transfer of Claim(s) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: *Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC (Claim No. 4) To Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC Fee amount $28 To Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC Filed by Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC (Gandhi, Shreyansh)
Related: [-]
268 268 notice Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim Fri 12/20 3:17 AM
Assignment/Transfer of Claim(s) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: *Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC (Claim No. 7) To Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC Fee amount $28 To Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC Filed by Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC (Gandhi, Shreyansh)
Related: [-]
267 267 notice Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim Fri 12/20 3:16 AM
Assignment/Transfer of Claim(s) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: *Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC (Claim No. 11) To Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC Fee amount $28 To Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC Filed by Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC (Gandhi, Shreyansh)
Related: [-]
266 266 notice Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim Fri 12/20 3:15 AM
Assignment/Transfer of Claim(s) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: *Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC (Claim No. 8) To Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC Fee amount $28 To Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC Filed by Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC (Gandhi, Shreyansh)
Related: [-]
265 265 notice Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim Fri 12/20 3:15 AM
Assignment/Transfer of Claim(s) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: *Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC (Claim No. 9) To Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC Fee amount $28 To Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC Filed by Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC (Gandhi, Shreyansh)
Related: [-]
264 264 notice Notice of Transfer/Assignment of Claim Fri 12/20 3:14 AM
Assignment/Transfer of Claim(s) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: *Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC (Claim No. 10) To Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC Fee amount $28 To Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC4515 N. Santa Fe Ave. Dept. APSOklahoma City, OK 73118 Filed by Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC (Gandhi, Shreyansh)
Related: [-]