AV Residence, LLC
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Dennis Montali |
Case #: | 3:23-bk-30392 |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2023 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jul 25, 2023 |
Claims Deadline: | Oct 23, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 29, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
AV Residence, LLC
2741 Vallejo Street
San Francisco, CA 94123 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Not Assigned - SF
|
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF
Phillip J. Burton Federal Building 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102 |
Docket last updated: 40 minutes ago |
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 07/29 4:22 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (jmb) |