New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Judge:David S Jones
Case #: 1:23-ap-01133
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2023
Terminated:Nov 22, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Great Rock Capital Partners Management, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Fourmaux
Friedman Kaplan Seiler Adelman & Robbins LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lilian D. Zacky, individually
Represented By
Lilian D. Zacky
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 11/22 9:46 AM
Adversary Case 1:23-ap-1133 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
24 24 misc Certificate of Mailing - Inter-District Transfer Fri 11/10 12:11 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Inter-District Transfer Related [+] . Notice Date 11/09/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #23 )
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
23 23 misc Notice, Inter-District Transfer in an Adversary or Miscellaneous Proceeding (BNC) Tue 11/07 4:34 PM
Notice of Inter-District Transfer to U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Central District of California, Los Angeles Division, Under Case Number 2:23-ap-01464. (Gomez, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
25 25 misc Transcript Mon 11/20 3:20 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 11/2/2023 RE: Motion filed by the defendant to Transfer Venue of Adversary Proceeding; Opposition Filed by the Plaintiff. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 2/5/2024. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: eScribers, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/13/2023. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 11/27/2023. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 12/7/2023. Transcript access will be restricted through 2/5/2024. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
22 22 order Motion, Transfer Venue Fri 11/03 1:04 PM
Order Signed on 11/3/2023 Granting the Motion of Great Rock Captial Partners Management, LLC for an Order Transferring Venue of this Adversary Proceeding to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Central District of California, Los Angeles Division. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 10
Monday, October 30, 2023
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Mon 10/30 3:53 PM
Certificate of Service re Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion for an Order Transferring Venue of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Filed by Cynthia M. Cohen on behalf of Great Rock Capital Partners Management, LLC. (Cohen, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 20
20 20 answer Reply Mon 10/30 2:44 PM
Reply to Motion in Further Support of Motion of Great Rock Capital Partners Management, LLC for an Order Transferring Venue of Adversary Proceeding filed by Cynthia M. Cohen on behalf of Great Rock Capital Partners Management, LLC. (Cohen, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
19 19 answer Declaration Thu 10/26 3:09 PM
Declaration of Service filed by Joseph Tripodi on behalf of Lilian D. Zacky. (Tripodi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
18 18 answer Opposition Brief Thu 10/26 2:54 PM
Opposition Brief to Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Joseph Tripodi on behalf of Lilian D. Zacky. with hearing to be held on 11/2/2023 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (DSJ) (Tripodi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
17 17 misc Transcript Fri 10/20 8:39 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 10/17/2023 at 10:00 AM RE: Motion Filed by the Defendant to Transfer Venue of Adversary Proceeding; Opposition Filed by Plaintiff. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/16/2024. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: eScr i ber s, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/25/2023. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 11/8/2023. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/20/2023. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/16/2024. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
16 16 order Scheduling Order Tue 10/17 12:22 PM
Scheduling Order Signed on 10/17/2023 Regarding Motions to (I) Abstain and (II) Transfer Venue. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 7 ,10
Monday, October 16, 2023
15 15 answer Affirmation Mon 10/16 6:06 PM
Affirmation of Service filed by Joseph Tripodi on behalf of Lilian D. Zacky. (Tripodi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Mon 10/16 1:40 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Jeffrey C. Fourmaux on behalf of Great Rock Capital Partners Management, LLC. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 11 ,13
13 13 answer Declaration Mon 10/16 1:27 PM
Reply Declaration in Support of the Motion to Transfer Venue of Adversary Proceedings and in Response to the Declaration Filed by Opposing Counsel Related [+] filed by Jeffrey C. Fourmaux on behalf of Great Rock Capital Partners Management, LLC. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 10
Sunday, October 15, 2023
12 12 answer Declaration Sun 10/15 8:49 PM
Declaration In Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Joseph Tripodi on behalf of Lilian D. Zacky. with hearing to be held on 10/17/2023 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (DSJ) (Tripodi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
11 11 misc Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Fri 10/13 4:21 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 With Proposed Order Related [+] Filed by Jeffrey C. Fourmaux on behalf of Great Rock Capital Partners Management, LLC. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 10
Monday, October 02, 2023
10 10 motion Motion, Transfer Venue Mon 10/02 5:51 PM
Motion to Transfer Venue of Adversary Proceeding filed by Cynthia M. Cohen on behalf of Great Rock Capital Partners Management, LLC with hearing to be held on 10/17/2023 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (DSJ) Responses due by 10/10/2023,. (Cohen, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Declaration of Cynthia M. Cohen
Att: 3 Request for Judicial Notice
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
9 9 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Wed 09/06 3:17 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Related [+] filed by Jeffrey C. Fourmaux on behalf of Great Rock Capital Partners Management, LLC. with hearing to be held on 11/2/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (DSJ) (Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, July 27, 2023
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Thu 07/27 11:22 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Joseph Tripodi on behalf of Lilian D. Zacky. (Tripodi, Joseph)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
7 7 motion Motion, Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 07/25 2:35 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Under Abstention & Remand filed by Joseph Tripodi on behalf of Lilian D. Zacky. with hearing to be held on 9/14/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (DSJ) Responses due by 9/7/2023, (Tripodi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pleading Notice of Motion
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex.1 State Court Complaint
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 2 Notice of Removal
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. 3 March 2019 Settlement Agreement
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex.4 Sept. 2019 ZSP Settlement Agreement
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. 5 October 2019 Letter Agreement
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. 6 Zacky & Sons Bankruptcy Report
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex. 7 Proposed Order
6 6 notice Notice, Appearance in Adversary Proceeding Tue 07/25 2:13 PM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Joseph Tripodi on behalf of Lilian D. Zacky. (Tripodi, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
5 5 ans Amended Answer to Complaint Wed 06/28 5:08 PM
Amended Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Cynthia M. Cohen on behalf of Great Rock Capital Partners Management, LLC.(Cohen, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 4
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
4 4 answer None Tue 06/27 10:02 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Cynthia M. Cohen on behalf of Great Rock Capital Partners Management, LLC. (Cohen, Cynthia)
Related: [-] []1
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Tue 06/20 2:00 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Removal Filed by Jeffrey C. Fourmaux on behalf of Great Rock Capital Partners Management, LLC. (Fourmaux, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice ~Generic~ NOTICE Tue 06/20 12:05 PM
This case is related to a bankruptcy case filed in the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Central District of California: Zacky & Sons Poultry, LLC, Case Number: 18-23361 (rk). (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Transfer Order Tue 06/20 11:08 AM
Copy of Certified Order Transferring Case No. 1:23-cv-5139 (JPC) from the U.S. District Court, S.D.N.Y. to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, S.D.N.Y. Related [+]. Nature(s) of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Filed by Lilian D. Zacky, Jeffrey C. Fourmaux. (Pisarczyk, Gladys)
Related: [-] ceipt Number 27888586, Fee Amount $ 350.
Att: 1 Exhibit Doc #2 Civil Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Exhibit Doc # 3 Rule 7.1
Att: 3 Exhibit Doc #4 SDNY Transfer Order
Att: 4 Exhibit SDNY Docket Sheet