Washington Western District Court
Judge:John H Chun
Case #: 2:23-cv-00932
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Case Filed:Jun 21, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 19, 2023 1:08 AM PST
Amicus
Association of Corporate Counsel
Represented By
Andrew George
Baker Botts Llp (dc)
contact info
Clifford Scott Davidson
Snell & Wilmer (wa)
contact info
Maureen K Ohlhausen
Baker Botts Llp (dc)
contact info
Amicus
Chamber of Progress
Represented By
Stephanie A Joyce
Computer & Communications Industry Association
contact info
Duncan Calvert Turner
Badgley Mullins Turner PLLC
contact info
Amicus
Computer & Communications Industry Association
Represented By
Stephanie A Joyce
Computer & Communications Industry Association
contact info
Duncan Calvert Turner
Badgley Mullins Turner PLLC
contact info
Amicus
Interactive Advertising Bureau, Inc.
Represented By
Corey W Roush
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld Llp (dc)
contact info
Brian D Buckley
Fenwick & West (wa)
contact info
Amicus
NetChoice, LLC
Represented By
Stephanie A Joyce
Computer & Communications Industry Association
contact info
Duncan Calvert Turner
Badgley Mullins Turner PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Amazon.com Inc
Represented By
John E Hall
Covington & Burling Llp (sf)
contact info
Moez M Kaba
Hueston Hennigan Llp (la)
contact info
Stephen P Anthony
Covington & Burling Llp (dc)
contact info
Joseph A Reiter
Hueston Hennigan Llp (la)
contact info
James E Howard
Davis Wright Tremaine (sea)
contact info
Laura Flahive Wu
Covington & Burling Llp (dc)
contact info
Kenneth E Payson
Davis Wright Tremaine (sea)
contact info
John D Graubert
Covington & Burling Llp (dc)
contact info
Laura M Kim
Covington & Burling Llp (dc)
contact info
John C Hueston
Hueston Hennigan Llp (newport Beach)
contact info
Megan L Rodgers
Covington & Burling Llp (palo Alto)
contact info
Defendant
Jamil Ghani
Represented By
John E Hall
Covington & Burling Llp (sf)
contact info
Moez M Kaba
Hueston Hennigan Llp (la)
contact info
Stephen P Anthony
Covington & Burling Llp (dc)
contact info
Joseph A Reiter
Hueston Hennigan Llp (la)
contact info
James E Howard
Davis Wright Tremaine (sea)
contact info
Laura Flahive Wu
Covington & Burling Llp (dc)
contact info
Kenneth E Payson
Davis Wright Tremaine (sea)
contact info
John D Graubert
Covington & Burling Llp (dc)
contact info
Laura M Kim
Covington & Burling Llp (dc)
contact info
John C Hueston
Hueston Hennigan Llp (newport Beach)
contact info
Megan L Rodgers
Covington & Burling Llp (palo Alto)
contact info
Defendant
Russell Grandinetti
Represented By
John E Hall
Covington & Burling Llp (sf)
contact info
Moez M Kaba
Hueston Hennigan Llp (la)
contact info
Stephen P Anthony
Covington & Burling Llp (dc)
contact info
Joseph A Reiter
Hueston Hennigan Llp (la)
contact info
James E Howard
Davis Wright Tremaine (sea)
contact info
Laura Flahive Wu
Covington & Burling Llp (dc)
contact info
Kenneth E Payson
Davis Wright Tremaine (sea)
contact info
John D Graubert
Covington & Burling Llp (dc)
contact info
Laura M Kim
Covington & Burling Llp (dc)
contact info
John C Hueston
Hueston Hennigan Llp (newport Beach)
contact info
Megan L Rodgers
Covington & Burling Llp (palo Alto)
contact info
Defendant
Neil Lindsay
Represented By
John E Hall
Covington & Burling Llp (sf)
contact info
Moez M Kaba
Hueston Hennigan Llp (la)
contact info
Stephen P Anthony
Covington & Burling Llp (dc)
contact info
Joseph A Reiter
Hueston Hennigan Llp (la)
contact info
James E Howard
Davis Wright Tremaine (sea)
contact info
Laura Flahive Wu
Covington & Burling Llp (dc)
contact info
Kenneth E Payson
Davis Wright Tremaine (sea)
contact info
John D Graubert
Covington & Burling Llp (dc)
contact info
Laura M Kim
Covington & Burling Llp (dc)
contact info
John C Hueston
Hueston Hennigan Llp (newport Beach)
contact info
Megan L Rodgers
Covington & Burling Llp (palo Alto)
contact info
Interested Party
Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Represented By
John K Adams
Eimer Stahl Llp (il)
contact info
Daniel D Birk
Eimer Stahl Llp (il)
contact info
Jackson W Maynard, Jr
Maynard Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Federal Trade Commission
Represented By
Olivia Jerjian
Federal Trade Commission (dc)
contact info
Jonathan Cohen
Federal Trade Commission (dc)
contact info
Thomas Maxwell Nardini
Federal Trade Commission (dc)
contact info
Colin MacDonald
Federal Trade Commission (wa)
contact info
Evan Mendelson
Federal Trade Commission (dc)
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
283 283 minutes Telephone Conference Wed 04/30 11:22 AM
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
282 282 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 04/29 5:33 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Discovery Conference reset for Wednesday, 4/30/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge John H. Chun. The court will provide remote audio public access for this hearing. Access information can be found on the court's[LINK:Calendar] page at least 24 hours prior to the hearing. (AD)
Related: [-]
281 281 notice Notice of Stricken Hearing Tue 04/29 5:03 PM
NOTICE of Stricken Telephonic Discovery Conference on 4/30/2025. (AD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
280 280 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 04/24 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Discovery Conference set for Wednesday, 4/30/2025 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge John H. Chun. The court will provide remote audio public access for this hearing. Access information can be found on the court's[LINK:Calendar] page at least 24 hours prior to the hearing. (AD)
Related: [-]