Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:J Campbell Barker
Referred: K Nicole Mitchell
Case #: 6:23-cv-00308
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jun 21, 2023
Terminated:Oct 03, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 20, 2023 4:42 AM CST
Defendant
Credit Systems International, Inc.
Plaintiff
Mazelyn Sanders
Represented By
Joel Spencer Halvorsen
Halvorsen Klote
contact info


Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
utility Remark Tue 10/03 1:50 PM
Civil action dismissed with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and Doc.9 notice of voluntary dismissal with prejudice. (ndc)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 10/02 4:49 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mazelyn Sanders(Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 17, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Thu 08/17 4:32 PM
ORDER TO STAY. The parties or their counsel shall submit to the Court all documents necessary for the closing of this case on or before October 16, 2023 . Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 8/17/2023. (wea, 6)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 08/14 3:35 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to Credit Systems International by Mazelyn Sanders(Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 07/11 10:12 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mazelyn Sanders. Credit Systems International, Inc. served on 6/29/2023, answer due 7/20/2023. (Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
5 5 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Fri 07/07 11:13 AM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Mazelyn Sanders (Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
3 3 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 06/26 2:01 PM
ORDER DESIGNATING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The court designates Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell to the full extent authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1) to handle all pretrial matters in this case, including dispositive motions. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 6/23/2023. (wea, 6)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Thu 06/22 10:41 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (wea, 6)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 06/21 5:07 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Credit Systems International, Inc. (ndc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/21 3:57 PM
COMPLAINT against Credit Systems International, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9561403.), filed by Mazelyn Sanders.(Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Jury Demand Thu 06/22 10:38 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Mazelyn Sanders. (wea, 6)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 06/22 10:40 AM
District Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (wea, 6)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Thu 06/22 10:41 AM
COURT ORDER: The court adopts in this case Judge Barker's standing orders, which may be obtained from his page on the court's website and may be updated without separate docket entry. All parties and counsel are ordered to stay abreast of the current standing orders and to comply with those orders and with the court's local rules. Noncompliance with those standing orders or local rules may result in a sanction or other disadvantage. (wea, 6)
Related: [-]