Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Amy Totenberg
Case #: 1:23-cv-02724
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:216(b) Labor - Minimum wage or overtime compensation
Case Filed:Jun 16, 2023
Terminated:Jan 05, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2023 5:04 AM EST
Defendant
Peter Best
Represented By
Demetrius Tennell Lockett
Townsend & Lockett, LLC
contact info
Shani Kamaria Whisonant
Townsend & Lockett, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Negril Restaurant ATL, LLC
Represented By
Shani Kamaria Whisonant
Townsend & Lockett, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jaida Belton
Represented By
Tia Thornton Brown
The Law Office Of Thornton Brown, LLC
contact info
Arnold James Lizana
Law Office Of Arnold J. Lizana, Iii, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Indira Gooding
Represented By
Tia Thornton Brown
The Law Office Of Thornton Brown, LLC
contact info
Arnold James Lizana
Law Office Of Arnold J. Lizana, Iii, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Negril ATL, LLC
Terminated: 10/13/2023
Represented By
Demetrius Tennell Lockett
Townsend & Lockett, LLC
contact info
Shani Kamaria Whisonant
Townsend & Lockett, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, November 21, 2024
48 48 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment Thu 11/21 3:41 PM
ORDER granting47 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment and approving parties Settlement Agreement. The Court also ENTERS the substantive terms of the Consent Order and Judgment stipulated to by the parties. The Court SHALL retain jurisdiction over this matter until the payment terms set forth in Section 3 of the Settlement Agreement and Consent Judgment have been fulfilled. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/21/2024. (dob)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
47 47 motion Approve Consent Judgment Fri 11/08 3:46 PM
Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Settlement Agreement with Brief In Support by Jaida Belton, Indira Gooding.(Lizana, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Settlement Agreement),
Att: 2 Exhibit B (Proposed Order Approving Settllement),
Att: 3 Exhibit C (Proposed Order Regarding Consent Judgment)
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 11/06 8:39 AM
ORDER by docket entry only, GRANTING46 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to File Settlement Agreement and Motion for Approval through and including November 8, 2024. Ordered by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/6/2024. (kng)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
46 46 motion Extension of Time Tue 11/05 8:53 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time File Settlement Agreement and Motion for Approval re: Order, Set Submission Deadline with Brief In Support by Jaida Belton, Indira Gooding. (Lizana, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Tue 10/29 1:39 PM
ORDER, by docket entry only: The parties are DIRECTED to file the settlement agreement within 7 days from the date of this Order. Ordered by Judge Amy Totenberg on 10/29/2024. (kng)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
45 45 minutes Settlement Conference Mon 09/30 1:46 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath: Settlement Conference held on 9/30/2024 and case settled. (dob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
44 44 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 09/17 4:08 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath: Settlement Conference held on 9/17/2024. The mediation is held open and continued to Monday, September 30, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. (Tape #Zoom)(jpa)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 09/17 4:14 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Settlement Conference continued to 9/30/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. (jpa)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
order Order Fri 08/16 1:55 PM
ORDER (by docket text only). The Court has been informed that the parties have a scheduling conflict with the mediation that is currently scheduled for August 20, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. With the parties consent, the Court has agreed to move the mediation to Wednesday, September 4, 2024 at 10:30 a.m. Statements are now due on Friday, August 30, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 08/16/2024. (nav)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
order Order Mon 08/12 10:32 AM
ORDER (by docket text only). A video-conference mediation in this case is hereby set for Tuesday, August 20, 2024, beginning at 10:00 A.M. If there are any conflicts with this date, the parties are directed to confer and jointly email Chambers at GANDsm_JEM_Chambers@gand.uscourts.gov with three alternative days for which they are available. Each party shall submit a Confidential Mediation Statement, not to exceed ten pages double spaced, by Friday, August 16, 2024, addressing the issues to be covered in this mediation. It should be emailed to GANDsm_JEM_Chambers@gand.uscourts.gov. Ordered by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 08/12/2024. (nav)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
43 43 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 07/19 8:14 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE back to Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath for an additional mediation for the parties to reach agreement on a reasonable payment schedule. As both parties have represented, the payment amount has been settled, and the only remaining material issue appears to be the payment schedule. Within two days of the completion of the mediation, the parties shall report the outcome of the mediation to the Court. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 7/19/24. (jpa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
42 42 1 pgs order Order Thu 06/27 5:54 PM
ORDER AND NOTICE. This Order provides notice to all parties with active cases before the Court that, as of July 1, 2024, the marvelous and extraordinarily capable Harry Martin will no longer be the Courtroom Deputy for the undersigned. Mr. Martin has ascended to a leadership position in the Clerk's Office where he will continue his superb service to the Court, and the public, at large. Please direct all future communications regarding court matters to the undersigned's new Courtroom Deputy, Keri Gardner, at keri_gardner@gand.uscourts.gov and 404-215-1437. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/27/2024. (bgt)
Related: [-]
41 41 minutes Telephone Conference Thu 06/27 2:38 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Totenberg: Telephone Conference held on 6/27/2024 re settlement enforcement. Plaintiff directed to provide to the Court, the mediation agreement via email to the Courtroom Deputy. (Court Reporter Shannon Welch)(jpa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
notice Notice of Video/Telephone Proceeding Thu 06/20 10:19 AM
NOTICE SCHEDULING TELEPHONE PROCEEDING by docket entry only: Teleconference set for 6/27/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Amy Totenberg. Connection Instructions: Please Call 1-888-684-8852; Access Code 7001576# You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available[LINK:here] . The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available[LINK:here] . Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (hfm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Wed 05/22 8:44 AM
ORDER by docket entry only: The parties have informed the Court that they are still working to finalize the settlement. The parties are directed to submit a status update upon finalization of the settlement or June 17, 2024, whichever is earlier. Ordered by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/22/24. (hfm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Wed 04/17 2:24 PM
ORDER by docket entry only: The parties have advised the Court that they expect substantial progress to be made in finalizing the settlement in the next 14 days. Accordingly, the time to submit the Motion for Settlement Approval is extended through and including May 17, 2024. Ordered by Judge Amy Totenberg on 4/17/24. (hfm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Thu 03/28 11:32 AM
ORDER by docket entry only: The deadline for filing a Motion for Settlement Approval is extended through and including April 15, 2024. If the parties are unable to file the motion by that deadline, they should file a status report advising the Court as to issues restricting the settlement from being finalized. Ordered by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/28/24. (hfm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Wed 02/28 12:25 PM
ORDER by docket entry only: Based on the minutes from the mediation held on February 27, 2024, it appears to the Court that the parties have now reached a settlement agreement. The parties are DIRECTED to move for approval of the settlement agreement as soon as possible, but no later than March 27, 2024. Example motions for settlement approval may be found at 1:20-cv-01835-AT, [Doc. 76] and its attachments; and 4:19-cv-00219-AT, [Doc. 97] and its attachments. Ordered by Judge Amy Totenberg on 2/28/24. (hfm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
40 40 minutes Settlement Conference Wed 02/28 9:11 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath: Settlement Conference held on 2/27/2024. Parties did reach a settlement agreement. Magistrate Judge J Elizabeth McBath terminated as settlement judge. (Tape #Zoom)(jpa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
39 39 5 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Thu 01/11 1:39 PM
ORDER setting Video-Conference Mediation hearing for 2/27/2024 at 10:00 AM in before Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 1/11/24. (jpa)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
38 38 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 01/05 2:07 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath for mediation. This case is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED, pending the outcome of the mediation. In the event that the matter does not settle, the Parties are DIRECTED to file a joint proposed scheduling order with the Court within FIVE (5) DAYS of the completion of mediation that allows for the completion of remaining discovery. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 1/5/24. (jpa)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 01/05 2:09 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (jpa)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 30, 2023
37 37 discov Certificate of Service Sat 12/30 10:04 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants First Sett of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Jaida Belton, Indira Gooding.(Lizana, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
36 36 discov Certificate of Service Fri 12/29 4:42 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 2023.12.29 Negril ATL Restaurant First Set of Written Discovery to Plaintiffs - COS by Negril ATL, LLC.(Lockett, Demetrius)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 17, 2023
35 35 notice Notice (Other) Sun 12/17 11:47 PM
NOTICE by Jaida Belton, Indira Gooding re29 Amended Complaint, Consent Forms Jaida Belton, Indira Gooding, Azhae Hylton, Ciara Belton(Lizana, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Gooding Consent Form,
Att: 2 Hylton Consent Form,
Att: 3 Ciara Belton Consent Form
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
34 34 discov Certificate of Service Wed 11/08 11:05 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' PROPOUNDED DISCOVERY by Peter Best, Negril Restaurant ATL, LLC.(Whisonant, Shani)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
33 33 service Certificate of Service Fri 11/03 12:57 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Negril Restaurant ATL, LLC (Lockett, Demetrius)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
32 32 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 10/24 9:26 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to29 Amended Complaint by Peter Best, Negril Restaurant ATL, LLC.(Whisonant, Shani)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 10/17 6:30 PM
ORDER by docket entry: The Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery [Doc. 30] is GRANTED. The discovery period shall be extended through and including January 31, 2024. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 10/17/2023. (amb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
30 30 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 10/13 5:32 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery with Brief In Support by Jaida Belton, Indira Gooding. (Lizana, Arnold)
Related: [-]
29 29 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/13 5:29 PM
Consent AMENDED COMPLAINT Substituting Defendant Negril Restaurant ATL, LLC for Negril ATL LLC and Proceeding against Peter Best filed by Indira Gooding, Jaida Belton.(Lizana, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
28 28 discov Certificate of Service Fri 10/06 6:06 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Notice of Deposition Peter Best by Jaida Belton, Indira Gooding.(Lizana, Arnold)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice of Filing Fri 10/06 5:42 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Withdrwal of Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default at to Peter Best by Jaida Belton, Indira Gooding re24 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Peter Best (Lizana, Arnold)
Related: [-]
26 26 minutes Telephone Conference Fri 10/06 1:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amy Totenberg: Telephone Conference held on 10/6/2023 re dispute during Deposition of Corporate Representative. (Court Reporter Deposition Reporter)(jpa)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 10/02 10:26 AM
Submission of24 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Peter Best , to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (jpa)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
25 25 respm Response (Non-Motion) Fri 09/29 10:07 PM
RESPONSE re22 Scheduling Order and Identification of Proper Corporate Parties filed by Peter Best, Negril ATL, LLC. (Lockett, Demetrius)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Clerks Entry of Default Fri 09/29 5:38 PM
MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Peter Best with Brief In Support by Jaida Belton, Indira Gooding.(Lizana, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
23 23 discov Certificate of Service Wed 09/20 9:38 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Of Discovery Materials by Peter Best, Negril ATL, LLC.(Lockett, Demetrius)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
22 22 order Scheduling Order Thu 08/24 8:27 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER re20 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/24/23. (jpa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
21 21 discov Certificate of Service Tue 08/22 12:23 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials. Defendants' Initial Disclosures by Peter Best, Negril ATL, LLC.(Lockett, Demetrius)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Tue 08/22 11:13 AM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Jaida Belton, Indira Gooding. (Lizana, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 08/18 11:10 AM
ORDER, by docket entry only, granting19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Ordered by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/18/23. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
19 19 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/17 6:13 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Shani Whisonant Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12824457).by Peter Best, Negril ATL, LLC. (Lockett, Demetrius)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Thu 08/17 6:35 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:19 APPLICATION for Admission of Shani Whisonant Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12824457). Attorney Shani Kamaria Whisonant added appearing on behalf of Peter Best, Negril ATL, LLC. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (rvb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
18 18 notice Certificate of Compliance Tue 08/01 10:34 PM
CERTIFICATE of Compliance of Tennell Lockett (Lockett, Demetrius)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 08/01 9:54 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peter Best, Negril ATL, LLC. (Lockett, Demetrius)
Related: [-]
16 16 discov Certificate of Service Tue 08/01 7:15 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiffs' First Set of Discovery Requests to Peter Best by Jaida Belton, Indira Gooding.(Lizana, Arnold)
Related: [-]
15 15 discov Certificate of Service Tue 08/01 7:13 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiffs First Set of Discovery Requests to Negril ATL LLC by Jaida Belton, Indira Gooding.(Lizana, Arnold)
Related: [-]
14 14 discov Certificate of Service Tue 08/01 7:10 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 30(B)6 Notice of Deposition by Jaida Belton, Indira Gooding.(Lizana, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/28 2:59 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Peter Best.(Lockett, Demetrius)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
12 12 discov Initial Disclosures Tue 07/25 4:57 PM
Initial Disclosures by Jaida Belton, Indira Gooding.(Brown, Tia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Friday, July 21, 2023
11 11 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 07/21 8:44 PM
First Certificate of Interested Persons by Jaida Belton, Indira Gooding. (Brown, Tia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 07/20 8:20 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Negril ATL, LLC. Discovery ends on 12/18/2023.(Lockett, Demetrius)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
9 9 service Return of Service Executed Thu 07/13 8:32 AM
Return of Service Executed by Indira Gooding, Jaida Belton. Peter Best served on 7/7/2023, answer due 7/28/2023. (Lizana, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
8 8 service Return of Service Executed Wed 07/05 8:57 PM
Return of Service Executed by Indira Gooding, Jaida Belton. Negril ATL, LLC served on 6/29/2023, answer due 7/20/2023. (Lizana, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
7 7 notice Certificate of Compliance Tue 06/27 2:01 PM
CERTIFICATE of Compliance with Standing Order (Lizana, Arnold)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Certificate of Compliance Tue 06/27 1:42 PM
DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR INCORRECT PDF ATTACHED. CERTIFICATE of Compliance re4 Order, (Lizana, Arnold) Modified on 6/27/2023 to edit docket text per phone call (tas)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order Tue 06/27 12:37 PM
NOTICE to parties regarding FLSA Cases. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/27/23. (jpa)
Related: [-]
4 4 30+ pgs order Order Tue 06/27 12:35 PM
STANDING ORDER: Guidelines to parties and counsel in cases proceeding before the Honorable Amy Totenberg. Parties are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/27/23. (jpa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 06/21 12:05 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Peter Best. (lwb)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 06/21 12:05 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Negril ATL, LLC. (lwb)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/21 12:03 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Indira Gooding and Jaida Belton. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12680636)(lwb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet