Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:23-mj-02061
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Jun 22, 2023 12:32 AM MST
Defendant
Ari Axel Zavala-Alvarado (1)
Represented By
George Jacob Romero
Federal Public Defenders Office - Yuma
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ross Gabriel Arellano Edwards
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/22/2023 12:54 AM MST
Saturday, June 17, 2023
Arrest of Ari Axel Zavala-Alvarado on 6/17/2023. (JMA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
1 1 6 pgs COMPLAINT as to Ari Axel Zavala-Alvarado. (JMA)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf.(JMA)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
3 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf: Initial Appearance as to Ari Axel Zavala-Alvarado held on 6/20/2023. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. Appointing George Jacob Romero for Ari Axel Zavala-Alvarado with Appointment Type: AFPD. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. Preliminary Hearing as to Ari Axel Zavala-Alvarado waived on 6/20/2023. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Interpreter required for Ari Axel Zavala-Alvarado (1) Spanish. Defendant ordered temporarily detained. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA John Ballos (duty) for the Government, AFPD Jared Eggers on behalf of George Romero for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Noe Murillo assists defendant. Detention Hearing set for 6/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in U.S. District Court of Arizona, 98 West 1st Street, Yuma, AZ 85364 before Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf. Related [+] Hearing held 2:16 PM to 2:22 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MM)
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
4 4 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Ari Axel Zavala-Alvarado. (MM)
Related: [-]