Arizona District Court
Judge:Dominic W Lanza
Case #: 3:23-cv-08114
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Jun 21, 2023
Terminated:Jul 24, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 19, 2023 1:36 AM MST
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of Utah Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of North Carolina Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of North Dakota Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of Ohio Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of Oklahoma
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of Pennsylvania Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of South Carolina Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of South Dakota Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of Tennessee Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of Texas Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of New Mexico Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of Virginia Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of Washington Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of West Virginia Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of Wisconsin Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of Wyoming Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire LLC
Defendant
Indiana Discount Tire Company Incorporated
Defendant
Reinalt-Thomas Corporation
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of Kansas Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire Company Incorporated
Represented By
Steven Gregory Biddle
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Robert F Friedman, I
Littler Mendelson Pc - Dallas, Tx
contact info
Sarah Katelyn Watt
Littler Mendelson Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
Discount Tire Certificate LLC
Defendant
Discount Tire Company
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of Alabama Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of Colorado Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of Georgia Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of Iowa Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of Kentucky Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of Louisiana Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of Minnesota Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of Mississippi Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of Missouri Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of Montana Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of Nebraska Incorporated
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of Nevada Incorporated
Plaintiff
Joshua Stoddard
Represented By
Samuel Reuben Randall
Randall Law PLLC
contact info
Gregg I Shavitz
Shavitz Law Group PA
contact info
Alan L Quiles
Shavitz Law Group PA
contact info
Hannah Wynne Cole-Chu
Outten & Golden Llp - Washington, Dc
contact info
Michael Scimone
Outten & Golden Llp - New York, Ny
contact info
Justin M Swartz
Outten & Golden Llp - New York, Ny
contact info
Kaelyn Mahar
Outten & Golden LLP
contact info

GPO Sep 21 2023
complete details). Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 9/21/2023. (SLQ)ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's motion to stay (Doc. 16) is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's deadline to respond to the preliminary certification motion is extended to October 5, 2023. (See document for

Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM MST
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
74 74 minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case ~Util - Terminate Stipulation ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 07/24 11:20 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal73 , this Civil Case is terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
73 73 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 07/22 2:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Agreed Joint Without Prejudice) by Discount Tire Certificate LLC, Discount Tire Company Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of Alabama Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of Colorado Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of Georgia Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of Iowa Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of Kansas Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of Kentucky Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of Louisiana Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of Minnesota Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of Mississippi Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of Missouri Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of Montana Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of Nebraska Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of Nevada Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of New Mexico Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of North Carolina Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of North Dakota Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of Ohio Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of Oklahoma, Discount Tire Company of Pennsylvania Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of South Carolina Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of South Dakota Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of Tennessee Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of Texas Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of Utah Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of Virginia Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of Washington Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of West Virginia Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of Wisconsin Incorporated, Discount Tire Company of Wyoming Incorporated, Discount Tire LLC, Indiana Discount Tire Company Incorporated, Reinalt-Thomas Corporation. (Biddle, Steven)
Related: [-]