Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:William S Stickman
Case #: 2:23-cv-01145
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2601 Family Medical Leave Act 1993 (FMLA)
Case Filed:Jun 22, 2023
Terminated:Dec 27, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 19, 2023 4:02 AM EST
Defendant
PUREPENN LLC
Represented By
Taylor N. Brailey
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Andrea Kirshenbaum
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES CATTERALL
Represented By
Kyle H. Steenland
The Workers' Rights Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
17 17 order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 12/27 8:26 AM
ORDER APPROVING16 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by JAMES CATTERALL. The complaint in this action is dismissed with prejudice, without any award of fees and costs by the Court. Clerk is to mark CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 12/27/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
16 16 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (Atty) Fri 12/22 3:30 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by JAMES CATTERALL. (Steenland, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
15 15 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Thu 11/16 5:49 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying Trulieve Cannabis Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate by PUREPENN LLC. (Brailey, Taylor)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 11/16 5:47 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by PUREPENN LLC Answer due from PUREPENN LLC. (Brailey, Taylor)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/16 5:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor N. Brailey on behalf of PUREPENN LLC. (Brailey, Taylor)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/16 5:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Kirshenbaum on behalf of PUREPENN LLC. (Kirshenbaum, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
11 11 service Summons Issued Thu 09/28 5:05 PM
Summons Issued as to PUREPENN LLC (elt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 09/26 4:23 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES CATTERALL. PUREPENN LLC waiver sent on 9/26/2023, answer due 11/27/2023. (Steenland, Kyle)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Thu 09/28 5:06 PM
Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from PUREPENN LLC (elt)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
9 9 service Praecipe to Issue Summons Mon 09/18 1:13 PM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by JAMES CATTERALL (Steenland, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
8 8 order Order Tue 07/11 1:18 PM
ORDER OF COURT. Upon review of7 Notice of Withdrawal of Return of Service,4 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed is deemed WITHDRAWN. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 07/11/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice (Other) - Do Not Use for ADR Documents Tue 07/11 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal by JAMES CATTERALL re4 Summons/Returned Returned Executed (Steenland, Kyle)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend Tue 07/11 10:43 AM
ORDER GRANTING5 Motion to Amend Caption. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 07/11/23. (eca)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Amend Tue 07/11 10:21 AM
MOTION to Amend Caption by JAMES CATTERALL. (Steenland, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, June 26, 2023
4 4 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Mon 06/26 8:29 AM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JAMES CATTERALL. TRULIEVE CANNABIS CORPORATION served on 6/23/2023, answer due 7/14/2023. (Steenland, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 06/22 3:46 PM
Summons Issued as to TRULIEVE CANNABIS CORPORATION (kss)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Praecipe to Issue Summons Thu 06/22 2:30 PM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by JAMES CATTERALL (Steenland, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Thu 06/22 1:21 PM
COMPLAINT against TRULIEVE CANNABIS CORPORATION (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC - 7740129), filed by JAMES CATTERALL. (elt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet