JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. v. BECERRA et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Amit P Mehta |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-01819 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 19, 2023 3:41 AM EST |
Amicus
ANDREA K. GUNTER
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
JENNIFER YEATTS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
U.S. PIRG
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
DEBRA TURK
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
S. SEAN TU
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
THOMAS STERN
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
AMANDA SHAH
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
SARAH REIFF
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
JANE E. POWELL
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
TARA O'CONNOR
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
KATIE O'CONNELL
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
DANIEL LISS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
STACEY M. LANTAGNE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
HELAINE KASTNER KINSLOW
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
KRISTINA HENRY
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
KRISTEN GOUTHRO
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
GENERATION PATIENT
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
CHARLES DUAN
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
BERNARD CHAO
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
MICHAEL A. CARRIER
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
WENDY E. BRAUN
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
MARY H. BELL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROBERT CALIFF
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
XAVIER BECERRA
|
Represented By
|
Movant
AVADEL CNS PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 04/02 8:42 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: The Oral Argument currently scheduled for 4/9/2024 is VACATED and rescheduled for 5/10/2024 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (smc) |