Maryland District Court
Judge:Matthew J Maddox
Case #: 1:23-cv-01687
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 21, 2023
Defendant
(BCDC) Baltimore, County Detention Center Towson
Defendant
Walt J. Pesterfield
Plaintiff
Quinton Marquise Cottrell

GPO Mar 04 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Matthew J. Maddox on 3/4/2025. (c/m to P on 3/4/2025 heps, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 07, 2025
26 26 misc Rule 12/56 Mon 04/07 8:27 AM
Rule 12/56 notice mailed to Quinton Marquise Cottrell. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 4/7/25)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
25 25 motion Summary Judgment Fri 04/04 4:01 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by (BCDC) Baltimore, County Detention Center Towson, Walt J. Pesterfield(Fiske, Edmund)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
24 24 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/01 3:44 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Walt J. Pesterfield.(Fiske, Edmund)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/01 10:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund Fiske on behalf of All Defendants (Fiske, Edmund)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 03/04 2:13 PM
ORDER denying16 Motion to Dismiss; Defendant Peterfield is directed to file an Answer within 28 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Matthew J. Maddox on 3/4/2025. (c/m to P on 3/4/2025 heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
21 21 8 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Tue 03/04 2:09 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Matthew J. Maddox on 3/4/2025. (c/m to P on 3/4/2025 heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order Mon 12/30 2:26 PM
ORDER DENYING without prejudice18 Request to Appoint Counsel; GRANTING Cottrell an extension of time to file a Response to Defendant's Motionto Dismiss (ECF 16); DIRECTING Clerk to send a copy of this Order to Cottrell together with a copy of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint and supporting documents and the Rule 12/56 notice previously mailed. Signed by Judge Matthew J. Maddox on 12/30/2024. (c/m w/enclosures) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/31 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Moultrie on behalf of Walt. J. Pesterfield (Moultrie, Brandon) Modified on 10/31/2024 (av4s)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
18 18 corresp Miscellaneous Fri 07/19 12:29 PM
Correspondence from Quinton Marquise Cottrell re: response and request for counsel(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, May 06, 2024
17 17 misc Rule 12/56 Mon 05/06 9:11 AM
Rule 12/56 notice mailed to Quinton Marquise Cottrell (c/m to P on 5/6/2024 heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
16 16 motion Dismiss Fri 05/03 4:17 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by (BCDC) Baltimore, County Detention Center Towson, Walt J. Pesterfield(Farrar, Perneita)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, April 04, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/04 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Perneita Montrece Farrar on behalf of Walt J. Pesterfield (Farrar, Perneita)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
14 14 3 pgs order Order and Institutional Coordinator Letter Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 03/07 2:38 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint. Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments . Signed by District Judge Matthew J. Maddox on 3/7/2024. (c/m to P, FO, and CA on 3/7/2024 heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 01/30 2:43 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Walt J. Pesterfield, filed by Quinton Marquise Cottrell.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
12 12 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 01/30 1:25 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Quinton Marquise Cottrell. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
11 11 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Wed 01/03 4:15 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, December 18, 2023
10 10 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 12/18 11:00 AM
ORDER denying5 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying8 Motion to Add Supplementary Information; Granting Plaintiff twenty-eight (28) days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint; directing the Baltimore County Detention Center fiscal administrator to file an inmate account certificate that indicates the average monthly balances in and deposits to Plaintiff's account. Signed by District Judge Matthew J. Maddox on 12/18/2023. (c/m to P with forms c/m FO on 12/18/2023 heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 11/27 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Quinton Marquise Cottrell.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 11/14 4:03 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Matthew J. Maddox. Judge Theodore D. Chuang no longer assigned to the case. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
8 8 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 10/19 12:34 PM
MOTION to Add Supplementary Information and Complaint to Previous Active Case or Complaint by Quinton Marquise Cottrell(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
7 7 corresp Miscellaneous Thu 09/28 11:02 AM
Correspondence filed by Quinton Cottrell(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
6 6 corresp Miscellaneous Wed 09/06 3:28 PM
Correspondence from Quinton Cottrell.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
5 5 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 07/07 8:38 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Quinton Marquise Cottrell(jb5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope Front and Back
Monday, June 26, 2023
4 4 order Case Management Order Mon 06/26 11:13 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 6/26/2023. (c/m 6/26/2023 - mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
3 3 misc New Case Notification Letter Thu 06/22 3:36 PM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Quinton Marquise Cottrell. (c/m to P on 6/22/2023 heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 06/22 3:32 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Quinton Marquise Cottrell.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/22 3:28 PM
COMPLAINT against (BCDC) Baltimore, County Detention Center Towson, filed by Quinton Marquise Cottrell.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope