Nebraska District Court
Case #: 8:23-cr-00141
Case Filed:Jun 21, 2023
Terminated:Jun 21, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jun 23, 2023 2:41 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Michael P. Norris
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Omaha
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Ramell Dashay McQueen (1)
Terminated: 06/21/2023


Docket last updated: 06/23/2023 3:06 AM CDT
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
1 1 TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT as to Ramell Dashay McQueen. Received copies of indictment, judgment and docket sheet from USDC - Northern District of Iowa, case number 17cr2048 as to defendant Ramell Dashay McQueen. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (LRM)
Related: [-]