North Dakota District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00097
Case Filed:May 24, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jun 23, 2023 2:25 AM CDT
Defendant
Deacon Kennedy Jones (2)
Represented By
Ryan D. Sandberg
Pringle & Herigstad PC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Rick L. Volk
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Jun 29 2023
ORDER as to Shaunna Rae Blackdog: Status Conference set for 7/25/2023 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (BG)
GPO Jun 29 2023
ORDER as to Mark Randall Carlson: Status Conference set for 7/25/2023 at 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG)
GPO Jun 29 2023
ORDER as to Jessica Ann Broom: Status Conference set for 7/25/2023 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (BG)
GPO Jun 29 2023
ORDER as to Don Larry Modica, III: Status Conference set for 7/25/2023 at 11:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (BG)
GPO Jun 29 2023
ORDER as to Deacon Kennedy Jones: Status Conference set for 7/25/2023 at 1:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (BG)
GPO Jun 29 2023
ORDER as to Joshua Wayne Jones: Status Conference set for 7/25/2023 at 2:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (BG)
GPO Oct 17 2023
AMENDED ORDER granting 137 MOTION for Release from Custody as to Mark Randall Carlson by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (amended to reflect Defendant's current location) (BG)
GPO Nov 21 2023
AMENDED ORDER granting 167 MOTION for Release from Custody as to Deacon Kennedy Jones by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (BG)
GPO May 02 2024
ORDER as to Don Larry Modica III: Status Conference set for 8/20/2024 at 9:15 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter (BG)

Docket last updated: 10/03/2023 8:19 PM CDT

Create an account to get the full docket for this case.