Oregon Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Peter C Mckittrick
Case #: 3:23-bk-31368
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2023
Terminated:Mar 18, 2025
Plan Confirmed:Nov 30, 2023

TypeOther Entity Type
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Heritage Specialty Foods, LLC
6433 SE Lake Rd.
Portland, OR 97222
Represented By
STEPHEN A RAHER
Leonard Law Group, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee, Portland
1220 SW 3rd Ave., Rm. 315
Portland, OR 97204
Represented By
KATHRYN EVANS
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago
Thursday, March 20, 2025
301 301 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Thu 03/20 9:10 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:300 Final Decree (NOTE: If any related adversary proceeding is pending at closing of this case, then all further adversary entries will be on the adversary docket.) (jbk). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
300 300 order Final Decree Tue 03/18 2:08 PM
Final Decree (NOTE: If any related adversary proceeding is pending at closing of this case, then all further adversary entries will be on the adversary docket.) (jbk)
Related: [-]
299 299 misc Chapter 11 Final Account [Requires LBF 1195 - 12/1/21 or 1198 - 4/1/09 if tr appt & applicable] Tue 03/18 8:59 AM
Final Account and Application for Entry of Final Decree and Closing Order. Filed By Debtor Heritage Specialty Foods, LLC (RAHER, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]