Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Paul L Maloney
Referred: Sally J Berens
Case #: 1:23-cv-00654
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1640 Truth in Lending
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 20, 2023 5:36 AM EST
defendant
Abundant Life Homes LLC
Represented By
David E. Bevins
Rhoades Mckee (grand Rapids)
contact info
Peter Dale Rhoades
Rhoades Mckee P.C. (holland)
contact info
defendant
Troy Hacker
Represented By
David E. Bevins
Rhoades Mckee (grand Rapids)
contact info
Peter Dale Rhoades
Rhoades Mckee P.C. (holland)
contact info
defendant
Jay Williams
Represented By
David E. Bevins
Rhoades Mckee (grand Rapids)
contact info
Peter Dale Rhoades
Rhoades Mckee P.C. (holland)
contact info
mediator
Facilitative Mediator
Represented By
Robert E. Wright
Peace Talks, The, PLLC
contact info
plaintiff
Debra Richmond
Represented By
John Patrick Smith
Legal Aid Of Western Michigan (grand Rapids)
contact info
Theodore J. Westbrook
Westbrook Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, December 28, 2023
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 12/28 10:11 AM
ORDER approving STIPULATION26 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
26 26 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Wed 12/27 2:31 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of Rescission and Quieting Title by plaintiff Debra Richmond (Westbrook, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
25 25 1 pgs order Order Regarding Dismissal Papers Mon 11/27 10:50 AM
ORDER requiring appropriate closing documents to be submitted by 12/26/2023; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
24 24 adr Facilitative Mediation Report Tue 11/21 6:06 PM
REPORT of facilitative mediation held 11/21/23; mediation is complete; case is settled, closing documents to be filed by 12/31/23 (Wright, Robert)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Protective Order Tue 11/21 4:01 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) Tue 11/21 11:55 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Stipulated Protective Order by defendants Abundant Life Homes LLC, Troy Hacker, Jay Williams (Bevins, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
21 21 service Certificate of Service Thu 11/09 11:31 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Abundant Life Homes LLC, Troy Hacker, Jay Williams for Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Admission to Defendants and Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Defendants (Bevins, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
adr Facilitative Mediation - Fee Received Wed 10/18 3:32 PM
VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 1622 as to plaintiff Debra Richmond (jmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
20 20 service Certificate of Service Thu 10/12 5:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Debra Richmond for Requests for Admission, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production (Westbrook, Theodore)
Related: [-]
19 19 adr Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Hearing of Mediation Session Thu 10/12 5:04 PM
NOTICE by mediator setting facilitative mediation session for 11/21/2023 at 10:00 a.m at Zoom (Wright, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
adr Facilitative Mediation - Fee Received Wed 10/11 2:27 PM
VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 267882 as to defendants Abundant Life Homes LLC, Troy Hacker, Jay Williams (jmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
18 18 adr Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Appointment of Facilitative Mediator Thu 10/05 2:56 PM
NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Robert E. Wright; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 10/12/2023 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 10/12/2023 (kmd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
17 17 adr Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Selection of Facilitative Mediator Wed 10/04 11:18 AM
SELECTION of Robert Wright as facilitative mediator by plaintiff Debra Richmond (Westbrook, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
16 16 service Certificate of Service Wed 09/13 5:09 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Debra Richmond for Rule 26(a) Disclosures (Westbrook, Theodore)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Certificate of Service Wed 09/13 4:32 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Abundant Life Homes LLC, Troy Hacker, Jay Williams for Defendants' Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 (Bevins, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
14 14 order Case Management Order Tue 08/29 3:25 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 2/29/2024; dispositive motions due by 3/19/2024; settlement conference set for 9/16/2024 at 09:15 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; final pretrial conference set for 10/21/2024 at 09:00 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; jury trial set for 11/13/2024 at 08:45 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
13 13 order Notice Cancelling Hearing Mon 08/28 2:34 PM
NOTICE cancelling Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 8/30/2023; Case Management Order to issue (jal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
12 12 misc Joint Status Report (Rule 16) Wed 08/23 3:14 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT (Westbrook, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
11 11 misc Restricted Access Court Document Wed 07/26 4:12 PM
(RESTRICTED ACCESS) DOCUMENT Conference call instructions for 8/30/2023 scheduling conference [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for Abundant Life Homes LLC, Troy Hacker, Debra Richmond, Jay Williams only] (jal)
Related: [-]
10 10 4 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Wed 07/26 4:10 PM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 8/30/2023 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; status report due by 8/24/2023; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 07/26 2:50 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Abundant Life Homes LLC (Bevins, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order for Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 07/26 12:01 PM
ORDER that defendant Abundant Life Homes LLC file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 07/20 1:39 PM
ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses by Abundant Life Homes LLC, Troy Hacker, Jay Williams (Bevins, David)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Thu 07/20 1:31 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Peter Dale Rhoades on behalf of defendants Abundant Life Homes LLC, Troy Hacker, Jay Williams (Rhoades, Peter)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Thu 07/20 1:33 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of David E. Bevins on behalf of defendants Abundant Life Homes LLC, Troy Hacker, Jay Williams (Bevins, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
notice Attorney Appearance Wed 07/12 7:45 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John Patrick Smith on behalf of plaintiff Debra Richmond (Smith, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 07/06 1:52 PM
SUMMONS returned executed; Troy Hacker served on 7/1/2023, answer due 7/24/2023 (Westbrook, Theodore)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 07/06 10:11 AM
SUMMONS returned executed; Jay Williams served on 7/3/2023, answer due 7/24/2023 (Westbrook, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 06/26 8:32 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Abundant Life Homes LLC, Troy Hacker, Jay Williams (ns)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Mon 06/26 8:31 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Paul L. Maloney (ns)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
2 2 service Proposed Summons (to be issued) Fri 06/23 2:14 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Westbrook, Theodore)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 06/23 2:00 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Abundant Life Homes LLC, Troy Hacker, Jay Williams filed by Debra Richmond (Westbrook, Theodore)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Fri 06/23 2:01 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Debra Richmond in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-7091946 (Westbrook, Theodore)
Related: [-]