Missouri Western District Court
Judge:M Douglas Harpool
Case #: 6:23-cv-03188
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:1938 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2023
Terminated:May 15, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 20, 2023 4:43 AM CST
Defendant
DRS Contracting, LLC
Represented By
Tina G. Fowler
Ellis, Ellis, Hammons & Johnson, PC
contact info
Defendant
Chad Mellentine
Represented By
Tina G. Fowler
Ellis, Ellis, Hammons & Johnson, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Brandon Ramirez
Represented By
Philip Oliphant
The Crone Law Firm, PLC
contact info
Edward J. Rolwes
The Rolwes Law Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 05/15 1:12 PM
Order of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed on 5/15/24 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 05/15 10:11 AM
STIPULATION of dismissal by Brandon Ramirez. (Oliphant, Philip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order Tue 05/14 10:30 AM
ORDER Status Report due by 5/31/2024. Signed on 5/14/24 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
22 22 discov Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures Mon 02/05 10:50 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Tina G. Fowler on behalf of Defendants DRS Contracting, LLC, Chad Mellentine.(Fowler, Tina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
notice Notice of Filing Wed 12/20 1:05 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
21 21 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 12/19 11:31 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER:(Dispositive Motions due by 10/8/2024.), ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/2/2024., Joinder of Parties due by 4/15/2024., Discovery Motions due by 8/7/2024.) Discovery due by 9/6/2024. Signed on 12/19/23 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
20 20 adr Designation of Mediator Mon 12/18 4:16 PM
DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Ron Mitchell(Oliphant, Philip)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
19 19 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 12/15 3:50 PM
Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Brandon Ramirez. (Oliphant, Philip)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
18 18 order Letter of reassignment Fri 12/08 9:11 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge David P. Rush to District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. Magistrate Judge David P. Rush no longer associated with this case. New case number is: 6:23-CV-03188-MDH. (Text entry only; no document attached.) (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment Thu 12/07 10:43 AM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to All Defendants: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click[LINK:here] for instructions. Form due by 12/28/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
notice Notice of Filing Wed 11/22 1:03 AM
NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
17 17 order Rule 16 Notice Fri 11/17 10:48 AM
RULE 16 NOTICE - In accordance with Local Rules 16.1 and 26.1, the parties shall file a joint proposed scheduling order on or before 12/15/2023. Signed on 11/17/2023 by Magistrate Judge David P. Rush. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (DO)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/17 9:37 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, on behalf of DRS Contracting, LLC, Chad Mellentine.(Fowler, Tina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
15 15 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 11/14 9:32 AM
ORDER granting14 Consent Motion for Leave to File Answers as unopposed. Defendants' answers are due on or before 11/17/2023. Signed on 11/14/2023 by Magistrate Judge David P. Rush. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (DO)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
14 14 motion Leave to File Document Mon 11/13 2:00 PM
Consent MOTION for leave to file Answers Out of Time filed by Tina G. Fowler on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/27/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Fowler, Tina)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/13 1:58 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Tina G. Fowler on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Tina G. Fowler added to party DRS Contracting, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Tina G. Fowler added to party Chad Mellentine(pty:dft))(Fowler, Tina)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
notice Notice of Docket Modification Mon 11/06 10:03 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 11/3/2023 as Document No. 12-1, Draft Plaintiff's Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default. The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Furtak, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
12 12 misc Status Report Fri 11/03 1:48 PM
STATUS REPORT by Brandon Ramirez.(Oliphant, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Draft Plaintiff's Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default (to be filed pending written notice)
Monday, October 23, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order Mon 10/23 11:40 AM
ORDER - Status Report due by 11/3/2023. Signed on 10/23/2023 by Magistrate Judge David P. Rush. (DO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
10 10 order Order Tue 10/03 12:01 PM
ORDER re8 Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause: Cause shown; and, the time for service is extended to 9/28/2023. Signed on 10/3/2023 by Magistrate Judge David P. Rush. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (DO)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Tue 10/03 9:04 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Brandon Ramirez. Chad Mellentine served on 9/28/2023, answer due 10/19/2023. (Oliphant, Philip)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
8 8 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Mon 10/02 5:33 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Brandon Ramirez. (Oliphant, Philip)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 09/25 11:31 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Show Cause Response due by 10/2/2023. Signed on 9/25/2023 by Magistrate Judge David P. Rush. (DO)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
6 6 service Return of Service of Complaint Executed Mon 08/28 1:31 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Brandon Ramirez. DRS Contracting, LLC served on 7/20/2023, answer due 8/10/2023. (Rolwes, Edward)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
5 5 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 08/16 3:04 PM
ORDER granting4 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Phillip E. Oliphant for Brandon Ramirez allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at [LINK:PACER] . This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 08/16 2:09 PM
Motion to allow Philip E. Oliphant to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8542661) filed by Edward J. Rolwes on behalf of Brandon Ramirez.(Rolwes, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Philip Oliphant- Cert. of Good Standing
Friday, August 04, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Filing Fri 08/04 1:21 PM
NOTICE of filing: Donald R. Schoonover's Answer re1 Complaint. (Hanna, Jaime)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Envelope
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
2 2 notice Notice of MAPN Wed 06/28 4:25 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Furtak, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
service Summons Issued Wed 06/28 4:21 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to DRS Contracting, LLC, Chad Mellentine. Summons emailed to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (Furtak, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment Wed 06/28 4:23 PM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click[LINK:here] for instructions. Plaintiff's Form due by 7/19/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/23 4:37 PM
COMPLAINT against DRS Contracting, LLC, Chad Mellentine filed by Edward J. Rolwes on behalf of Brandon Ramirez. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8511662. Service due by 9/21/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Rolwes, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet