California Central District Court
Judge:David O Carter
Referred: John D Early
Case #: 8:23-cv-01121
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2023
Terminated:Aug 17, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 20, 2023 2:37 AM PST
Defendant
California Service Center
Represented By
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Ernesto Molina
Us Department Of Justice - Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Vaughn de la Vega Spencer
Department Of Justice, Civil Division, Oil-Dcs
contact info
Defendant
Los Angeles Asylum Office
Represented By
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Ernesto Molina
Us Department Of Justice - Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Vaughn de la Vega Spencer
Department Of Justice, Civil Division, Oil-Dcs
contact info
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Ernesto Molina
Us Department Of Justice - Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Vaughn de la Vega Spencer
Department Of Justice, Civil Division, Oil-Dcs
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Ernesto Molina
Us Department Of Justice - Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Vaughn de la Vega Spencer
Department Of Justice, Civil Division, Oil-Dcs
contact info
Defendant
David M. Radel
Represented By
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Ernesto Molina
Us Department Of Justice - Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Vaughn de la Vega Spencer
Department Of Justice, Civil Division, Oil-Dcs
contact info
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Ernesto Molina
Us Department Of Justice - Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Vaughn de la Vega Spencer
Department Of Justice, Civil Division, Oil-Dcs
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By
Oil Appellate
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Ernesto Molina
Us Department Of Justice - Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Vaughn de la Vega Spencer
Department Of Justice, Civil Division, Oil-Dcs
contact info
Plaintiff
Sally Magdy Tawfik Ghali
Represented By
Richard M Wilner
Wilner And O Reilly Aplc
contact info
Plaintiff
Pierre Michel Benjamin Mohany
Represented By
Richard M Wilner
Wilner And O Reilly Aplc
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
15 15 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Wed 11/06 3:32 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Pierre Michel Benjamin Mohany. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Wilner, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 08/18 11:09 AM
ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO STAY CASE PENDING ADJUDICATION OF APPLICATION13 by Judge David O. Carter: Having read and considered the Joint Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Adjudication of Application submitted by the parties, and finding good cause therefor, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the instant action shall be stayed until November 19, 2024. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
13 13 stip Stay Case Fri 08/11 11:00 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Adjudication of Application filed by Defendants California Service Center, Ur M. Jaddou, Los Angeles Asylum Office, Alejandro Mayorkas, David M. Radel, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security.(Attorney Vaughn de la Vega Spencer added to party California Service Center(pty:dft), Attorney Vaughn de la Vega Spencer added to party Ur M. Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Vaughn de la Vega Spencer added to party Los Angeles Asylum Office(pty:dft), Attorney Vaughn de la Vega Spencer added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Vaughn de la Vega Spencer added to party David M. Radel(pty:dft), Attorney Vaughn de la Vega Spencer added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Vaughn de la Vega Spencer added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft))(Spencer, Vaughn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 07/18 11:30 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Oil Appellate counsel for Defendants California Service Center, Ur M. Jaddou, Los Angeles Asylum Office, Alejandro Mayorkas, David M. Radel, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. Filed by Defendants DHS, et al. (Attorney Oil Appellate added to party California Service Center(pty:dft), Attorney Oil Appellate added to party Ur M. Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Oil Appellate added to party Los Angeles Asylum Office(pty:dft), Attorney Oil Appellate added to party Alejandro Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Oil Appellate added to party David M. Radel(pty:dft), Attorney Oil Appellate added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Oil Appellate added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft))(Appellate, Oil)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
11 11 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Fri 07/14 2:27 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Pierre Michel Benjamin Mohany, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Ealy Aose. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Ealy Aose. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Richard M. Wilner (Wilner, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 06/27 11:53 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
9 9 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Mon 06/26 11:49 AM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form6 . Due to a clerical error, Dkt No. 6, Notice To Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, was issue. Please disregard this notice. (ghap)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 06/26 10:29 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants California Service Center, Ur M. Jaddou, Los Angeles Asylum Office, Alejandro Mayorkas, David M. Radel, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 06/26 10:03 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 06/26 10:02 AM
[NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 6/26/2023, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 9] NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) Modified on 6/26/2023 (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 06/26 10:02 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
4 4 notice Summons Request Fri 06/23 2:05 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 filed by Plaintiff Pierre Michel Benjamin Mohany. (Wilner, Richard)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 06/23 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Pierre Michel Benjamin Mohany, (Wilner, Richard)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 06/23 1:57 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Pierre Michel Benjamin Mohany. (Wilner, Richard)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 06/23 1:56 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35547395 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Pierre Michel Benjamin Mohany. (Attorney Richard M Wilner added to party Pierre Michel Benjamin Mohany(pty:pla))(Wilner, Richard)
Related: [-]