Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Matthew F Leitman
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 2:23-cv-11500
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2023
Terminated:Nov 19, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 20, 2023 5:43 AM EST
Defendant
Environmental Wood Solutions II, LLC
Represented By
Joseph A. Starr
Starr, Butler, Alexopoulos, & Stoner, PLLC
contact info
Frances J. Hollander
Starr, Butler, Alexopoulos & Stoner, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jesus Gillette
Represented By
Zachary T. Runyan
Marko Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ralpheal Hampton
Represented By
Zachary T. Runyan
Marko Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Darryl Morgan
Represented By
Zachary T. Runyan
Marko Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
James Washington
Represented By
Zachary T. Runyan
Marko Law, PLLC
contact info

GPO Nov 13 2023
ORDER Terminating Without Prejudice (1) Defendant's 5 Motion for Sanctions and (2) Defendant's 6 Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
24 24 order Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order Tue 11/19 12:36 PM
STIPULATED ORDER Lifting Stay and Dismissal With Prejudice and Without Costs. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
23 23 order Substitution/Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 05/23 1:55 PM
ORDER Granting Attorney Withdrawal. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
22 22 notice Withdrawal of Attorney Wed 05/22 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Frances J. Hollander for on behalf of Environmental Wood Solutions II, LLC. (Hollander, Frances)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
21 21 order Stipulation and Order Wed 01/10 1:29 PM
STIPULATED ORDER to Stay and Compel Arbitration. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
20 20 order Stipulation and Order Wed 01/03 12:50 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER for substitution of party. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (DPer)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Substitution/Withdrawal of Attorney Wed 01/03 11:26 AM
STIPULATED ORDER for Substitution of Counsel for Plaintiffs Darryl Morgan, Jesus Gillette, James Washington, and Ralpheal Hampton. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
order Text-Only Order Wed 01/03 12:56 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER Terminating18 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Ralpheal Hampton, Jesus Gillette, Darryl Morgan, James Washington. Stipulation and Order Substituting Party Entered at ECF #20. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
18 18 motion Substitute Party Tue 12/26 5:12 PM
MOTION to Substitute Party by All Plaintiffs. (Cermak, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Probate Court Documents
Thursday, December 07, 2023
17 17 order Stipulation and Order Thu 12/07 1:13 PM
STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Plaintiff Jesus Gillette's Time to File Substitution of Party. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Sanctions Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 11/13 10:53 AM
ORDER Terminating Without Prejudice (1) Defendant's5 Motion for Sanctions and (2) Defendant's6 Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Mon 11/13 10:51 AM
Minute Entry for remote proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Status Conference held on 11/13/2023. Order to Follow. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (HRya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
15 15 notice Appear* Wed 11/08 12:28 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY: Status Conference set for 11/13/2023 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Wed 11/08 12:27 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motion Hearing on 11/13/2023 is Cancelled re13 Notice of Hearing on Motion. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
14 14 notice Notice - Other Tue 09/12 8:24 PM
NOTICE by Jesus Gillette Notice of Death (Runyan, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
13 13 notice Hearing on Motion* Thu 09/07 9:40 AM
NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING on5 MOTION for Sanctions and6 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2023 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
12 12 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 08/08 3:27 PM
REPLY to Response re6 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by Environmental Wood Solutions II, LLC. (Hollander, Frances)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Chambers v. Catholic Charities of Shiawassee & Genesee Counties,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - AAA Fees and Costs,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - McMillon v. City of Kalamazoo
Monday, August 07, 2023
11 11 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 08/07 1:49 PM
REPLY to Response re5 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Environmental Wood Solutions II, LLC. (Hollander, Frances)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
10 10 respm Response to Motion Fri 07/28 5:14 PM
RESPONSE to5 MOTION for Sanctions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Runyan, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
9 9 respm Response to Motion Fri 07/28 5:04 PM
RESPONSE to6 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by All Plaintiffs. (Runyan, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
Monday, July 17, 2023
8 8 order Extend Time to - Free Mon 07/17 8:48 AM
STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Plaintiffs' Time to File Responses to Defendant's6 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration and Defendant's5 MOTION for Sanctions. Response due by 7/28/2023. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 01, 2023
7 7 misc Jury Demand Sat 07/01 2:42 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Plaintiffs (Runyan, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
6 6 motion Dismiss Fri 06/30 2:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration by Environmental Wood Solutions II, LLC. (Hollander, Frances)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff Applications for Employment,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Contract Between Employee and Environmental Wood Solutions II, LLC and Acknowledgment and Acceptance of Employee Handbook,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Initial Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - First Amended Complaint,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Defendant's Motion to Stay and Compel Arbitration,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Defendant's Motion for Sanctions,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Stay and Compel Arbitration,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - Plaintiffs' Response to Motion for Sanctions
5 5 motion Sanctions Fri 06/30 2:16 PM
MOTION for Sanctions by Environmental Wood Solutions II, LLC. (Hollander, Frances)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Reid Communications,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Application for Employment,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Contract Between Employee and Environmental Wood Solutions II, LLC and Acknowledgment and Acceptance of Employee Handbook,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's Complaint,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Hollander-Runyan Communication
Thursday, June 29, 2023
4 4 notice Appearance Thu 06/29 7:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary T. Runyan on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Runyan, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
3 3 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Mon 06/26 2:58 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Environmental Wood Solutions II, LLC (Hollander, Frances)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Attorney Appearance Mon 06/26 11:45 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph A. Starr appearing on behalf of Environmental Wood Solutions II, LLC (Starr, Joseph)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Mon 06/26 8:54 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (DPer)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Notice of Removal Fri 06/23 4:55 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Environmental Wood Solutions II, LLC from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 23-006337-CD. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9395671 - Fee: $ 402 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Hollander, Frances)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - First Amended Complaint