Alaska District Court
Judge:H Russel Holland
Case #: 3:23-cv-00137
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2023
Terminated:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 20, 2023 1:33 AM AKST
Defendant
Rafael Soto
Represented By
Michelle Nesbett
Birch Horton Bittner & Cherot
contact info
Plaintiff
Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Kristin E. Crabb
Guess & Rudd P.C.
contact info
Pamela D. Weiss
Guess & Rudd P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
43 43 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/11 10:57 AM
NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S INTENT TO FOREGO ATTORNEY'S FEES by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Weiss, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
42 42 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 03/20 10:26 AM
ORDER granting41 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorney's Fees. Motion due by April 11, 2025 . (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
41 41 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 03/19 3:27 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Attorney Fees re40 Judgment by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Weiss, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 10, 2025
40 40 order Judgment Mon 03/10 3:16 PM
DECLARATORY JUDGMENT in favor of Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 3/10/2025. (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
39 39 12 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion to Strike Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 02/26 12:22 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot27 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; denying28 Motion to Stay; denying as moot29 Motion to Strike; denying as moot32 Motion to Accept Late Filing. See Order for details. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 2/26/2025. (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
38 38 minutes Motion Hearing Thu 02/13 1:02 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge H. Russel Holland: Motion Hearing held 10:28 AM to 11:05 AM on 2/13/2025 and recorded in Anchorage Courtroom 1. Court and counsel heard argument re21 Motion for Summary Judgment,27 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment,28 Motion to Stay,29 Motion to Strike. Defendant's Motion to Strike26 WITHDRAWN . All motions taken UNDER ADVISEMENT . APPEARANCES: Pamela Weiss, PLT; Michelle Nesbett, DEF. (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
37 37 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 02/03 12:15 PM
ORDER granting33 Motion for Hearing re21 Motion for Summary Judgment. Oral Argument set for 2/13/2025 10:30 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 1 before H. Russel Holland. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 2/3/2025. (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
36 36 2 pgs order Order Thu 01/30 12:17 PM
ORDER : Counsel are to confer re proposed dates for Oral Argument. See Order for dates and details. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 1/30/2025. (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
35 35 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 12/27 5:06 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re32 MOTION re27 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Foremost's Duty to Defend to Accept Late Filing filed by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Crabb, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 20, 2024
34 34 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 12/20 2:23 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re28 MOTION to Stay Declaratory Action as to the Issue of Idemnity and Extend Discovery Deadlines filed by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Weiss, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Counsel,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Counsel,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Counsel,
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Counsel,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
33 33 motion Hearing Wed 12/18 2:56 PM
MOTION for Hearing re21 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Weiss, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
32 32 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 12/13 12:02 PM
MOTION re27 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Foremost's Duty to Defend to Accept Late Filing by Rafael Soto.(Nesbett, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Counsel in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
31 31 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 12/11 11:12 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Weiss, Pamela)
Related: [-]
30 30 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 12/11 11:07 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re26 MOTION to Strike21 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Certain Evidence at Dockets 25 and 26 filed by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Weiss, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
29 29 motion Strike Wed 12/11 10:59 AM
MOTION to Strike27 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Foremost's Duty to Defend by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Weiss, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 06, 2024
28 28 motion Stay Fri 12/06 4:11 PM
MOTION to Stay Declaratory Action as to the Issue of Idemnity and Extend Discovery Deadlines by Rafael Soto.(Nesbett, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
27 27 motion Summary Judgment Wed 11/27 2:14 PM
Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Foremost's Duty to Defend by Rafael Soto.(Nesbett, Michelle)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Strike Wed 11/27 2:08 PM
MOTION to Strike21 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Certain Evidence by Rafael Soto.(Nesbett, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
25 25 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 11/27 1:58 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re21 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Motion to Strike Certain Evidence, and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on Duty to Defend filed by Rafael Soto.(Nesbett, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Counsel in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
24 24 misc Document - Sealed pdf Wed 11/13 3:15 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT re21 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,23 Order on Motion to Seal Exhibit C by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Weiss, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit C - Filed Under Seal
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Wed 11/13 2:01 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion to File Under Seal. Unredacted copies of the documents comprising Exhibit C shall be filed under seal. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 11/13/2024. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
22 22 motion Seal Tue 11/12 4:23 PM
MOTION to Seal Motion to File Under Seal by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Weiss, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
21 21 motion Summary Judgment Tue 11/12 4:18 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Weiss, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Placeholder
Monday, September 09, 2024
20 20 trial Witness List Mon 09/09 4:53 PM
Witness List by Rafael Soto. (Nesbett, Michelle)
Related: [-]
19 19 trial Witness List Mon 09/09 3:24 PM
Witness List by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Weiss, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
18 18 trial Witness List Tue 03/26 11:39 AM
Witness List by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Weiss, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
17 17 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 01/25 10:42 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Crabb, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
16 16 misc Supplement Mon 12/18 4:20 PM
SUPPLEMENT TO SCHEDULING AND PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company14 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Weiss, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
15 15 order Scheduling Order Mon 12/11 2:43 PM
SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/23/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 11/22/2024. See Order for additional deadlines . Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 12/11/2023. (SCD, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
14 14 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 12/07 12:32 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Weiss, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
13 13 order Initial Case Status Report Order Tue 11/21 4:19 PM
ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 11/21/2023. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
12 12 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 11/20 3:15 PM
DEFENDANT RAFAEL SOTO'S ANSWER to10 Amended Complaint For Declaratory Relief by Rafael Soto.(Nesbett, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
11 11 notice Certificate of Counsel Mon 11/06 11:56 AM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re10 Amended Complaint CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kristin E. Crabb on behalf of Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Crabb, Kristin)
Related: [-]
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/06 11:35 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against Rafael Soto, filed by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Crabb, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, September 28, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 09/28 11:51 AM
ORDER granting8 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant's answer due 11/20/2023 . (JDS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 09/27 3:36 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Rafael Soto.(Nesbett, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 07/26 1:34 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (UNOPPOSED) Rafael Soto answer due 9/29/2023. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
6 6 order Order of Recusal Tue 07/25 10:20 AM
JMK TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL: Judge Joshua M. Kindred hereby recuses himself from the above-referenced case. Pursuant to the system of random case assignments, this action is reassigned to Judge H. Russel Holland for all further proceedings. Henceforth, please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:23-cv-00137-HRH . (SCD, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 07/21 2:13 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (UNOPPOSED) by Rafael Soto.(Nesbett, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, July 14, 2023
4 4 misc Affidavit Fri 07/14 12:16 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint for Declaratory Relief by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Crabb, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
3 3 service Unissued Summons Fri 06/23 1:05 PM
Unissued summons re Defendant R. Soto, (LMH, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 06/23 12:52 PM
Civil Cover Sheet. (Crabb, Kristin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/23 12:50 PM
COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against Rafael Soto ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AAKDC-3458041.), filed by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Crabb, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
service 1 - Summons Issued Fri 06/23 1:14 PM
Summons Issued as to Rafael Soto. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]