New York Southern District Court
Judge:Kenneth M Karas
Case #: 1:23-cv-05308
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jun 21, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 19, 2023 4:00 AM EST
Defendant
TEG FCU
Represented By
Brian S. Gitnik
Litchfield Cavo Llp (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
James Colliton
18K White Gate
Wappingers, NY 12590


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, June 29, 2023
misc Mailing Receipt Thu 06/29 9:16 AM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 3. Mailed to: James Colliton 18K White Gate Wappingers, NY 12590. (kh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
3 3 1 pgs order Order Granting IFP Application Wed 06/28 3:50 PM
ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/28/2023) (vn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
2 2 misc Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 06/23 9:01 AM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by James Colliton..(rdz)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/23 8:59 AM
COMPLAINT against TEG FCU. Document filed by James Colliton..(rdz)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 06/23 8:59 AM
Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
Related: [-]