California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:23-cv-05047
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2023
Terminated:Nov 09, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Dec 23, 2023 1:16 AM PST
Defendant
California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Represented By
Joanna B Hood
Caag - Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Jennifer Burns
California Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
County of Kern
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Raybon R.C. Johnson
Represented By
Joanna B Hood
Caag - Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Jennifer Burns
California Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Troy Sanders
Represented By
Brian T Dunn
Cochran Firm California
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, January 10, 2025
36 36 appeal USCA Mandate Mon 01/13 8:21 AM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals33 , CCA # 23-4110 The judgment of this Court, entered December 18, 2024, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Costs are taxed against the appellant in the amount of $49.70. [See USCA Memorandum35 , AFFIRMED.](mat)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
35 35 appeal USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order Thu 12/19 10:17 AM
MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals33 filed by Troy Sanders. CCA # 23-4110 The decision of the District Court is AFFIRMED. (mat)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
34 34 appeal USCA Notification of Case Number Thu 12/14 8:13 AM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 23-4110 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals33 as to plaintiff Troy Sanders. (mat)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
33 33 appeal Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Fri 12/08 2:09 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by plaintiff Troy Sanders. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss31 , Judgment,32 . (Appeal Fee - $605 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-36542733.) (Dunn, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
32 32 judgmentCV Judgment Thu 11/09 4:14 PM
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL by Judge Josephine L. Staton. On 11/8/2023, the Court issued an order dismissing Plaintiff's complaint without leave to amend. (Order, Doc.31 .) Accordingly, a JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL is hereby entered. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
31 31 order Dismiss Wed 11/08 2:48 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc.21 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court GRANTS Defendants' motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
30 30 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Hearings Wed 11/01 9:08 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING Motion to Dismiss (Doc.21 ) UNDER SUBMISSION and Vacating Hearing set for 11/3/2023 at 10:30 AM by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument, and the hearing set for 11/3/2023, at 10:30 AM., is VACATED. Additionally, the parties' joint stipulation to appear remotely is DENIED AS MOOT. (Joint Stipulation, Doc.29 .) (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
29 29 misc Miscellaneous Document Wed 10/25 1:47 PM
Stipulated Request for Plaintiff's and the CDCR Defendants' Counsel to Appear Remotely at November 3, 2023 Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Raybon R.C. Johnson re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint 21(Burns, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Friday, October 20, 2023
28 28 respm Reply (Motion related) Fri 10/20 10:44 AM
REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint 21 filed by Defendants California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Raybon R.C. Johnson. (Burns, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Errata Fri 10/20 10:40 AM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Raybon R.C. Johnson. correcting Reply (Motion related)26 (Burns, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
26 26 respm Reply (Motion related) Fri 10/20 8:50 AM
REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint 21 filed by Defendants California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Raybon R.C. Johnson. (Burns, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
25 25 9 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 10/13 8:44 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint 21 filed by Plaintiff Troy Sanders. (Dunn, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
24 24 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 09/26 2:20 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Counsel and/or the parties are advised that the Court has updated its procedures in civil cases, including procedures encouraging consent to the magistrate judge in ordinary civil cases; setting forth presumptive schedules for class certification motion briefing; simplifying the requirements for substituting named defendants for Doe defendants; clarifying requirements for submission of mandatory chambers copies of voluminous exhibits; substituting compliance with the Local Rule regarding limitations on the number of words in the parties briefing for the Courts previous page limitations on briefing; imposing further limitations on the number of words in reply briefs; updating the Courts procedures in the case of settlement, including procedures for orders imposing stays of proceedings, orders of dismissal, and retention of jurisdiction by the Court; imposing limitations on both the number of and the content of motions in limine; and clarifying trial exhibit preparation, including the requirement to prepare a separate binder of exhibits for each witness. These updates are found on the Courts procedures page, and/or the Courts Initial Standing Order and Civil Trial Order, attached thereto. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
23 23 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 09/25 2:00 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 12/8/2023 at 10:30 a.m. See order for details. (gga)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
22 22 misc For Judicial Notice Fri 09/15 9:49 AM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint 21 filed by Defendants California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Raybon R.C. Johnson. (Burns, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Dismiss (cause or other) Fri 09/15 9:46 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendants California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Raybon R.C. Johnson. Motion set for hearing on 11/3/2023 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Burns, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Proof of Service
Thursday, September 14, 2023
20 20 order Dismiss Case Thu 09/14 5:43 PM
ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagarstriking18 MOTION to Dismiss Case; striking19 REQUEST for Judicial Notice. Other: A Motion to Dismiss in this case is to be filed and set in front of the District Judge and not the Magistrate Judge. (bm)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc For Judicial Notice Thu 09/14 11:44 AM
STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DATED 9/14/23, SEE DKT. No.20 . REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 18 (Exhibits A - E) filed by Defendants California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Raybon R.C. Johnson. (Burns, Jennifer) Modified on 9/14/2023 (bm)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Dismiss Case Thu 09/14 11:39 AM
STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DATED 9/14/23, SEE DKT. No.20 . NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Raybon R.C. Johnson. Motion set for hearing on 10/19/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (Burns, Jennifer) Modified on 9/14/2023 (bm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Proof of Service
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
17 17 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Wed 08/30 5:53 PM
ORDER GRANTING Second Stipulation to Extend Defendants' Deadline to File a Response16 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Defendants shall file their responsive pleading on or before 9/14/2023. (jp)
Related: [-]
16 16 stip Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 08/30 1:18 PM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Raybon R.C. Johnson.(Attorney Jennifer Burns added to party California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Burns added to party Raybon R.C. Johnson(pty:dft))(Burns, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
15 15 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Tue 08/01 9:04 AM
ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton, the stipulation14 is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their responsive pleading on or before 8/30/2023. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
14 14 stip Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 07/31 4:38 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Raybon R.C. Johnson.(Attorney Joanna B Hood added to party California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation(pty:dft), Attorney Joanna B Hood added to party Raybon R.C. Johnson(pty:dft))(Hood, Joanna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
13 13 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 07/19 2:02 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Troy Sanders, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Linda Stark - Office Technician, Agent in charge authorized to accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Dunn, Brian)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 07/19 11:51 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Troy Sanders, upon Defendant California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation served on 7/10/2023, answer due 7/31/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Linda Stark - Office Technician, Agent in charge authorized to accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Dunn, Brian)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 07/19 11:46 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Troy Sanders, upon Defendant County of Kern served on 7/11/2023, answer due 8/1/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Laura Belden- Clerk, Agent in charge authorized to accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Dunn, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 07/13 12:35 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Troy Sanders, upon Defendant Raybon R.C. Johnson served on 7/10/2023, answer due 7/31/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Linda Stark - Office Technician, Agent in charge authorized to accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Dunn, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 07/05 9:03 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (vv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 06/28 4:12 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, County of Kern, Raybon R.C. Johnson. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 06/28 4:03 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 06/28 4:02 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 06/28 4:02 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (sh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
4 4 notice Summons Request Tue 06/27 3:15 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff TROY SANDERS. (Dunn, Brian)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 06/27 3:13 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF TROY SANDERS, identifying Troy Sanders, Brian T. Dunn, County of Kern and CDCR. (Dunn, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 06/26 11:22 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff TROY SANDERS. (Dunn, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 06/26 11:20 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35555028 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff TROY SANDERS. (Attorney Brian T Dunn added to party TROY SANDERS(pty:pla))(Dunn, Brian)
Related: [-]