New York Southern District Court
Judge:Louis L Stanton
Case #: 1:23-cv-05391
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2023
Terminated:Nov 03, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Dec 23, 2023 4:29 AM EST
Defendant
Rasmus Haag
Represented By
Greg Mansell
Mansell Law - Greg Mansell
contact info
Defendant
Jaquelin C. Gallego
Represented By
Greg Mansell
Mansell Law - Greg Mansell
contact info
Defendant
Virtual Consignor, Inc.
Represented By
Greg Mansell
Mansell Law - Greg Mansell
contact info
Plaintiff
BidHaus LLC
Represented By
Jason L. Abelove
Law Office Of Jason L. Abelove, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, November 02, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 11/02 12:42 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Rasmus Haag, Jaquelin C. Gallego, Virtual Consignor, Inc.. Document filed by BidHaus LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Abelove, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
12 12 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 08/16 5:55 PM
STIPULATION OF ADJOURNMENT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between counsel for Plaintiff, Law Offices of Jason L. Abelove, P.C., and Mansell Law, LLC counsel for Defendants, that Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss shall be served by September 15, 2023. Defendants' Reply shall be served by October 2, 2023. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that this document may be executed in counterparts and that facsimile and scanned signatures shall have the same force and effect as original signatures. So Ordered. Motions terminated:11 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim . Letter &Stipulation of Adjournment addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton f filed by BidHaus LLC. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/16/2023) (ate)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 08/16 3:23 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim . Letter &Stipulation of Adjournment addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Jason L. Abelove dated August 16, 2023. Document filed by BidHaus LLC. Return Date set for 9/15/2023 at 09:30 AM..(Abelove, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
9 9 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 07/24 8:56 PM
DECLARATION of Jaquelin Gallego in Support re:5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim .. Document filed by Rasmus Haag, Jaquelin C. Gallego, Virtual Consignor, Inc...(Mansell, Greg)
Related: [-]
8 8 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 07/24 8:55 PM
DECLARATION of Rasmus Haag in Support re:5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim .. Document filed by Rasmus Haag, Jaquelin C. Gallego, Virtual Consignor, Inc...(Mansell, Greg)
Related: [-]
7 7 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 07/24 8:54 PM
DECLARATION of Greg R. Mansell in Support re:5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim .. Document filed by Rasmus Haag, Jaquelin C. Gallego, Virtual Consignor, Inc...(Mansell, Greg)
Related: [-]
6 6 25 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 07/24 8:53 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim . . Document filed by Rasmus Haag, Jaquelin C. Gallego, Virtual Consignor, Inc...(Mansell, Greg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Screenshot of BidHaus Website,
Att: 2 Exhibit B. Screenshot of BidHaus Auction,
Att: 3 Exhibit C. Mutual Confidentiality, Non-Competition & Non-Solicitation Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit D. Screenshot of VCI Website
5 5 motion Dismiss Mon 07/24 8:46 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim . Document filed by Rasmus Haag, Jaquelin C. Gallego, Virtual Consignor, Inc...(Mansell, Greg)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 06/30 5:05 PM
ORDER granting3 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re3 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Greg R. Mansell dated 06/30/2023. SO ORDERED. Rasmus Haag answer due 7/24/2023; Jaquelin C. Gallego answer due 7/24/2023; Virtual Consignor, Inc. answer due 7/24/2023. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/30/2023) (jca)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 06/30 1:03 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Greg R. Mansell dated 06/30/2023. Document filed by Rasmus Haag, Jaquelin C. Gallego, Virtual Consignor, Inc...(Mansell, Greg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Tue 06/27 2:23 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Greg Mansell. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jaquelin Gallego, Virtual Consignor LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name entered incorrectly. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 06/27 2:26 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 06/27 2:26 PM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 06/27 2:27 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 06/26 11:15 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mansell, Greg)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 06/26 11:13 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 650993/2023. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27918447).Document filed by Virtual Consignor LLC, Rasmus Haag, Jaquelin Gallego..(Mansell, Greg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. State Court Summons and Complaint