Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Cristal C Brisco
Referred: Scott J Frankel
Case #: 3:23-cv-00588
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Dec 23, 2023 4:28 AM EST
Defendant
Jeffery Diggins
Represented By
Elizabeth A Klesmith
Thk Law Llp - Sb/in
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Kozora
Represented By
Elizabeth A Klesmith
Thk Law Llp - Sb/in
contact info
Plaintiff
Isaiah Savado
Represented By
Vincenzo B Caporale
contact info
Brian M Orozco
contact info
Gregory E Kulis
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jay Diggins
Terminated: 08/02/2023
Represented By
Elizabeth A Klesmith
Thk Law Llp - Sb/in
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, March 20, 2025
61 61 minutes Settlement Conference Thu 03/20 12:43 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 3/20/2025 before Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel. Pla appeared with atty Kenneth Hurst. Dft appeared by Assistant City Attorney Kylie Connell and with atty Elizabeth Klesmith. Parties appeared for judicial settlement conference and negotiated in good faith but failed to reach a comprehensive settlement agreement. Parties are encouraged to engage in direct negotiations. This concludes Magistrate Judge Scott J. Frankel's involvement in this matter. (ers)
Related: [-]