Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Patricia Tolliver Giles
Referred: Ivan D Davis
Case #: 1:23-cv-00821
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark (Anticybersquatting consumer protection)
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2023
Terminated:Apr 16, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 23, 2023 4:56 AM EST
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Nissan.com
Defendant
Nissan.net
Plaintiff
Estate of Uzi Nissan
Represented By
Attison Leonard Barnes, III
Wiley Rein LLP
contact info
Spencer Brooks
Wiley Rein LLP
contact info
David Edison Weslow
Wiley Rein Llp (dc-Na)
contact info
Spencer Christian Brooks
Wiley Rein Llp (dc-Na)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
25 25 order Judgment - Default Tue 04/16 4:30 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as to Count I of the First Amended Complaint in favor of plaintiff Estate of Uzi Nissan and against Defendant Domain Names Nissan.com and Nissan.net. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 4/16/2024. (Sbro, )
Related: [-]
24 24 2 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Report and Recommendations Tue 04/16 4:05 PM
It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (Dkt. 19) is GRANTED (See Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 4/16/2024. (Sbro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
23 23 motion Report and Recommendations Wed 01/31 1:20 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re19 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Nissan.com and Nissan.net filed by Estate of Uzi Nissan. Objections to R&R due by 2/14/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 1/31/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
22 22 minutes Motion Hearing Fri 12/08 10:08 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis:Motion Hearing held on 12/8/2023 re19 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Nissan.com and Nissan.net filed by Estate of Uzi Nissan. Appearance of Counsel for Plaintiff. Matter uncontested. Motion taken under advisement. Report and recommendation to follow. (Tape #FTR.)(lgue, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 11/20 11:23 AM
Set Deadline as to19 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Nissan.com and Nissan.net. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (wgar, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
21 21 misc Notice of Hearing Date Fri 11/17 5:41 PM
Notice of Hearing Date set for December 8, 2023 re19 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Nissan.com and Nissan.net (Barnes, Attison)
Related: [-]
20 20 16 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Fri 11/17 5:36 PM
Memorandum in Support re19 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Nissan.com and Nissan.net filed by Estate of Uzi Nissan. (Barnes, Attison)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Default Judgment Fri 11/17 5:32 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Nissan.com and Nissan.net by Estate of Uzi Nissan.(Barnes, Attison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
18 18 order Clerks Entry of Default Wed 11/15 10:44 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Nissan.com, Nissan.net, and John Doe (Sbro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
17 17 motion Entry of Default Tue 11/14 12:46 PM
Request for Entry of Default as to all remaining Defendants by Estate of Uzi Nissan.(Barnes, Attison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of S. Brooks
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
16 16 misc Declaration Wed 11/08 1:34 PM
Declaration re15 Order on Motion for Service by Publication,, by Estate of Uzi Nissan.(Barnes, Attison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter Regarding Compliance
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Service by Publication Thu 10/19 7:49 AM
Order - Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for an Order to Publish Notice of Action pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 1125(d)(2)(A)(ii)(II)(bb) and Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law and Declaration in support thereof, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. That a copy of this Order be published in The Washington Times or The Washington Post withing fourteen (14) days after entry of this Order; 2. That a copy of this Order be provided through the registrar GKG.NET' s electronic portal to the registrant(s) of the Defendant domain names NISSAN.COM and NISSAN.NET (Defendant Domain Names). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 10/18/2023. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (wgar, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
14 14 misc Waiver of Tue 10/17 3:14 PM
Waiver of Hearing in re 11 MOTION for Service by Publication CORRECTED by Estate of Uzi Nissan (Barnes, Attison)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Waiver of Tue 10/17 2:57 PM
Waiver of Hearing in re 11 MOTION for Service by Publication by Estate of Uzi Nissan (Barnes, Attison)
Related: [-]
12 12 6 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Tue 10/17 2:36 PM
Memorandum in Support re11 MOTION for Service by Publication filed by Estate of Uzi Nissan.(Barnes, Attison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Brooks Decl.)
11 11 motion Service by Publication Tue 10/17 2:29 PM
MOTION for Service by Publication by Estate of Uzi Nissan.(Barnes, Attison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 10/17 12:51 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Doe, Nissan.com, Nissan.net, filed by Estate of Uzi Nissan.(Barnes, Attison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Expedite Wed 08/09 12:52 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff established that good cause exists for it to serve a third party subpoena on GKG.net, Inc. and InMotion Hosting, Inc. (hereinafter the ISP). See e.g., Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, No. CV 13-512 JKB, 2013 WL 3732780, at *1 (D. Md. July 12, 2013); Arista Records LLC v. Does 1-19, 551 F. Supp. 2d 1, 67 (D.D.C. 2008); Plaintiff may also serve a Rule 45 subpoena in the same manner as above on any service provider that is identified in response to a subpoena as a provider of Internet services to the Defendant (see Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 08/09/23. (pmil, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Wed 07/05 2:50 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Spencer Christian Brooks for Estate of Uzi Nissan. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 7/5/2023. (swil)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro hac vice Wed 07/05 2:49 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed David Edison Weslow for Estate of Uzi Nissan. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 7/5/2023. (swil)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 03, 2023
6 6 misc Waiver of Mon 07/03 2:56 PM
Waiver of re4 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Estate of Uzi Nissan (Barnes, Attison)
Related: [-]
5 5 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Mon 07/03 2:51 PM
Memorandum in Support re4 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Estate of Uzi Nissan. (Barnes, Attison)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Expedite Mon 07/03 2:47 PM
MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Estate of Uzi Nissan.(Barnes, Attison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
3 3 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/03 2:43 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Spencer C. Brooks and Certification of Local Counsel Attison L. Barnes III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9008953. by Estate of Uzi Nissan. (Barnes, Attison)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/03 2:36 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David E. Weslow and Certification of Local Counsel Attison L. Barnes III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9008935. by Estate of Uzi Nissan. (Barnes, Attison)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 06/26 4:45 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8998378.), filed by Estate of Uzi Nissan.(Barnes, Attison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D
utility Initial Case Assignment Wed 06/28 6:36 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (Dest)
Related: [-]