Lordstown Motors Corp.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary F Walrath |
Case #: | 1:23-bk-10831 |
Case Filed: | Jun 26, 2023 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 5,001-10,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Lordstown Motors Corp.
27000 Hills Tech Court
Farmington Hills, MI 48331 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
1. | Lordstown Motors files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy protection (detroitnews.com) |
Submitted Tue 06/27/2023 | |
Docket last updated: 20 minutes ago |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
1198 | 1198
misc
Certificate of No Objection
Thu 05/02 4:29 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Changing the Case Caption Filed by Lordstown Motors Corp.. (Keilson, Brya) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
1197 | 1197
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 05/01 7:20 PM
Certificate of Service re: Third Interim and Final Application of White & Case LLP, as Attorneys for the Debtors and Debtors in Possession, for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert) |
|
1196 | 1196
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Wed 05/01 5:27 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 23-10833 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Lordstown Motors Corp.. (Monzo, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Notes | ||
1195 | 1195
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Wed 05/01 5:25 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Case Number 23-10832 for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Lordstown Motors Corp.. (Monzo, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Notes | ||
1194 | 1194
misc
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report
Wed 05/01 5:22 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2024 Filed by Lordstown Motors Corp.. (Monzo, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Notes | ||
1193 | 1193
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR
Wed 05/01 5:18 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-10833 for the Month Ending: 03/13/2024 Filed by Lordstown Motors Corp.. (Monzo, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Notes | ||
1192 | 1192
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR
Wed 05/01 5:13 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 23-10832 for the Month Ending: 03/13/2024 Filed by Lordstown Motors Corp.. (Monzo, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Notes | ||
1191 | 1191
crditcrd
none
Wed 05/01 5:13 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Transfer/Assignment of Claim([LINK 23-10831 MFW] ) [claims,trclm] ( 28.00). Receipt Number A11572028, amount $ 28.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1190 | 1190
misc
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR
Wed 05/01 5:08 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/13/2024 Filed by Lordstown Motors Corp.. (Monzo, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Notes | ||
1189 | 1189
claims
Transfer/Assignment of Claim
Wed 05/01 4:12 PM
Transfer/Assignment of Claim. Fee Amount $28 Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferor: Mainfreight, Inc. To Argo Partners. Filed by Argo Partners, Inc.. (Singer, Michael) |
|
1188 | 1188
notice
Name Change - Notice
Wed 05/01 11:33 AM
Notice of Name Change of Attorney Filed by Foxconn EV Property Development LLC, Foxconn EV System LLC, Foxconn EV Technology, Inc., Foxconn Ltd. (Far East), Foxconn Ventures Pte. Ltd., Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd. (a/k/a Hon Hai Technology Group). (Harvey, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
1187 | 1187
misc
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required
Tue 04/30 5:44 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Regarding Regarding Eighth Monthly Application of White & Case LLP for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period February 1, 2024 to February 29, 2024 Filed by Lordstown Motors Corp.. (Monzo, Eric) |
|
1186 | 1186
misc
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required
Tue 04/30 4:25 PM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required Regarding Sixth Monthly Fee Application of Brown Rudnick LLP, as Counsel for the Official Committee of Equity Security Holders of Lordstown Motors Corp., et al., for Allowance of Interim Compensation and for Reimbursement of Disbursements Incurred for the period February 1, 2024 to February 29, 2024 Filed by Official Committee of Equity Security Holders. (Monzo, Eric) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
1185 | 1185
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Mon 04/29 10:10 PM
Final Application for Compensation -- Final Application for Allowance of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses for M3 Advisory Partners, LP, as Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Equity Security Holders, for Services Rendered for the period September 7, 2023 to March 14, 2024 Filed by Official Committee of Equity Security Holders. Hearing scheduled for 6/11/2024 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2024. (Monzo, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C | ||
1184 | 1184
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Mon 04/29 10:00 PM
Final Application for Compensation -- Final Application of Morris James LLP, as Delaware Counsel to the Official Committee of Equity Security Holders, for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period September 7, 2023 to March 14, 2024 Filed by Official Committee of Equity Security Holders. Hearing scheduled for 6/11/2024 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2024. (Monzo, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 5 Declaration | ||
1183 | 1183
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Mon 04/29 9:51 PM
Final Application for Compensation -- Final Application for Allowance of Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses of Brown Rudnick LLP, as Counsel to the Official Committee of Equity Security Holders of Lordstown Motors Corp., et al., for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the period September 7, 2023 to March 14, 2024 Filed by Official Committee of Equity Security Holders. Hearing scheduled for 6/11/2024 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2024. (Monzo, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C | ||
1182 | 1182
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Mon 04/29 5:21 PM
Final Application for Compensation -- Second Interim and Final Application of Winston & Strawn LLP for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period August 15, 2023 to December 31, 2023 Filed by Lordstown Motors Corp.. Hearing scheduled for 6/11/2024 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2024. (Monzo, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D | ||
1181 | 1181
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Mon 04/29 5:10 PM
Final Application for Compensation -- Final Application of Silverman Consulting for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period June 27, 2023 to March 14, 2024 Filed by Lordstown Motors Corp.. Hearing scheduled for 6/11/2024 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2024. (Monzo, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
1180 | 1180
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Mon 04/29 4:45 PM
Final Application for Compensation [Combined (I) Eighth Monthly Application of Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP as Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the Period from February 1, 2024 Through and Including March 14, 2024; and (II) Final Fee Application for the Period from July 17, 2023 Through and Including March 14, 2024] for the period to Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Hearing scheduled for 6/11/2024 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2024. |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Timekeeper Summaries | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Summaries of Compensation by Project Category | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Summaries of Expenses by Category | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Detailed Description, by Project Category, of Services Rendered During 8th Monthly Fee Period | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Detailed Description, by Project Category, of Services Rendered During 8th Monthly Fee Period | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G - ustomary and Comparable Compensation Disclosures | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H - Budget and Staffing Plan | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I - Additional Disclosures | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J - Certification | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 13 Certificate of Service | ||
1179 | 1179
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Mon 04/29 12:46 PM
Final Application for Compensation // Combined Third Interim and Final Application of Baker & Hostetler LLP for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period (I) Third Interim Period from January 1, 2024 through and including March 14, 2024; and (II) Final Period from June 27, 2023 to and including March 14, 2024 Filed by Baker & Hostetler LLP. Hearing scheduled for 6/11/2024 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2024. (Lyons, Jeffrey) |
|
1178 | 1178
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Mon 04/29 11:45 AM
Monthly Application for Compensation -- Sixth Monthly Application of M3 Advisory Partners, LP, as Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Equity Security Holders, for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period February 1, 2024 to February 29, 2024 Filed by Official Committee of Equity Security Holders. Objections due by 5/20/2024. (Monzo, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 3 Declaration | ||
1177 | 1177
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Mon 04/29 11:36 AM
Monthly Application for Compensation -- Fifth Monthly Application of M3 Advisory Partners, LP, as Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Equity Security Holders, for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period January 1, 2024 to January 31, 2024 Filed by Official Committee of Equity Security Holders. Objections due by 5/20/2024. (Monzo, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 4 Declaration | ||
1176 | 1176
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Mon 04/29 10:01 AM
Final Application for Compensation // Combined Sixth Monthly and Final Application of Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Co-Counsel for the Debtors and Debtors-in-Possession for the period (I) Monthly Period from March 1, 2024 through March 14, 2024; and (II) Final Period from October 6, 2023 to March 14, 2024 Filed by Lordstown Motors Corp.. Hearing scheduled for 6/11/2024 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2024. (Patterson, Morgan) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C | ||
1175 | 1175
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Mon 04/29 8:33 AM
Final Application for Compensation -- Final Fee Application of KPMG LLP Providing Audit Services to the Debtors Requesting Final Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the period June 27, 2023 to March 14, 2024 Filed by Lordstown Motors Corp.. Hearing scheduled for 6/11/2024 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2024. (Monzo, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Att: 2 Declaration | ||
1174 | 1174
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Mon 04/29 8:19 AM
Interim Application for Compensation -- Third Interim Application of Silverman Consulting for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period January 1, 2024 to March 14, 2024 Filed by Lordstown Motors Corp.. Hearing scheduled for 6/11/2024 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2024. (Monzo, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
1173 | 1173
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Mon 04/29 8:12 AM
Monthly Application for Compensation -- Ninth Monthly Application of Silverman Consulting for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period March 1, 2024 to March 14, 2024 Filed by Lordstown Motors Corp.. Objections due by 5/20/2024. (Monzo, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Saturday, April 27, 2024 | ||
1172 | 1172
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Sat 04/27 11:03 AM
Final Application for Compensation -- Third Interim and Final Application of White & Case LLP, as Attorneys for the Debtors and Debtors in Possession, for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period June 27, 2023 to March 14, 2024 Filed by Lordstown Motors Corp.. Hearing scheduled for 6/11/2024 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/20/2024. (Monzo, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Att: 2 Exhibits A - L | ||
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
1171 | 1171
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 04/26 8:09 PM
Certificate of Service re: 1) Amended Notice of Third Fee Application Request of KPMG LLP for the Period From January 1, 2024 to and Including March 14, 2024; 2) Final Fee Application of Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, as Administrative Advisor to the Debtors, for the Period From June 27, 2023 Through and Including March 14, 2024; and 3) Final Fee Application of Jefferies LLC as Investment Banker for the Debtors and Debtors in Possession for Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period From June 27, 2023 to and Including March 14, 2024 Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert) |
|
1170 | 1170
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 04/26 8:04 PM
Certificate of Service re: Notice of Third Interim Fee Application Request of KPMG LLP for the Period From January 1, 2024 and Including March 14, 2024 Filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Kass, Albert) |
|
1169 | 1169
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Fri 04/26 11:29 AM
Application for Compensation (Ninth) of Baker & Hostetler LLP, as Special Litigation and Corporate Counsel for the Debtors, for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period March 1, 2024 to March 14, 2024 Filed by Baker & Hostetler LLP. Objections due by 5/16/2024. (Lyons, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
1168 | 1168
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Fri 04/26 11:26 AM
Application for Compensation (Eighth) of Baker & Hostetler LLP, as Special Litigation and Corporate Counsel for the Debtors, for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period February 1, 2024 to February 29, 2024 Filed by Baker & Hostetler LLP. Objections due by 5/16/2024. (Lyons, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
1167 | 1167
misc
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required
Fri 04/26 11:22 AM
Certificate of No Objection - No Order Required // Certification of No Objection Regarding Seventh Monthly Fee Application of Baker & Hostetler LLP, as Special Litigation and Corporate Counsel for the Debtors, for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period January 1, 2024 through January 31, 2024 Filed by Baker & Hostetler LLP. (Lyons, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
1166 | 1166
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Thu 04/25 5:03 PM
Final Application for Compensation -- Final Application of Jefferies LLC as Investment Banker for the Debtors and Debtors in Possession for Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the period June 27, 2023 to March 14, 2024 Filed by Lordstown Motors Corp.. Hearing scheduled for 6/11/2024 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/16/2024. (Monzo, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B | ||
1165 | 1165
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Thu 04/25 4:37 PM
Final Application for Compensation -- Final Fee Application of Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC, as Administrative Advisor to the Debtors, for the Period from for the period June 27, 2023 to March 14, 2024 Filed by Lordstown Motors Corp.. Hearing scheduled for 6/11/2024 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/16/2024. (Monzo, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
1164 | 1164
misc
Exhibit
Thu 04/25 4:07 PM
Exhibit(s) -- Amended Notice of Third Fee Application Request of KPMG LLP for the Period From January 1, 2024 to an Including March 14, 2024 Filed by Lordstown Motors Corp.. (Monzo, Eric) |
|
1163 | 1163
motion
Compensation - Application (Attorney)
Thu 04/25 3:52 PM
Final Application for Compensation [Combined Eighth Monthly and Final Application of Huron Consulting Group Inc., Financial Advisor to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for (I) The Monthly Period from March 1, 2024 Through March 14, 2024, and (II) The Final Period from July 18, 2023 Through and Including March 14, 2024] for the period to Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Hearing scheduled for 6/11/2024 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/16/2024. |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service |