Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10169

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Martin Glenn
Case #: 1:23-ap-01135
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2023
Terminated:Feb 19, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Guido Dolci
Represented By
Guido Dolci
contact info
Defendant
Nadia Shahrik
Represented By
Nadia Shahrik
contact info
Defendant
Massimo Tacchini
Represented By
Massimo Tacchini
contact info
Defendant
Major Model Management Inc.
344 West 38th Street, Suite 602
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
Melissa A. Pena
Norris Mclaughlin, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Major Miami LLC
Represented By
Major Miami LLC
contact info
Defendant
Mensboard Management, Inc.
Represented By
Mensboard Management, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Gemide srl
Represented By
Gemide srl
contact info
Plaintiff
Pedro Agra
500 E 63rd Str Apt 13F
New York, NY 10065
Represented By
Pedro Agra
contact info

GPO Aug 18 2023
Memorandum Opinion and Order, Signed on 8/18/2023, Granting Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice With Respect to the Debtor. (related document(s)6) (Anderson, Deanna)

Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
18 18 order Order, Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Wed 02/19 3:21 PM
Order Closing Adversary Proceeding signed on 2/19/2025. (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-]
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 02/19 3:23 PM
Adversary Case 1:23-ap-1135 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
17 17 11 pgs order Order of U.S. District Court Judge Wed 07/17 4:06 PM
ORDER OF U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE VALERIE E. CAPRONI signed on 7/17/2024 OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons discussed above, the Bankruptcy Court's order is AFFIRMED, and Appellants appeal is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (TG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
16 16 16 pgs misc Transcript Tue 09/19 11:14 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 08/03/23 at 11:00 A.M. RE: Pre-Trial Conference Using Zoom For Government (Docs 1,3,4,5) Etc. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 12/18/2023. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: AA EXPRESS TRANSCRIPTS.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 9/26/2023. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 10/10/2023. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 10/20/2023. Transcript access will be restricted through 12/18/2023. (Su, Kevin)
Related: [-] 9 ,10 ,6 ,8 ,4 ,7 ,5 ,1 ,3
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
15 15 2 pgs order Order of U.S. District Court Judge Tue 09/05 3:35 PM
Copy of Order of U.S. District Court Judge Valerie E. Caproni signed on 8/30/2023 Granting Appellant's Application for In Forma Pauperis Re: Notice of Appeal. Related [+] (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-] 13
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
14 14 appeal Civil Cover Sheet Tue 08/29 1:37 PM
Civil Cover Sheet from U.S. District Court, Case Number: 23-cv-07657. Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Related [+] (Lopez, Mary)
Related: [-] 12
13 13 motion Application for In Forma Pauperis Re: Appeal Tue 08/29 12:54 PM
Application for In Forma Pauperis Re: Notice of Appeal Related [+] filed by Pedro Agra. (Lopez, Mary)
Related: [-] 12
12 12 appeal Notice, Appeal (fee) Tue 08/29 12:52 PM
Notice of Appeal Related [+] filed by Pedro Agra.(Lopez, Mary)
Related: [-] 11
Att: 1 Exhibit Order
Att: 2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet
Friday, August 18, 2023
11 11 20 pgs order Written Opinion Fri 08/18 8:58 AM
Memorandum Opinion and Order, Signed on 8/18/2023, Granting Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice With Respect to the Debtor. Related [+] (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 6
misc Terminate Party Fri 08/18 9:12 AM
Defendant Major Model Management Inc. terminated from case Related [+]. (Gomez, Jessica)
Related: [-] ument No.11
Monday, July 31, 2023
10 10 answer Reply Mon 07/31 6:28 PM
Reply to Motion In Further Support Related [+] filed by Melissa A. Pena on behalf of Major Model Management Inc.. (Pena, Melissa)
Related: [-] 6
Thursday, July 27, 2023
9 9 ans Declaration Fri 07/28 2:32 PM
Declaration /Plaintiffs Declaration In Support Of Plaintiffs Objections To Debtors Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint, Pursuant To FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6), Made Applicable Hereto By FED. R. BANKR. P. 7012(B) Forfailure To State A Claim On Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by Pedro Agra. (Braithwaite, Kenishia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
8 8 misc Letter Tue 07/25 4:08 PM
Letter Filed by Kenneth Steven Sussmane on behalf of Nadia Shahrik. (Sussmane, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 07/20 2:51 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Melissa A. Pena on behalf of Major Model Management Inc.. (Pena, Melissa)
Related: [-] 6
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
6 6 motion Motion, Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 07/18 5:51 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Melissa A. Pena on behalf of Major Model Management Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/3/2023 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 523 (MG) (Pena, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Melissa A. Pena, Esq. in Support of Debtor's Motion to Dismiss The Complaint for Failure to State Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted
Att: 2 Debtor's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Filed by Pedro Agra
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 29, 2023
5 5 misc Certificate of Mailing PDF notice Fri 06/30 12:12 AM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] . Notice Date 06/29/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #4 )
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
4 4 order Application, To Have Filing Fee Waived (In Forma Pauperis) Tue 06/27 1:16 PM
Order, Signed on 6/27/2023, Waiving Filing Fee for Adversary Proceeding Complaint Related [+]. (Anderson, Deanna)
Related: [-] 2
Monday, June 26, 2023
3 3 1 pgs cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Mon 06/26 3:53 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/3/2023 at 11:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG), Answer due by 7/26/2023, (Su, Kevin)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Application, To Have Filing Fee Waived (In Forma Pauperis) Mon 06/26 3:16 PM
Application to Have Filing Fee Waived filed by Pedro Agra. (Su, Kevin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 06/26 3:09 PM
Adversary case 23-01135 Complaint against Guido Dolci, Nadia Shahrik, Massimo Tacchini, Major Model Management Inc., Major Miami LLC, Gemide srl Mensboard Management, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)), (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)), (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Filed by Pedro Agra. (Su, Kevin)
Related: [-]