California Central District Court
Judge:Mark C Scarsi
Referred: Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 2:23-cv-05108
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2023
Terminated:Oct 15, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 24, 2023 12:43 AM PST
Defendant
Atama Premier Foods
Represented By
William L. Niu
Law Offices Of William L. Niu
contact info
Defendant
Soo Jong, Inc.
Defendant
Erwan Sutanto
Plaintiff
Porter Capital Corporation
Represented By
Jennifer Ann Riso
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Ustov, Inc.
Terminated: 09/15/2023
Represented By
Maria S Bellafronto
Hopkins And Carley
contact info
Jedidiah L Dooley
Hopkins & Carley Alc
contact info
Defendant
HNK Inc.
Terminated: 09/27/2023
Represented By
Scott Alan Schiff
Soukup And Schiff, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
57 57 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held Tue 10/15 4:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) Order of Dismissal (JS6) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. re: Notice of Settlement56 . (smo)
Related: [-]
56 56 notice Settlement Tue 10/15 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Porter Capital Corporation. (Riso, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
55 55 order For Order Wed 10/09 4:49 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION53 . This case is scheduled for a jury trial on November 19, 2024. Plaintiff Porter Capital Corporation filed an ex parte application to convert the upcoming trial from a jury trial to a bench trial. The Court denies the application (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC DISCUSSION ). The Court orders the parties to confer regarding whether this will be a benchtrial or a jury trial and file within 14 days after the issuance of this Order either ajoint stipulation stating whether the case will be tried to a jury or to the Court or, ifthe parties disagree, separate briefs stating their positions. The Court warns thatfurther failure by any party to initiate or participate in a conference on this issue willbe deemed willful disobedience of this Order and will result in sanctions (lc)
Related: [-]