South Carolina Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Elisabetta Gm Gasparini
Case #: 2:23-bk-01861
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Aug 07, 2023
Terminated:Dec 07, 2023

Debtor
AKA Auto Brokers, LLC
308 Old Trolley Road
Summerville, SC 29485
Represented By
Robert R. Meredith, Jr.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Kevin Campbell
PO Box 684
Mount Pleasant, SC 29465
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee's Office
Strom Thurmond Federal Building 1835 Assembly St. Suite 953
Columbia, SC 29201


Docket last updated: 06/28/2023 12:02 AM EDT
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet Tue 06/27 3:52 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (atty)([LINK 23-01861 ) [misc,volp7ac] ( 338.00). Receipt Number A13468574, amount 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (atty) Tue 06/27 3:28 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition, Schedules and Statements - Non-Individual Filed by Robert R. Meredith Jr. on behalf of AKA Auto Brokers, LLC. (Meredith, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing Tue 06/27 3:33 PM
Debtor's Request to Activate Electronic Noticing. DOCUMENT IMAGE AVAILABLE ONLY TO COURT USERS AND THE TRUSTEE/US TRUSTEE. Filed by Robert R. Meredith Jr. on behalf of AKA Auto Brokers, LLC. (Meredith, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Ch 7 Business (No Asset) Meeting of Creditors Tue 06/27 3:55 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors,. Document Served. 341(a)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Declaration Tue 06/27 4:03 PM
Declaration re: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (atty) filed by Debtor AKA Auto Brokers, LLC Statement Regarding Authority to Sign and File Petition and Resolution of Board of Directors Filed by Robert R. Meredith Jr. on behalf of AKA Auto Brokers, LLC. Related [+]. (Meredith, Robert)
Related: [-] 1