Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Sara Darrow
Referred: Jonathan E Hawley
Case #: 1:22-cv-01204
Nature of Suit375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2022
Terminated:Sep 19, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 28, 2023 11:01 PM CDT
Defendant
Midwest Urological Group Ltd
Defendant
PR Manufacturing Enterprises LLC
Defendant
Reditus Healthcare LLC
Defendant
Reditus Laboratories LLC
Defendant
Aaron James Rossi
Plaintiff
Ferzad Abdi
Represented By
Amanda S Yarusso
Amanda S. Yarusso
contact info
Louis Jay Cohen
Louis J Cohen
contact info
John Timothy Keller
Aschemann Keller LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Illinois
Represented By
John Timothy Keller
Aschemann Keller LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
United States
Represented By
Kathy Swett
Us Atty
contact info
Kimberly A Klein
Us Attorney
contact info
John Timothy Keller
Aschemann Keller LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, January 03, 2025
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 01/03 9:46 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on January 3, 2025. The Court GRANTS the43 Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Meredith R.W. DeCarlo is terminated as counsel of record for Defendant Reditus Laboratories, LLC. (ARR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
43 43 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 12/31 1:42 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Reditus Laboratories LLC. Responses due by 1/14/2025 (DeCarlo, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
42 42 misc Judgment Thu 09/19 3:57 PM
JUDGMENT entered. (DS)
Related: [-]
41 41 misc Reply (NOT related to a motion/petition) Thu 09/19 3:02 PM
Reply In Support of Its32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Reditus Laboratories LLC (DS)
Related: [-]
40 40 14 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 09/19 5:38 AM
ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on September 19, 2024. Defendant Reditus Laboratories, LLC's31 Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint and37 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss are GRANTED. Relator Abdi Ferzad's action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to file the [37-1] proposed reply on the docket, enter judgment, and close the case. (ARR)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
39 39 misc Objection Fri 05/17 4:34 PM
OBJECTION and Memorandum to Reditus Laboratories' Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief to37 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss--UNOPPOSED by Ferzad Abdi, State of Illinois, United States. (Keller, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/10 4:15 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on May 10, 2024. Defendant Reditus Laboratories'38 Motion to Correct Text of Docket Entry 37 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to update the37 docket entry to reflect that the37 motion for leave to file a reply is not unopposed. Any response to the37 motion is still due by May 20, 2024. (ARR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
38 38 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/09 5:47 PM
MOTION CORRECT TEXT OF DOCKET ENTRY # 37 re37 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss--UNOPPOSED by Defendant Reditus Laboratories LLC. Responses due by 5/23/2024 (Ziegelmueller, William)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 04, 2024
37 37 motion Leave to File Document Sat 05/04 1:30 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss--UNOPPOSED by Defendant Reditus Laboratories LLC. Responses due by 5/20/2024(Ziegelmueller, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
36 36 respm Response to Motion/Petition Wed 04/10 7:23 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Plaintiffs Ferzad Abdi, State of Illinois, United States. (Cohen, Louis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
35 35 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/05 9:01 AM
NOTICE Proposed Order re34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Reditus Lab Motion to Dismiss (Keller, John)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 03/05 11:59 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on March 5, 2024. Plaintiffs-Relator filed an34 unopposed motion for extension of time to file a response to Defendant's31 motion to dismiss. The original response deadline was March 5, 2024, so the request was timely. See Civil LR 7.1(B)(2) ("The response must be filed within 14 days after service of the motion and memorandum."). The Court GRANTS the34 motion for extension of time. Plaintiffs-Relator's response is now due April 10, 2024. (ARR)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
34 34 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 03/04 4:53 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Reditus Lab Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Ferzad Abdi, State of Illinois, United States. Responses due by 3/18/2024 (Keller, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
33 33 misc 7.1 Disclosure Statement Wed 02/21 9:55 AM
Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by PR Manufacturing Enterprises LLC. (Blake, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
32 32 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 02/20 5:40 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Defendant Reditus Laboratories LLC. Responses due by 3/5/2024(Ziegelmueller, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
31 31 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 02/20 5:37 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Proposed Order by Defendant Reditus Laboratories LLC. Responses due by 3/5/2024 (Ziegelmueller, William)
Related: [-]
30 30 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 02/20 2:03 PM
ANSWER to29 Amended Complaint by PR Manufacturing Enterprises LLC, Aaron James Rossi.(Blake, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 01/08 10:11 AM
TEXT ORDER granting28 the United States and the State of Illinois, by and through qui tam relator Ferzab Abdi's Motion to Amend Complaint. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 1/8/2024. (KZ)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
29 29 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 12/22 7:04 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT United States, ex rel. Ferzad Abdi, and the State of Illinois against PR Manufacturing Enterprises LLC, Reditus Healthcare LLC, Reditus Laboratories LLC, Aaron James Rossi, filed by Ferzad Abdi.(Cohen, Louis)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Amend/Correct Fri 12/22 6:48 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Plaintiff Ferzad Abdi. Responses due by 1/5/2024 (Cohen, Louis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 11/16 10:30 AM
TEXT ORDER granting26 Plaintiff and Defendants' Stipulated Motion for Scheduling Order setting deadline to Amend Complaint and Answer or otherwise plead. Amended Pleadings due by 12/22/2023. Responsive pleadings due 60 days thereafter. Court finds the27 Motion to be moot as it wasn't a motion but the proposed order for26 Motion. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 11/16/23. (WG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
27 27 1 pgs motion Order Wed 11/15 3:23 PM
Proposed MOTION for Order Granting Stipulated Motion For Scheduling Order Setting Deadline to Amend Complaint and Answer or Otherwise Plead by Plaintiff Ferzad Abdi. Responses due by 11/29/2023 (Cohen, Louis)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 11/15 3:16 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS STIPULATED MOTION FOR SCHEDULING ORDER SETTING DEADLINE TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD by Plaintiff Ferzad Abdi. Responses due by 11/29/2023 (Cohen, Louis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Thu 11/02 8:00 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Alex S Bruce on behalf of PR Manufacturing Enterprises LLC, Aaron James Rossi (Bruce, Alex)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Wed 11/01 8:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Karina Conley on behalf of PR Manufacturing Enterprises LLC, Aaron James Rossi (Conley, Karina)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Wed 11/01 8:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Richard H Blake on behalf of PR Manufacturing Enterprises LLC, Aaron James Rossi (Blake, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Thu 09/21 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Meredith R.W. DeCarlo on behalf of Reditus Laboratories LLC (DeCarlo, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
21 21 service Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer) Wed 09/20 3:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ferzad Abdi, State of Illinois, United States. All Plaintiffs. (Keller, John)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 09/20 11:22 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ferzad Abdi, State of Illinois, United States. All Plaintiffs. (Keller, John)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc 7.1 Disclosure Statement Wed 09/20 11:05 AM
Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Reditus Laboratories LLC. (Ziegelmueller, William)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Wed 09/20 10:17 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by William Paul Ziegelmueller on behalf of Reditus Laboratories LLC (Ziegelmueller, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer) Tue 09/19 4:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ferzad Abdi, State of Illinois, United States. All Plaintiffs. (Keller, John)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer) Tue 09/19 4:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ferzad Abdi, State of Illinois, United States. All Plaintiffs. (Keller, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 09/18 5:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ferzad Abdi, State of Illinois, United States. Reditus Laboratories LLC waiver sent on 9/18/2023, answer due 11/17/2023. (Keller, John)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued Mon 09/18 11:35 AM
Summons Issued as to Midwest Urological Group Ltd, PR Manufacturing Enterprises LLC, Reditus Healthcare LLC, Reditus Laboratories LLC, Aaron James Rossi. Returned to counsel to effect service. (RES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 07/20 10:04 AM
TEXT ORDER granting13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Amanda S Yarusso terminated as counsel of record in this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 7/20/23. (WG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
13 13 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 07/19 2:58 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Ferzad Abdi. Responses due by 8/2/2023 (Yarusso, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time re Transcript Tue 06/27 3:09 PM
ORDER. The Plaintiff's11 Motion to extend seal of documents until 6/22/2023 is granted. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/27/2023. (KZ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
11 11 NOTICE of Election to Decline Intervention and MOTION to extend seal of documents by Plaintiff United States (RES) Modified on 5/15/2023 to include Motion in the docket entry (JJK).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
TEXT ORDER granting10 Motion of the United States for an extension of the seal and the Government's evaluation period. Court extends the seal on the Complaint and the evaluation period to 6/22/2023. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 2/22/23. (WG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
10 10 MOTION for an Extension of the Seal and the Government's Evaluation Period by Plaintiff United States. Responses due by 3/7/2023(RES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
Friday, December 09, 2022
9 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John Timothy Keller on behalf of all Plaintiffs. (RES)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
6 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Kathy Swett on behalf of United States (RES)
Related: [-]
TEXT ORDER granting4 the United States' Motion for an Extension of the Seal and the Government's Evaluation Period. The seal on the Complaint and related filings in this case and the United States' evaluation period are extended to 2/22/2023. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/30/22. (WG)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
5 5 3 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support of4 MOTION for an Extension of the Seal and the Government's Evaluation Period by United States. (RES)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION for an Extension of the Seal and the Government's Evaluation Period by Plaintiff United States. Responses due by 9/12/2022 (RES)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Kimberly A Klein on behalf of United States (RES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 6/22/2022. This case is reassigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow for further proceedings. (TK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 6/21/2022. Judge James E. Shadid disqualifies and recuses himself from participation in this matter pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a). This matter is referred to Chief Judge Sara Darrow for reassignment. (TK)
Related: [-]
TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 6/21/2022. This case and the corresponding hearings are reassigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow pending reassignment. (TK)
Related: [-]
Filing fee: $402, receipt number PIA100000227 (VH)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 17, 2022
2 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Ferzad Abdi. (TK)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ferzad Abdi.(TK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet