Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:Jerry Edwards, Jr
Referred: Kayla D Mcclusky
Case #: 5:23-cv-00857
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jun 23, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 20, 2023 4:38 AM CST
Defendant
School Board of Caddo Parish
1961 Midway Ave
Shreveport, LA 71108
Represented By
Brian Ross Carnie
Kean Miller (shv)
contact info
Reagan Elizabeth LaPietra
Kean Miller (shv)
contact info
Michael D Lowe
Kean Miller (shv)
contact info
Defendant
Kim Pendleton
Represented By
Brian Ross Carnie
Kean Miller (shv)
contact info
Reagan Elizabeth LaPietra
Kean Miller (shv)
contact info
Michael D Lowe
Kean Miller (shv)
contact info
Plaintiff
Kendrick Terrell Golatt, Sr
3085 Hwy 155
Coushatta, LA 71019


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, April 07, 2025
31 31 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/07 4:46 PM
NOTICE of Initial Disclosures sent to Brian Carnie by Kendrick Terrell Golatt, Sr (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 02/11 2:16 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Per 29 Minutes - Initial Disclosures exchanged by Plaintiff due 2/21/2025. (crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
30 30 order Scheduling Order - Hicks/Edwards Mon 02/10 10:05 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 1/12/2026 09:00 AM in Shreveport, Courtroom 1 before Judge Jerry Edwards Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2025 09:30 AM in by video conference before Judge Jerry Edwards Jr. Pretrial Order due by 12/8/2025. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 3/7/2025. Witness List due by 7/8/2025. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 7/8/2025. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 8/7/2025. Discovery deadline 8/7/2025. Expert Depositions due by 9/8/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 9/8/2025. Daubert Motions due by 9/29/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order inserts and exhibits exchanged by 11/3/2025. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 11/17/2025. Motions in Limine due by 12/1/2025. Trial Depositions due by 11/17/2025. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 1/5/2026.Defendants witness list is due seven(7) days after receipt of plaintiffs list. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 2/7/2025. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
29 29 minutes Scheduling Conference Fri 02/07 3:31 PM
MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 2/7/2025. Participating by telephone were: Brian Ross Carnie on behalf of School Board of Caddo Parish, and Kendrick Terrell Golatt, Sr., pro se. The undersigned discussed the Rule 26(f) report with Mr. Carnie and Mr. Golatt and explained to Mr. Golatt that he did have to provide initial disclosures to Mr. Carnie. He has until February 21, 2025, to place those in the mail to Mr. Carnie. The undersigned also referred Mr. Golatt to the Court's website (www.lawd.uscourts.gov) for links to sources, including the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, as well as a guide to pro se practice. Mr. Golatt is continuing to seek counsel, and he was assured that his counsel need only file a motion to enroll. After discussion, trial was set before Judge Jerry Edwards on January 12, 2026, and a pre-trial conference was set before Judge Edwards via zoom on December 15, 2025, at 9:30 a.m. A scheduling order will issue separately. (jud,McClusky, Kayla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
28 28 order Minute Entry ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 01/29 4:02 PM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: Because of a hearing that ran late in another matter, the Court was unable to convene the scheduling conference that was set for this afternoon. Accordingly, the telephone scheduling conference is re-set for February 7, 2025, at 11:30 AM, before the undersigned. The conference call information is as follows: Call-in number: 855-244-8681Access code: 2311 588 7425. If any party has a conflict with the new conference setting, then they shall promptly contact the undersigned's courtroom deputy, at Ann_Leday@lawd.uscourts.gov to arrange an alternative date/time that is mutually agreeable. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 1/29/2025. (crt,Barkley, B)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
27 27 misc Rule 26(f) Report Wed 01/22 1:40 PM
RULE 26(f) Report by School Board of Caddo Parish . (aty,Carnie, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent (Form Included) Fri 12/27 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judges By Consent. If you wish to proceed before the magistrate judge, please complete and return the appropriate form located on this court's website by clicking[LINK:here] . Executed consent forms must be emailed to lawdml_consents@lawd.uscourts.gov. DO NOT return the form to the judges. (crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
25 25 1 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference Fri 12/27 10:57 AM
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/29/2025 at 2:00 PM by phone before Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 1/15/2025. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 1/22/2025. Rule 26 Report due by 1/22/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 12/27/2024. (crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
24 24 8 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 12/11 2:54 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiffs claims under Title VII and the ADA against Defendant Pendleton, in both her personal and official capacities, are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Jerry Edwards, Jr on 12/11/2024. (crt,Roaix, G)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 03/19 4:21 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Reagan Elizabeth LaPietra terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 3/19/2024. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
22 22 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 03/18 9:51 AM
Joint MOTION to Withdraw Reagan E. LaPietra as Attorney by School Board of Caddo Parish, Kim Pendleton. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/18/2024.(aty,Carnie, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Friday, March 15, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Deficiency Fri 03/15 3:35 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency to Brian Ross Carnie on behalf of School Board of Caddo Parish, Kim Pendleton regarding20 MOTION to Withdraw Reagan E. LaPietra as Attorney . Reason: A motion to withdraw or to substitute counsel must be signed by or have consent of the withdrawing attorney. Please refer to LR83.2.11. See also LR5.7.08 regarding electronic filing of documents requiring signatures of more than one party. The motion cannot be referred to chambers until this deficiency is corrected. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 03/15 2:24 PM
DEFICIENT ? MOTION to Withdraw Reagan E. LaPietra as Attorney by School Board of Caddo Parish, Kim Pendleton. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/15/2024.(aty,Carnie, Brian) Modified to reflect deficient status on 3/15/2024 (Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Friday, January 12, 2024
19 19 order _ADI Minute Entry Reassigning Case (ADI ONLY) Fri 01/12 1:04 PM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Case reassigned to District Judge Jerry Edwards, Jr. Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Judge Terry A Doughty on 1/12/2024. (crt,Kiper, C)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
18 18 respm Response to Motion Thu 11/09 3:43 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kendrick Terrell Golatt, Sr. (crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
17 17 notice Notice of Motion Setting Wed 11/08 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding:16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 11/08 1:37 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Individual Defendant, Kim Pendleton by Kim Pendleton.(aty,Carnie, Brian) Modified on 11/8/2023 (Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief,
Att: 2 Proposed order
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 11/08 1:34 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,8 Amended Complaint , ANSWER to1 Complaint,8 Amended Complaint by School Board of Caddo Parish.(aty,Carnie, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel Fri 11/03 10:00 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as additional counsel Reagan Elizabeth LaPietra for School Board of Caddo Parish, Kim Pendleton. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 11/2/2023. (crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
13 13 motion Enroll as Counsel Wed 11/01 9:37 AM
MOTION for Reagan E. LaPietra to Enroll as Counsel by School Board of Caddo Parish, Kim Pendleton. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/1/2023.(aty,Carnie, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Friday, October 20, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 10/20 4:11 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. School Board of Caddo Parish answer due 11/8/2023; Kim Pendleton answer due 11/8/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 10/20/2023. (crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
11 11 1 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Thu 10/19 10:51 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent sought but not yet obtained filed by Kendrick Terrell Golatt, Sr. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 10/18 10:13 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent sought but not yet obtained by School Board of Caddo Parish, Kim Pendleton. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/18/2023.(Attorney Brian Ross Carnie added to party School Board of Caddo Parish(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Ross Carnie added to party Kim Pendleton(pty:dft))(aty,Carnie, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Thursday, September 28, 2023
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 09/29 9:01 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kendrick Terrell Golatt, Sr. School Board of Caddo Parish served on 9/27/2023, answer due 10/18/2023; Kim Pendleton served on 9/27/2023, answer due 10/18/2023. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 09/26 8:26 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against School Board of Caddo Parish, Kim Pendleton filed by Kendrick Terrell Golatt, Sr.(crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
7 7 misc Jury Demand Tue 07/18 2:34 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kendrick Terrell Golatt, Sr. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
6 6 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Mon 07/10 3:35 PM
ORDER denying3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 7/10/2023. (crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued - All (Form Included) Thu 07/06 2:12 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to School Board of Caddo Parish, Kim Pendleton. (crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 07/06 2:11 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 7/5/2023. (crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
3 3 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 06/30 3:07 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kendrick Terrell Golatt, Sr. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/30/2023.(crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, June 23, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 06/26 2:14 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kendrick Terrell Golatt, Sr. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/23/2023. (crt,Williams, K)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/26 2:12 PM
COMPLAINT against Unknown Defendants filed by Kendrick Terrell Golatt, Sr.(crt,Williams, K)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 06/28 1:16 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Bunting, M)
Related: [-]