Hawaii District Court
Case #: 1:23-mj-01013
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2023
Terminated:Jul 06, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 27, 2023 9:21 PM HST
Defendant
Keina Drageset (2)
Represented By
Jacquelyn Tryon Esser
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Avery Garrard (1)
Represented By
Neal J. Kugiya
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Marshall H Silverberg
Office Of The United States Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/20/2024 12:04 PM HST
Monday, June 26, 2023
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT; AFFIDAVIT in Support of Criminal Complaint as to Avery Garrard (1), Keina Drageset (2) - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 6/26/2023. (eta)
Related: [-]
2 2 EO: as to Defendant (1) Avery Garrard and Defendant (2) Keina Drageset - Initial Appearance is set for 6/27/2023 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Parties have been notified. Neal Kugiya is provisionally appointed as counsel for Defendant (1) Avery Garrard, pending submission of Defendant Avery Garrard's Financial Affidavit at a later date. Jacquelyn Esser and the Office of the Federal Public Defender are provisionally appointed as counsel for Defendant (2) Keina Drageset pending submission of Defendant Keina Drageset's Financial Affidavit at a later date. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER) (laa)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Detain Defendant Without Bail /Certificate of Service by USA as to Avery Garrard. (Silverberg, Marshall) Docket text modified on 6/27/2023 (eta).
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION to Detain Defendant Without Bail /Certificate of Service by USA as to Keina Drageset. (Silverberg, Marshall) Docket text modified on 6/27/2023 (eta).
Related: [-]