Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Jonathan JC Grey
Referred: Curtis Ivy, Jr
Case #: 2:23-cv-11548
Nature of Suit140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2023
Last checked: Monday Dec 25, 2023 3:50 AM EST
Defendant
Canoo Technologies Inc
Represented By
Elliott Riches
Munck Wilson Mandala
contact info
Daniel G. Cohen
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PLLC
contact info
S. Wallace Dunwoody
Munck Wilson Mandala, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tachi-S Engineering U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By
Brandon C. Hubbard
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, April 18, 2025
22 22 order Staying Case Fri 04/18 2:24 PM
ORDER STAYING CASE Signed by District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey. (SOso)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
21 21 notice Notice - Other Thu 02/13 4:15 PM
NOTICE by Tachi-S Engineering U.S.A., Inc. of Bankruptcy Stay (Hubbard, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
20 20 appeal Appeal Mandate Thu 02/13 2:04 PM
MANDATE from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit as to15 Notice of Appeal filed by Canoo Technologies Inc [Appeal Case Number 24-1291 (JPar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
19 19 appeal Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment Thu 01/23 3:03 PM
OPINION AND JUDGMENT from U.S. Court of Appeals - Sixth Circuit re15 Notice of Appeal filed by Canoo Technologies Inc [Appeal Case Number 24-1291 (CShr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
18 18 notice Change of Address/Contact Information Thu 11/21 5:56 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by S. Wallace Dunwoody on behalf of Canoo Technologies Inc. (Dunwoody, S.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
17 17 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 05/02 3:09 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: On January 16, 2024, Attorney Elliot C. Riches, counsel for defendant Canoo Technologies Inc., filed a motion for leave to withdraw his appearance as counsel of record. (ECF No.13 .) Upon finding GOOD CAUSE, the Court GRANTS Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
16 16 appeal Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit* Fri 04/05 9:24 AM
Certificate of Service re15 Notice of Appeal. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
15 15 appeal Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit Wed 04/03 5:06 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Canoo Technologies Inc re14 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Leave to File. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9737332 - Fee: $ 605 - Fee Status: Fee Paid. (Dunwoody, S.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
14 14 15 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 03/26 1:18 PM
ORDER Denying Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration (ECF No.4 ) and Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply (ECF No.9 ). Signed by District Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey. (SOso)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
13 13 motion Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 01/16 2:39 PM
MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Elliott C. Riches by Canoo Technologies Inc. (Riches, Elliott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
12 12 misc Attorney Appearance Tue 09/19 1:31 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Elliott Riches appearing on behalf of Canoo Technologies Inc (Riches, Elliott)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Attorney Appearance Tue 09/19 1:27 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: S. Wallace Dunwoody appearing on behalf of Canoo Technologies Inc (Dunwoody, S.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
10 10 respm Response to Motion Wed 08/30 10:24 AM
RESPONSE to9 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Canoo Technologies Inc. (Cohen, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
9 9 motion Leave to File Tue 08/29 12:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration by Tachi-S Engineering U.S.A., Inc.. (Hubbard, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Sur-Reply,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Unpublished Decision(s)
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
8 8 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 08/22 10:44 AM
REPLY to Response re4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay the Proceeding filed by Canoo Technologies Inc. (Cohen, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
7 7 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Tue 08/15 11:27 AM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Tachi-S Engineering U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Tachi-S Co. LTD. for Tachi-S Engineering U.S.A., Inc.. (Hubbard, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
6 6 respm Response to Motion Tue 08/08 4:29 PM
RESPONSE to4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay the Proceeding filed by Tachi-S Engineering U.S.A., Inc.. (Hubbard, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Agreement Relating to Delivery of NASA Seats,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Graeme Stewart,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Unpublished Decision(s)
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
5 5 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Tue 08/01 2:32 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Canoo Technologies Inc (Cohen, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
4 4 motion Compel Tue 07/18 5:13 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay the Proceeding by Canoo Technologies Inc. (Cohen, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Ramesh Murthy
Monday, July 10, 2023
3 3 service Certificate of Service Mon 07/10 4:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tachi-S Engineering U.S.A., Inc. (Hubbard, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued* Wed 06/28 3:53 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Canoo Technologies Inc* (DAll)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Wed 06/28 9:57 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Tachi-S Engineering U.S.A., Inc. against Canoo Technologies Inc., f/k/a EVelozcity Inc.. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9400050 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Hubbard, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Wed 06/28 3:54 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (DAll)
Related: [-]