Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:21-bk-11002

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen B Owens
Case #: 1:23-ap-50418
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2023
Terminated:Jan 29, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ozark Organics, LLC
Represented By
Ozark Organics, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nauni Manty, as the Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Kevin G. Collins
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, January 29, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Mon 01/29 9:41 AM
Adversary Case 1:23-ap-50418 Closed (LBr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 01/26 1:07 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice Filed by Nauni Manty. (Collins, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
11 11 mediation Mediation Status Report Tue 11/28 1:51 PM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 01, 2023
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/02 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 10/01/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9
Friday, September 29, 2023
9 9 court VAN-447 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Alternate) Fri 09/29 8:01 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation. Ian Connor Biffearato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Signed on 9/29/2023. (LBr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
8 8 misc Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Thu 09/28 3:39 PM
Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Connor Bifferato Between Nauni Manty, Liquidating Trustee and Ozark Organics, LLC . Filed by Nauni Manty. (Collins, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
7 7 order Scheduling Order Tue 08/15 4:16 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+] The case judge is Karen B. Owens. Signed on 8/15/2023. (Mml)
Related: [-] 1 ,5 ,6
Monday, August 14, 2023
6 6 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Mon 08/14 9:41 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Nauni Manty. (Collins, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order - Exhibit A
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, July 28, 2023
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/28 1:57 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Ozark Organics, LLC Mediation due date: 11/27/2023.(Austria, Matthew)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, June 29, 2023
4 4 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Thu 06/29 10:07 AM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 (Adv. DI 1) and Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference (Adv. DI 3) Filed by Nauni Manty. (Collins, Kevin)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 06/29 10:02 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Ozark Organics, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 8/24/2023 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Collins, Kevin)
Related: [-] ument1
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 06/28 12:26 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 23-50418 KBO] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A11150103, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 06/27 4:38 PM
Adversary case 23-50418 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Nauni Manty, as the Liquidating Trustee against Ozark Organics, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 9/25/2023. (Collins, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives