Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Julie S Sneed
Referred: Leslie Hoffman Price
Case #: 6:23-cv-01200
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2023
Terminated:Jul 29, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 25, 2023 3:43 AM EST
Defendant
TAB Restaurant Group, LLC
Plaintiff
Adam Acoine
Represented By
Jolynn Marie Falto
Eclat Law, PLLC
contact info
Kevin Kenneth Ross
Eclat Law, PLLC
contact info
Nicola Pappas Hudson, I
Eclat Law, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Lisselle Anderson
Represented By
Jolynn Marie Falto
Eclat Law, PLLC
contact info
Kevin Kenneth Ross
Eclat Law, PLLC
contact info
Nicola Pappas Hudson, I
Eclat Law, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Kerstin Barrett
Represented By
Jolynn Marie Falto
Eclat Law, PLLC
contact info
Kevin Kenneth Ross
Eclat Law, PLLC
contact info
Nicola Pappas Hudson, I
Eclat Law, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Clemons
Represented By
Jolynn Marie Falto
Eclat Law, PLLC
contact info
Kevin Kenneth Ross
Eclat Law, PLLC
contact info
Nicola Pappas Hudson, I
Eclat Law, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicolas Garces
Represented By
Jolynn Marie Falto
Eclat Law, PLLC
contact info
Kevin Kenneth Ross
Eclat Law, PLLC
contact info
Nicola Pappas Hudson, I
Eclat Law, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Jonathan Gil
Represented By
Jolynn Marie Falto
Eclat Law, PLLC
contact info
Kevin Kenneth Ross
Eclat Law, PLLC
contact info
Nicola Pappas Hudson, I
Eclat Law, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Jorge Ibarra-Mendoza
Represented By
Jolynn Marie Falto
Eclat Law, PLLC
contact info
Kevin Kenneth Ross
Eclat Law, PLLC
contact info
Nicola Pappas Hudson, I
Eclat Law, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Kaeden Kaciak
Represented By
Jolynn Marie Falto
Eclat Law, PLLC
contact info
Kevin Kenneth Ross
Eclat Law, PLLC
contact info
Nicola Pappas Hudson, I
Eclat Law, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Zoiyah Mathis
Represented By
Jolynn Marie Falto
Eclat Law, PLLC
contact info
Kevin Kenneth Ross
Eclat Law, PLLC
contact info
Nicola Pappas Hudson, I
Eclat Law, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Clifford Robinson
Represented By
Jolynn Marie Falto
Eclat Law, PLLC
contact info
Kevin Kenneth Ross
Eclat Law, PLLC
contact info
Nicola Pappas Hudson, I
Eclat Law, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Trinity Shain
Represented By
Jolynn Marie Falto
Eclat Law, PLLC
contact info
Kevin Kenneth Ross
Eclat Law, PLLC
contact info
Nicola Pappas Hudson, I
Eclat Law, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
42 42 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 07/30 9:09 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JDR)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
41 41 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 07/29 3:05 PM
ORDER. This action is dismissed without prejudice. Any pending motions are denied as moot. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending deadlines and thereafter close this case. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 7/29/2024. (SC)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 27, 2024
40 40 notice Notice of voluntary dismissal Sat 07/27 9:10 AM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Adam Acoine, Lisselle Anderson, Kerstin Barrett, Christopher Clemons, Nicolas Garces, Jonathan Gil, Jorge Ibarra-Mendoza, Kaeden Kaciak, Zoiyah Mathis, Clifford Robinson, Trinity Shain, Mark Stoves, David Visby (Ross, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
39 39 2 pgs order Order Thu 07/25 4:24 PM
ORDER discharging 37 Order to show cause. It is ORDERED that within seven (7) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiffs shall file a notice of voluntary dismissal in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 as a separate docket entry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 7/25/2024. (MKH)
Related: [-]
38 38 misc Response to order to show cause Thu 07/25 12:27 AM
RESPONSE TO37 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of All Claims filed by Adam Acoine, Lisselle Anderson, Kerstin Barrett, Christopher Clemons, Nicolas Garces, Jonathan Gil, Jorge Ibarra-Mendoza, Kaeden Kaciak, Zoiyah Mathis, Clifford Robinson, Trinity Shain, Mark Stoves, David Visby. (Ross, Kevin) Modified text on 7/25/2024 (BD)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
37 37 2 pgs order Order to show cause Fri 07/19 4:27 PM
ORDER to show cause. It is ORDERED that on or before July 26, 2024, Plaintiffs shall show cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. See Local Rules 1.10(d), 3.10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 7/19/2024. (MKH)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
36 36 order Clerks Entry of Default Mon 06/10 12:28 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jennifer S. Pilson (LD)
Related: [-]
35 35 order Clerks Entry of Default Mon 06/10 12:28 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Glenn O. Pilson (LD)
Related: [-]
34 34 order Clerks Entry of Default Mon 06/10 12:26 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to TAB Restaurant Group, LLC (LD)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
33 33 order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Fri 06/07 8:51 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 31 Motion for Clerk's Default. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter default against Defendants TAB Restaurant Group, LLC, Glenn O. Pilson, and Jennifer S. Pilson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 6/7/2024. (SFC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
32 32 order Order Wed 05/29 9:04 AM
ENDORSED ORDER discharging 29 Order to show cause. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 5/29/2024. (GNB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
31 31 motion Default Judgment Wed 05/15 12:09 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Glenn O. Pilson, Jennifer S. Pilson, TAB Restaurant Group, LLC by Kerstin Barrett, Trinity Shain, Zoiyah Mathis, Mark Stoves, Kaeden Kaciak, Lisselle Anderson, Christopher Clemons, David Visby, Jonathan Gil, Adam Acoine, Jorge Ibarra-Mendoza, Nicolas Garces, Clifford Robinson. (Ross, Kevin)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Response to order to show cause Wed 05/15 12:04 PM
RESPONSE TO29 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Adam Acoine, Lisselle Anderson, Kerstin Barrett, Christopher Clemons, Nicolas Garces, Jonathan Gil, Jorge Ibarra-Mendoza, Kaeden Kaciak, Zoiyah Mathis, Clifford Robinson, Trinity Shain, Mark Stoves, David Visby. (Ross, Kevin) Modified docket text on 5/15/2024 (JOS)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
29 29 2 pgs order Order to show cause Fri 05/03 3:38 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiffs have not applied for entry of default, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a) within the time provided in Local Rule 1.10(b), or as further extended by the Court. Plaintiffs show cause within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order why the Complaint should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Local Rule 3.10, M.D. Fla. Failure to respond to this order may result in dismissal of the case without prejudice or other appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 5/3/2024. (GNB)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
28 28 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/18 10:57 AM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 6:23-cv-01200-JSS-LHP. Judge Carlos E. Mendoza no longer assigned to the case. (GNB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
27 27 service Summons returned executed Wed 03/13 12:11 PM
RETURN of service executed on March 12, 2024 by Kerstin Barrett, Trinity Shain, Zoiyah Mathis, Mark Stoves, Kaeden Kaciak, Lisselle Anderson, Christopher Clemons, David Visby, Jonathan Gil, Adam Acoine, Jorge Ibarra-Mendoza, Nicolas Garces, Clifford Robinson as to TAB Restaurant Group, LLC.(Ross, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Return of Service
26 26 service Summons returned executed Wed 03/13 12:07 PM
RETURN of service executed on March 12, 2024 by Kerstin Barrett, Trinity Shain, Zoiyah Mathis, Mark Stoves, Kaeden Kaciak, Lisselle Anderson, Christopher Clemons, David Visby, Jonathan Gil, Adam Acoine, Jorge Ibarra-Mendoza, Nicolas Garces, Clifford Robinson as to Jennifer S. Pilson.(Ross, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Return of Service
25 25 service Summons returned executed Wed 03/13 12:04 PM
RETURN of service executed on March 12, 2024 by Kerstin Barrett, Trinity Shain, Zoiyah Mathis, Mark Stoves, Kaeden Kaciak, Lisselle Anderson, Christopher Clemons, David Visby, Jonathan Gil, Adam Acoine, Jorge Ibarra-Mendoza, Nicolas Garces, Clifford Robinson as to Glenn O. Pilson.(Ross, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Return of Service
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
24 24 service Summons issued Summons reissued Tue 02/20 1:07 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Jennifer S. Pilson, Glenn O. Pilson. SUMMONS reissued as to TAB Restaurant Group, LLC. (AJS)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/16 5:18 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against TAB Restaurant Group, LLC, Glenn O. Pilson, Jennifer S. Pilson with Jury Demand. filed by Lisselle Anderson, Kerstin Barrett, Christopher Clemons, Trinity Shain, Jonathan Gil, Zoiyah Mathis, Adam Acoine, Jorge Ibarra-Mendoza, Kaeden Kaciak, Nicolas Garces, Clifford Robinson, David Visby, Mark Stoves.(Ross, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
22 22 13 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Wed 01/24 5:09 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice 21 Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Default Judgment. Within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiffs may file a renewed motion for default judgment which addresses, with citation to applicable legal authority, the issues addressed in this Order. Alternatively, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint, should they deem it necessary to do so, which must be served on Defendant as required by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 1/24/2024. (SFC)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
21 21 motion Default Judgment Mon 10/16 10:23 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against TAB Restaurant Group, LLC by All Plaintiffs.(Hudson, Nicola)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Affidavit of David Visby,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Table of Unpaid Wages
Friday, September 15, 2023
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 09/15 11:15 AM
ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Default Judgment. Deadline now 10/16/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 9/15/2023. (SFC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Wed 09/13 5:07 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Final Default Judgment by Adam Acoine, Lisselle Anderson, Kerstin Barrett, Christopher Clemons, Nicolas Garces, Jonathan Gil, Jorge Ibarra-Mendoza, Kaeden Kaciak, Zoiyah Mathis, Clifford Robinson, Trinity Shain. (Hudson, Nicola)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of appearance Wed 09/13 5:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicola Pappas Hudson, I on behalf of Adam Acoine, Lisselle Anderson, Kerstin Barrett, Christopher Clemons, Nicolas Garces, Jonathan Gil, Jorge Ibarra-Mendoza, Kaeden Kaciak, Zoiyah Mathis, Clifford Robinson, Trinity Shain (Hudson, Nicola)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2023
17 17 order Clerks Entry of Default Mon 08/14 11:35 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to TAB Restaurant Group, LLC (BCB)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Fri 08/11 3:18 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 15 Motion for Clerk's Default. The Clerk Court is directed to enter default against Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 8/11/2023. (MKH)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Default Judgment Fri 08/11 9:40 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants in Compliance with [DE-14] by All Plaintiffs.(Ross, Kevin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. Modified text on 8/11/2023 (MCB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Tue 08/08 2:14 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice 13 Plaintiffs' Motion for Courts Entry of Default. A renewed motion, which shall be filed on or before August 22, 2023, must include a memorandum of legal authority establishing that service of process was proper under applicable law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 8/8/2023. (MKH)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Default Judgment Tue 08/08 10:46 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment against TAB Restaurant Group, LLC by Lisselle Anderson, Kerstin Barrett, Christopher Clemons, Trinity Shain, Jonathan Gil, Zoiyah Mathis, Adam Acoine, Jorge Ibarra-Mendoza, Kaeden Kaciak, Nicolas Garces, Clifford Robinson. (Ross, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
12 12 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/04 8:37 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re3 Order by Adam Acoine, Lisselle Anderson, Kerstin Barrett, Christopher Clemons, Nicolas Garces, Jonathan Gil, Jorge Ibarra-Mendoza, Kaeden Kaciak, Zoiyah Mathis, Clifford Robinson, Trinity Shain. (Falto, Jolynn)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of a Related Action Fri 08/04 8:30 PM
NOTICE of a related action (no related actions known) per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Adam Acoine, Lisselle Anderson, Kerstin Barrett, Christopher Clemons, Nicolas Garces, Jonathan Gil, Jorge Ibarra-Mendoza, Kaeden Kaciak, Zoiyah Mathis, Clifford Robinson, Trinity Shain. Related case(s): No (Falto, Jolynn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
10 10 service Summons returned executed Tue 07/18 10:48 AM
RETURN of service executed on July 11, 2023 by Lisselle Anderson, Kerstin Barrett, Christopher Clemons, Trinity Shain, Jonathan Gil, Zoiyah Mathis, Adam Acoine, Jorge Ibarra-Mendoza, Kaeden Kaciak, Nicolas Garces, Clifford Robinson as to TAB Restaurant Group, LLC.(Ross, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service
Thursday, July 06, 2023
9 9 service Summons issued Thu 07/06 3:32 PM
SUMMONS issued as to TAB Restaurant Group, LLC. (ABC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
8 8 service Proposed summons Wed 07/05 2:18 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Adam Acoine, Lisselle Anderson, Kerstin Barrett, Christopher Clemons, Nicolas Garces, Jonathan Gil, Jorge Ibarra-Mendoza, Kaeden Kaciak, Zoiyah Mathis, Clifford Robinson, Trinity Shain. (Ross, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of appearance Fri 06/30 4:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jolynn Marie Falto on behalf of Adam Acoine, Lisselle Anderson, Kerstin Barrett, Christopher Clemons, Nicolas Garces, Jonathan Gil, Jorge Ibarra-Mendoza, Kaeden Kaciak, Zoiyah Mathis, Clifford Robinson, Trinity Shain (Falto, Jolynn)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order Fri 06/30 2:42 PM
FLSA ORDER OF REFERENCE- This case is hereby referred to the Magistrate Judge for issuance of the FLSA Scheduling Order and management of the deadlines set forth therein. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/30/2023. (MEH)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order Fri 06/30 2:37 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Orlando Division of the Middle District of Florida is currently operating in a Judicial Emergency due to a judicial vacancy and the number of cases in the division. Accordingly, civil cases, and especially newly filed civil cases, will be the Court's lowest priority unless emergency issues are presented. Counsel and the parties are encouraged to consider consenting to the Magistrate Judge for the entire case or disposition of any dispositive motions in order to have their case considered on a more timely basis. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/30/2023. (MEH)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Order Fri 06/30 2:36 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/30/2023. (MEH)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order Fri 06/30 2:33 PM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/30/2023. (MEH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
2 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:23-cv-1200-CEM-LHP. (ABC)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/28 12:49 PM
COMPLAINT against TAB Restaurant Group, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20988828) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Ross, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 06/28 1:48 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:23-cv-1200-CEM-LHP. (ABC)
Related: [-]