Washington Western District Court
Judge:Benjamin H Settle
Case #: 3:23-cv-05573
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2023
Terminated:Dec 04, 2024
Case in other court:Pierce County Superior Court, 23-00002-07336-9
Last checked: Monday Dec 25, 2023 12:55 AM PST
Defendant
Schindler Elevator Corporation
Represented By
Daniel W Rankin
Preg O'Donnell & Gillett (sea)
contact info
Eric Peter Gillett
Preg O'Donnell & Gillett (sea)
contact info
Defendant
Doe Corporations 1-5
Defendant
Macy's Retail Holdings LLC
Represented By
Daniel W Rankin
Preg O'Donnell & Gillett (sea)
contact info
Eric Peter Gillett
Preg O'Donnell & Gillett (sea)
contact info
Defendant
Macy's West Stores LLC
Represented By
Daniel W Rankin
Preg O'Donnell & Gillett (sea)
contact info
Eric Peter Gillett
Preg O'Donnell & Gillett (sea)
contact info
Plaintiff
Bambi Hiron
Represented By
Holly D Brauchli
Bullivant Houser Bailey (sea)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Cafaro Management Company
Terminated: 10/06/2023
Represented By
Daniel W Rankin
Preg O'Donnell & Gillett (sea)
contact info
Suzanna Shaub
Reed Mcclure
contact info
Eric Peter Gillett
Preg O'Donnell & Gillett (sea)
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
31 31 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss ~Util - Terminate Case Wed 12/04 3:45 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. All claims brought by Plaintiff against the defendants are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without fees and costs to any party. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(MW)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Dismiss Wed 12/04 8:58 AM
Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants Schindler Elevator Corporation, Macy's West Stores LLC, Macy's Retail Holdings LLC. Noting Date 12/4/2024, (Rankin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
utility Terminate Motions (Public) Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 11/25 8:45 AM
Pursuant to29 NOTICE of Settlement of all claims all Motions/Deadlines/Hearings are terminated. Dismissal/Settlement papers due by 12/26/2024. (MET)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 11/22 1:22 PM
NOTICE of Settlement of all claims by Plaintiff Bambi Hiron (Brauchli, Holly)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
28 28 respm Declaration Fri 11/01 3:33 PM
DECLARATION of Eduardo Recardo filed by Defendants Schindler Elevator Corporation, Macy's West Stores LLC, Macy's Retail Holdings LLC re26 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Rankin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Declaration Fri 11/01 3:30 PM
DECLARATION of Daniel Rankin filed by Defendants Schindler Elevator Corporation, Macy's West Stores LLC, Macy's Retail Holdings LLC re26 MOTION for Summary Judgment(Rankin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
26 26 motion Summary Judgment Fri 11/01 3:22 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Defendants Schindler Elevator Corporation, Macy's West Stores LLC, Macy's Retail Holdings LLC. Noting Date 11/29/2024, (Rankin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment
Friday, June 14, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Unavailability Fri 06/14 1:03 PM
NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Daniel W Rankin for Defendants Macy's Retail Holdings LLC, Macy's West Stores LLC, Schindler Elevator Corporation from 8/1/2024-8/9/2024. (Rankin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Change of Address/Change of Name Tue 05/28 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Daniel W Rankin. Filed by Defendants Macy's Retail Holdings LLC, Macy's West Stores LLC, Schindler Elevator Corporation. (Rankin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
23 23 order BHS Minute Order Setting Trial and Pretrial Dates (FORM) Thu 02/01 4:37 PM
MINUTE ORDER GRANTING22 Stipulated MOTION to Continue Case Scheduling Deadlines by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. *5 DAY* Jury Trial is RESET for 2/4/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 7/29/2024, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 8/28/2024, Motions due by 9/9/2024, Discovery completed by 10/7/2024, Dispositive motions due by 11/6/2024, Motions in Limine due by 12/30/2024, Pretrial Order due by 1/13/2025, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 1/14/2025, Agreed Neutral Statement of the Case due by 1/14/2025, Deposition Designations due by 1/14/2025, Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2025 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom C before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MET)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
22 22 motion Stipulated Motion Wed 01/31 11:29 AM
Stipulated MOTION to Continue Case Scheduling Deadlines , filed by Defendants Macy's Retail Holdings LLC, Macy's West Stores LLC, Schindler Elevator Corporation. Noting Date 1/31/2024, (Rankin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, January 29, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Unavailability Mon 01/29 8:16 AM
NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Daniel W Rankin for Defendants Macy's Retail Holdings LLC, Macy's West Stores LLC, Schindler Elevator Corporation from 04/08/2024 - 04/12/2024. (Rankin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
20 20 11 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion Tue 11/14 11:30 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (Dkt.19 ), signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(AMD)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
19 19 motion Stipulated Motion Mon 11/13 1:36 PM
Stipulated MOTION re Stipulated Protective Order , filed by Defendants Macy's Retail Holdings LLC, Macy's West Stores LLC, Schindler Elevator Corporation. Noting Date 11/13/2023, (Rankin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
18 18 3 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion Fri 10/06 8:52 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER for Dismissal of Cafaro Managment Company, re Parties'16 Stipulated MOTION. Bambi Hiron's claims against Defendant Cafaro Management Company only are dismissed without prejudice and without costs. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(MW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
17 17 order BHS Minute Order Setting Trial and Pretrial Dates (FORM) Thu 10/05 8:57 AM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. *5 DAY* Jury Trial is set for 9/10/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Joinder of Parties due by 11/6/2023, Amended Pleadings due by 11/15/2023, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/4/2024, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 4/3/2024, Motions due by 4/15/2024, Discovery completed by 5/13/2024, Dispositive motions due by 6/12/2024, Motions in Limine due by 8/5/2024, Pretrial Order due by 8/19/2024, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 8/20/2024, Agreed Neutral Statement of the Case due by 8/20/2024, Deposition Designations due by 8/20/2024, Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MET)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
16 16 motion Stipulated Motion Wed 10/04 12:26 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Dismissal of Carfaro Management Company Only , filed by Defendant Cafaro Management Company. Noting Date 10/4/2023, (Shaub, Suzanna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
15 15 misc Joint Status Report Tue 10/03 10:43 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: five. Filed by Plaintiff Bambi Hiron.(Brauchli, Holly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
14 14 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 08/15 1:11 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Cafaro Management Company. (Shaub, Suzanna)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Mon 08/14 4:54 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re:1 Notice of Removal, by Cafaro Management Company.(Shaub, Suzanna)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/14 10:11 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Suzanna Shaub on behalf of Defendant Cafaro Management Company. (Shaub, Suzanna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
11 11 order BHS - Discovery, Depositions, and JSR Order (FORM) Thu 07/20 9:06 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/4/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/11/2023, Joint Status Report due by 10/18/2023. (MET)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Wed 07/19 3:39 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re:1 Notice of Removal, by Schindler Elevator Corporation.(Rankin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Wed 07/19 3:36 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re:1 Notice of Removal, by Macy's Retail Holdings LLC, Macy's West Stores LLC.(Rankin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
8 8 misc Jury Demand Tue 07/11 3:59 PM
DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendants Macy's Retail Holdings LLC, Macy's West Stores LLC, Schindler Elevator Corporation (Rankin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Verification of State Court Records Tue 07/11 3:57 PM
VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re1 Notice of Removal, (Amended) by Defendants Macy's Retail Holdings LLC, Macy's West Stores LLC, Schindler Elevator Corporation (Rankin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
6 6 misc Verification of State Court Records Fri 07/07 8:09 AM
VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Macy's Retail Holdings LLC, Macy's West Stores LLC, Schindler Elevator Corporation (Rankin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
5 5 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 07/05 2:47 PM
CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Macy's Inc. for Macy's Retail Holdings LLC ; Corporate Parent Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC for Macy's West Stores LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Macy's Retail Holdings LLC, Macy's West Stores LLC. (Rankin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
4 4 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 07/05 2:37 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Schindler Enterprises Inc, Corporate Parent Schindler Holdings Ltd for Schindler Elevator Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation. (Rankin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Unavailability Fri 06/30 11:22 AM
NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Daniel W Rankin for Defendants Macy's Retail Holdings LLC, Macy's West Stores LLC, Schindler Elevator Corporation from 7/20/2023-8/8/2023. (Rankin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
2 2 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Wed 06/28 12:02 PM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (AMD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 06/28 11:11 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 23 2-07336 9; Related [+] filed by Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC, Macy's West Stores, LLC, Cafaro Management Company, Schindler Elevator Corporation.(Rankin, Daniel)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8067469
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Daniel Rankin,
Att: 2 Complaint,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 06/28 12:02 PM
Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (AMD)
Related: [-]
utility Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines Wed 06/28 1:11 PM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Defendants must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/5/2023. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(AMD)
Related: [-]